EP3322268 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING PRINTED CIRCUIT BOARD, AND RESIN COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/20] | PRINTED WIRING BOARD PRODUCTION METHOD AND RESIN COMPOSITION | ||
[2022/21] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.06.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company, Inc. 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8324 / JP | [2018/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOMIZAWA, Katsuya c/o Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company, Inc. Tokyo Techno Park 1-1 Niijuku 6-chome Katsushika-ku Tokyo 125-8601 / JP | 02 /
TAKAHASHI, Hiroshi c/o Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company, Inc. Tokyo Techno Park 1-1 Niijuku 6-chome Katsushika-ku Tokyo 125-8601 / JP | 03 /
SHIGA, Eisuke c/o Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company, Inc. Tokyo Techno Park 1-1 Niijuku 6-chome Katsushika-ku Tokyo 125-8601 / JP | [2018/20] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2018/20] | Application number, filing date | 16821362.7 | 04.07.2016 | [2018/20] | WO2016JP69747 | Priority number, date | JP20150135203 | 06.07.2015 Original published format: JP 2015135203 | [2018/20] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017006893 | Date: | 12.01.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3322268 | Date: | 16.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3322268 | Date: | 10.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.01.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H05K3/38, C08G73/00, C08J5/24, C08K5/541, C08L35/00, C08L101/00, H05K1/03, C09D179/08 | [2018/30] | CPC: |
C08J5/244 (EP,KR,US);
H05K1/0386 (KR);
C08L79/085 (KR,US);
C08F220/06 (KR);
C08G73/00 (EP,US);
C08G73/128 (KR,US);
C08J5/043 (KR);
C08J5/249 (EP,KR,US);
C08J7/12 (KR,US);
C08K3/22 (KR);
C08K3/36 (KR,US);
C08K5/541 (EP,KR,US);
C08K7/18 (KR,US);
C08L101/00 (EP,US);
C08L101/02 (KR);
C08L35/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08L63/00 (KR);
C09D179/085 (EP,KR,US);
C25D3/38 (KR,US);
H05K1/03 (EP,US);
H05K1/0373 (US);
H05K3/181 (KR,US);
H05K3/188 (KR,US);
H05K3/38 (EP,US);
H05K3/381 (KR);
H05K3/389 (KR,US);
C08J2379/08 (KR,US);
C08J2465/00 (KR,US);
C08L2203/20 (KR,US);
H05K2201/0162 (KR,US);
| C-Set: |
C09D179/085, C08K3/36, C08K5/5425, C08L61/14 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/20] | H05K3/38, C08G73/00, C08J5/24, C08K5/541, C08L35/00, C08L101/00, H05K1/03 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER LEITERPLATTE UND HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2022/21] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING PRINTED CIRCUIT BOARD, AND RESIN COMPOSITION | [2022/21] | French: | MÉTHODE DE PRODUCTION D'UNE CARTE DE CIRCUIT IMPRIMÉ, ET COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE | [2022/21] |
Former [2018/20] | LEITERPLATTENHERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG | ||
Former [2018/20] | PRINTED WIRING BOARD PRODUCTION METHOD AND RESIN COMPOSITION | ||
Former [2018/20] | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE CARTE DE CIRCUIT IMPRIMÉ ET COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE | Entry into regional phase | 02.02.2018 | Translation filed | 02.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 02.02.2018 | Search fee paid | 02.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/20] | 02.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.06.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 10.08.2022 | AT | 10.08.2022 | CZ | 10.08.2022 | DK | 10.08.2022 | EE | 10.08.2022 | ES | 10.08.2022 | FI | 10.08.2022 | HR | 10.08.2022 | LT | 10.08.2022 | LV | 10.08.2022 | MC | 10.08.2022 | NL | 10.08.2022 | PL | 10.08.2022 | RO | 10.08.2022 | RS | 10.08.2022 | SE | 10.08.2022 | SI | 10.08.2022 | SK | 10.08.2022 | SM | 10.08.2022 | NO | 10.11.2022 | GR | 11.11.2022 | IS | 10.12.2022 | PT | 12.12.2022 | [2024/14] |
Former [2023/37] | AL | 10.08.2022 | |
AT | 10.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SI | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 10.08.2022 | |
AT | 10.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 10.08.2022 | |
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 10.08.2022 | |
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 10.08.2022 | |
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 10.08.2022 | |
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | FI | 10.08.2022 | |
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | FI | 10.08.2022 | |
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 10.08.2022 | |
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 10.08.2022 | |
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 10.08.2022 | |
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP2733177 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1-3,7-19 * claim - * * example 2 * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0081] * * paragraph [0087] - paragraph [0088] * * paragraph [0109] * [I] 4-6; | [XP]EP3006503 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [XP] 1-3,7-19 * claim - * * example - * * paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0070] * * paragraph [0093] - paragraph [0095] ** paragraph [0104] - paragraph [0105] * | International search | [Y]JP2007299875 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [Y] 1-19 * , abstract; paragraphs [0009] to [0014]; fig. 1 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2008133414 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [Y] 2, 3 * , abstract; paragraphs [0053] to [0063], [0093] (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2012197336 (PANASONIC CORP) [Y] 4-6 * , abstract; paragraphs [0024] to [0040] (Family: none) *; | [Y]WO2013047041 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP], et al) [Y] 12* , abstract; paragraphs [0037] to [0046] & US 2014/0370771 A1 abstract; paragraphs [0024] to [0031] & TW 201323499 A & KR 10-2014-0069047 A & EP 2762507 A1 & CN 103842397 A *; | [Y]JP2013189577 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [Y] 1-19 * , abstract; paragraphs [0021] to [0027], [0041] to [0053], [0075] (Family: none) * |