EP3319572 - METHODS AND APPARATUSES FOR EXOSKELETON ATTACHMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rewalk Robotics Ltd. 3 Hatnufa St. 6th Floor P.O. Box 161 2069203 Yokneam / IL | [2018/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHAVIT, Avihay 14 Be'ery St. 4284200 Bat Heffer / IL | [2018/20] | Representative(s) | Cooley (UK) LLP 22 Bishopsgate London EC2N 4BQ / GB | [2024/24] |
Former [2018/20] | Cooley (UK) LLP Dashwood 69 Old Broad Street London EC2M 1QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 16820956.7 | 06.07.2016 | [2018/20] | WO2016IL50723 | Priority number, date | US201562189148P | 06.07.2015 Original published format: US 201562189148 P | [2018/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2017006322 | Date: | 12.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3319572 | Date: | 16.05.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3319572 | Date: | 12.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.02.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61H1/00, A61H1/02, A61H5/00, A61H3/00, B25J9/00 | [2019/18] | CPC: |
B25J9/0006 (EP,US);
A61H1/0255 (EP,US);
A61H1/0262 (US);
A61H3/00 (EP,US);
A61H2003/007 (US);
A61H2201/1207 (EP,US);
A61H2201/149 (EP,US);
A61H2201/1623 (EP,US);
A61H2201/1628 (EP,US);
A61H2201/164 (EP,US);
A61H2201/1642 (US);
A61H2201/1645 (EP,US);
A61H2201/165 (EP,US);
A61H2201/1652 (EP,US);
A61H2201/1676 (EP,US);
A61H2201/5007 (EP,US);
A61H2201/5058 (EP,US);
A61H2201/5061 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/20] | A61H1/00, A61H1/02, A61H5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR EXOSKELETTBEFESTIGUNG | [2018/20] | English: | METHODS AND APPARATUSES FOR EXOSKELETON ATTACHMENT | [2018/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREILS POUR FIXATION D'UN EXOSQUELETTE | [2018/20] | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2018 | Search fee paid | 29.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/20] | 29.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 12.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 12.07.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 12.07.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.07.2023 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 13.02.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 13.02.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.02.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US5665058 (YOUNG DAVID ERNEST [GB]); | [A]EP1792597 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | [A]WO2014092162 (NAT UNIV CORP NAGOYA INST TECH [JP]); | [XA]US2014174453 (PANZICA LEON TONELLI [US]) | International search | [Y]US3707963 (KEROPIAN M); | [XYA]US5665058 (YOUNG DAVID ERNEST [GB]); | [A]US2003115954 (ZEMLYAKOV VLADIMIR [US], et al); | [A]WO2014093470 (EKSO BIONICS INC [US]); | [XA]US2014174453 (PANZICA LEON TONELLI [US]); | [A]WO2015095211 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]) | by applicant | US5665058 | US2014174453 |