EP3367794 - ANTIMICROBIAL SURFACE COATING MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.06.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.08.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.05.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yeditepe Universitesi Inonu Mahallesi Kayisdagi Caddesi 26 Agustos Yerlesimi Kadikoy 34755 Istanbul / TR | [2018/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAHIN, Fikrettin Inonu Mahallesi Kayisdagi Cad. 26 Agustos Yerlesimi Atasehir Istanbul / TR | 02 /
IYIGUNDOGDU, Zeynep Adana Bilim ve Teknoloji Üniversitesi Gültepe Mahallesi Çatalan Caddesi Mühendislik Fakültesi Oda no: 127 No:201/5 Sariçam Istanbul / TR | 03 /
DEMIR, Okan Inonu Mahallesi Kayisdagi Cad. 26 Agustos Yerlesimi Atasehir Istanbul / TR | [N/P] |
Former [2018/36] | 01 /
SAHIN, Fikrettin Inonu Mahallesi Kayisdagi Cad. 26 Agustos Yerlesimi Atasehir Istanbul / TR | ||
02 /
IYIGUNDOGDU, Zeynep Inonu Mahallesi Kayisdagi Cad. 26 Agustos Yerlesimi Atasehir Istanbul / TR | |||
03 /
DEMIR, Okan Inonu Mahallesi Kayisdagi Cad. 26 Agustos Yerlesimi Atasehir Istanbul / TR | Representative(s) | Walcher, Armin Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Merianstraße 26 90409 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/36] | Dericioglu Kurt, Ekin Ankara Patent Bureau Limited Kavaklidere Mahallesi Bestekar Caddesi No: 10 06680 Cankaya, Ankara / TR | Application number, filing date | 16820037.6 | 21.10.2016 | [2018/36] | WO2016TR50396 | Priority number, date | TR20150013357 | 26.10.2015 Original published format: TR 201513357 | [2018/36] | Filing language | TR | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017074285 | Date: | 04.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3367794 | Date: | 05.09.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A01N31/16, A01N43/40, A01N47/44, A01P1/00 | [2018/36] | CPC: |
A01N31/16 (EP,US);
A01N43/40 (EP,US);
A01N47/44 (US)
| C-Set: |
A01N31/16, A01N47/44 (US,EP);
A01N43/40, A01N31/16, A01N47/44, A01N59/16 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/36] | Title | German: | ANTIMIKROBIELLES OBERFLÄCHENBESCHICHTUNGSMATERIAL | [2018/36] | English: | ANTIMICROBIAL SURFACE COATING MATERIAL | [2018/36] | French: | MATÉRIAU DE REVÊTEMENT DE SURFACE ANTIMICROBIEN | [2018/36] | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.2018 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/36] | 25.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 11.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2021 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 14.06.2021 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 03.02.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/29] | 03.02.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.02.2022 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 01.03.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO03028762 (ETHICON INC [US], et al) [X] 1,5,6 * the claims; pages 4, 5 and 7 and the examples; in particular, example 2 * [I] 1-6; | [XI]US2003077316 (NICHOLS JANE [US], et al) [X] 1,5,6 * the claims and paragraphs 25, 38, 41, 42, 79-82 and 117 * [I] 1-6; | [I]US2006034902 (CORMIER MICHEL J [US], et al) [I] 1-6 * the claims and paragraphs 27, 37, 38, 112, 154 and 189-195 *; | [XI]JP2008111000 (MANDOM CORP) [X] 1,2,4-6 * paragraphs 8-17; the examples and the claims * [I] 1-6; | [XI]JP2008110999 (MANDOM CORP) [X] 1,3-6 * the claims; paragraphs 8-14, 17, 18 and 20 and the examples; in particular, examples 5 and 14 *[I] 1-6; | [I]US2012328682 (BARDWELL JAMES [US], et al) [I] 1-6 * the claims and paragraphs 14, 30, 48 and 49 *; | [I]US2013156708 (PESARO MANUEL [DE], et al) [I] 1-6 * the claims; paragraphs 81-289 and the abstract *; | [I]US2014235727 (TUFTS SCOTT A [US], et al) [I] 1-6 * the claims; paragraph 39, 40 and 45 and the abstract *; | [XI] - SHINTRE M S ET AL, "Efficacy of an alcohol-based healthcare hand rub containing synergistic combination of farnesol and benzethonium chloride", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF HYGIENE AND ENVIRONMENTAL HEALTH, URBAN U. FISCHER, JENA, DE, vol. 209, no. 5, doi:10.1016/J.IJHEH.2006.04.006, ISSN 1438-4639, (20060925), pages 477 - 487, (20060925), XP028043393 [X] 1,2,4-6 * page 478: left column, first paragraph and right column, first and second paragraphS; page 479: left column, first paragraph and table 1 * [I] 1-6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ijheh.2006.04.006 | by applicant | US2015224225 | - VERDIER, T.; COUTAND, M.; BERTRON, A.; ROQUES, C., "A review of indoor microbial growth across building materials and sampling and analysis methods", BUILDING AND ENVIRONMENT, (2014), vol. 80, pages 136 - 149 | - NEMLI,G.; AYDM, A.; OZTIIRK, I., "Laminat Malzemelerde Dizayn Se enekleri", KAFKAS UNIVERSITESI ARTVIN ORMAN FAKüLTESI DERGISI, (2004), vol. 1-2, pages 96 - 101 | - TAMBURINI, E.; DONEGA, V.; MARCHETTI, M. G.; PEDRINI, P.; MONTICELLI, C.; BALBO, A., "Study on Microbial Deposition and Contamination onto Six Surfaces Commonly Used in Chemical and Microbiological Laboratories", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF ENVIRONMENTAL RESEARCH AND PUBLIC HEALTH, (2015), vol. 12, no. 7, pages 8295 - 8311 | - CHARLES RIVER, MICROBIAL HOTSPOTS AND DIVERSITY ON COMMON HOUSEHOLD SURFACES, (2014), URL: http://www.criver.com/files/pdfs/emd/accugenix/microbial_hotspots_and_ di versity_on_common_househo. aspx | - SCOTT, E.; BLOOMFIELD, S. F., "The survival and transfer of microbial contamination via cloths, hands and utensils", JOURNAL OF APPLIED BACTERIOLOGY, (1990), vol. 68, no. 3, pages 271 - 278 | - DR. M.K. LALITHA, VELLORE, TAMIL NADU, "Manual on Antimicrobial Susceptibility Testing", (2005), URL: http://www.ijmm.org/documents/Antimicrobial.doc |