EP3393432 - COSMETIC PROCESS FOR TREATING KERATIN MATERIALS WITH AN ACRYLIC POLYMER BEARING MALEIC ANHYDRIDE GROUPS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.02.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.07.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, Rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2018/44] | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LION, Bertrand 1, ave Eugène Schueller BP22 93601 Aulnay-sous-Bois / FR | 02 /
PORTAL, Julien 1, ave Eugène Schueller BP22 93601 Aulnay-sous-Bois / FR | [2020/01] |
Former [2018/44] | 01 /
LION, Bertrand 1 ave Eugène Schueller BP22 93601 Aulnay-sous-Bois / FR | ||
02 /
PORTAL, Julien 1 ave Eugène Schueller BP22 93601 Aulnay-sous-Bois / FR | Representative(s) | L'Oreal Service D.I.P.I. 9, rue Pierre Dreyfus 92110 Clichy / FR | [2020/16] |
Former [2018/44] | Rivière, François Armand L'Oréal Service DIPI 9 Rue Pierre Dreyfus 92110 Clichy / FR | Application number, filing date | 16822431.9 | 16.12.2016 | [2018/44] | WO2016EP81347 | Priority number, date | FR20150063111 | 22.12.2015 Original published format: FR 1563111 | [2018/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017108596 | Date: | 29.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3393432 | Date: | 31.10.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3393432 | Date: | 15.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/31, A61K8/41, A61Q1/02, A61Q1/06, A61Q1/10, A61K8/81, A61K8/898 | [2018/44] | CPC: |
A61K8/8141 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/8152 (KR);
A61K8/31 (EP,US);
A61K8/41 (EP,US);
A61K8/898 (EP,KR,US);
A61Q1/02 (EP,KR,US);
A61Q1/06 (EP,KR,US);
A61Q1/10 (EP,KR,US);
A61Q19/00 (US);
A61Q3/00 (KR,US);
A61Q5/00 (KR);
A61Q5/06 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOSMETISCHES VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KERATINMATERIALIEN MIT EINEM ACRYLPOLYMER MIT MALEINSÄUREANHYDRIDGRUPPEN | [2018/44] | English: | COSMETIC PROCESS FOR TREATING KERATIN MATERIALS WITH AN ACRYLIC POLYMER BEARING MALEIC ANHYDRIDE GROUPS | [2018/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉ COSMÉTIQUE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DES MATIÈRES KÉRATINIQUES À L'AIDE D'UN POLYMÈRE ACRYLIQUE PORTANT DES GROUPES ANHYDRIDE MALÉIQUE | [2018/44] | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/44] | 12.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 18.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.12.2016 | AL | 15.04.2020 | AT | 15.04.2020 | CY | 15.04.2020 | CZ | 15.04.2020 | DK | 15.04.2020 | EE | 15.04.2020 | FI | 15.04.2020 | HR | 15.04.2020 | LT | 15.04.2020 | LV | 15.04.2020 | MC | 15.04.2020 | MK | 15.04.2020 | MT | 15.04.2020 | NL | 15.04.2020 | PL | 15.04.2020 | RO | 15.04.2020 | RS | 15.04.2020 | SE | 15.04.2020 | SI | 15.04.2020 | SK | 15.04.2020 | SM | 15.04.2020 | TR | 15.04.2020 | BG | 15.07.2020 | NO | 15.07.2020 | GR | 16.07.2020 | PT | 17.08.2020 | GB | 16.12.2020 | IE | 16.12.2020 | IT | 16.12.2020 | LU | 16.12.2020 | ES | 17.12.2020 | BE | 31.12.2020 | CH | 31.12.2020 | FR | 31.12.2020 | LI | 31.12.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/32] | HU | 16.12.2016 | |
AL | 15.04.2020 | ||
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CY | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
MK | 15.04.2020 | ||
MT | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
TR | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
GB | 16.12.2020 | ||
IE | 16.12.2020 | ||
IT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LU | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 17.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
FR | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 16.12.2016 | |
AL | 15.04.2020 | ||
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CY | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
MT | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
TR | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
GB | 16.12.2020 | ||
IE | 16.12.2020 | ||
IT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LU | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 17.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
FR | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
GB | 16.12.2020 | ||
IE | 16.12.2020 | ||
IT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LU | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 17.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
FR | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
GB | 16.12.2020 | ||
IE | 16.12.2020 | ||
IT | 16.12.2020 | ||
LU | 16.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
FR | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
GB | 16.12.2020 | ||
IE | 16.12.2020 | ||
LU | 16.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
FR | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
GB | 16.12.2020 | ||
IE | 16.12.2020 | ||
LU | 16.12.2020 | ||
FR | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
IE | 16.12.2020 | ||
LU | 16.12.2020 | ||
FR | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
IE | 16.12.2020 | ||
LU | 16.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
PL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2020 | ||
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
DK | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 15.04.2020 | |
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 15.04.2020 | |
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 15.04.2020 | |
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 15.04.2020 | |
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 15.04.2020 | |
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 15.08.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5185143 (COHEN JEFFREY M [US]) [A] 1-22 * example 1 * * claim - *; | [A]US2010120931 (ZAJACZKOWSKI MICHAEL J [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * examples 11, 14, 15, 22 * * example 23; claim 1 *; | [A]FR2972630 (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1-22 * example 1 *; | [A]US2014227210 (FARCET CELINE [FR]) [A] 1-22 * example -; claim - *; | [X]US2015044790 (TSAI YU-JIE [TW]) [X] 21,22 * examples A-1-4 ** example embodiment 4 *; | [A]FR3014875 (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1-22 * example 5 * |