Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11741366 | Global Dossier | 29.08.2023 | B2 | US2020134470 | 30.04.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662301734 | 01.03.2016 | US201916726119 | 23.12.2019 | US201615172457 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10515307 | Global Dossier | 24.12.2019 | B2 | US2017076196 | 16.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662301734 | 01.03.2016 | US201562172018 | 05.06.2015 | US201615172457 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102177232B | Global Dossier | 10.11.2020 | B1 | KR20180096779 | 29.08.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016US65417 | 07.12.2016 | US201662301734 | 01.03.2016 | US201615172457 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6666457B | Global Dossier | 13.03.2020 | B2 | JP2019512760 | 16.05.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016US65417 | 07.12.2016 | US201662301734 | 01.03.2016 | US201615172457 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3955168 | Global Dossier | 10.07.2024 | B1 | EP3955168 | 16.02.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016US65417 | 07.12.2016 | US201662301734 | 01.03.2016 | EP16820415 | 07.12.2016 | US201615172457 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3398115 | Global Dossier | 15.09.2021 | B1 | EP3398115 | 07.11.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016US65417 | 07.12.2016 | US201662301734 | 01.03.2016 | US201615172457 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017151203 | Global Dossier | 08.09.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662301734 | 01.03.2016 | US201615172457 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107145940B | Global Dossier | 12.02.2021 | B | CN107145940 | 08.09.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662301734 | 01.03.2016 | US201615172457 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102016125838 | 07.09.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662301734 | 01.03.2016 | US201615172457 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE202016008302U | 14.07.2017 | U1 | Priority number | Date | US201662301734 | 01.03.2016 | US201615172457 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Divisional application | EP3955168 |