13.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] |
14.06.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] |
27.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] |
14.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] |
23.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] |
03.02.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.03.2023 [2023/10] |
16.12.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.01.2023 [2023/03] |
02.12.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.01.2023 [2023/01] |
28.10.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.11.2022 [2022/48] |
14.10.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.11.2022 [2022/46] |
05.08.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2022 [2022/36] |
22.07.2022 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] |
15.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] |
17.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
27.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] |
20.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.06.2022 [2022/25] |
13.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2022 [2022/24] |
06.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] |
22.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2022 [2022/21] |
18.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.03.2022 [2022/12] |
04.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] |
28.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2022 [2022/09] |
21.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] |
14.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] |
13.08.2021 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 15.09.2021 [2021/37] |
13.08.2021 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 15.09.2021 [2021/37] |
11.08.2021 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
11.08.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
11.08.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
31.03.2021 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
26.03.2021 |
Change - classification |
published on 28.04.2021 [2021/17] |
26.03.2021 |
Change - classification |
published on 28.04.2021 [2021/17] |
19.03.2021 |
Change - classification |
published on 21.04.2021 [2021/16] |
19.03.2021 |
Change - classification |
published on 21.04.2021 [2021/16] |
19.03.2021 |
Change - German title |
published on 21.04.2021 [2021/16] |
19.03.2021 |
Change - French title |
published on 21.04.2021 [2021/16] |
24.02.2021 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
30.12.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.09.2020 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
29.01.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
30.12.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.10.2019 |
First examination report |
|
07.10.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.05.2019 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 05.06.2019 [2019/23] |
03.05.2019 |
Change - extension states |
published on 05.06.2019 [2019/23] |
15.04.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
05.03.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
07.01.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
05.10.2018 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 07.11.2018 [2018/45] |
05.10.2018 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
05.10.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.10.2018 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 07.11.2018 [2018/45] |
29.08.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.08.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.07.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
28.07.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.01.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.11.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.09.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.09.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.03.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.01.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|