Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP3384294 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP16822558 EP21202223 US2016064865W US201615781089 US202318476120



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2024103012Global Dossier 28.03.2024A1
Priority number Date
US201815781089 01.06.2018
WO2016US64865 02.12.2016
US201662417284 03.11.2016
US202318476120 27.09.2023
US201562263612 04.12.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US11815514Global Dossier 14.11.2023B2
US2019277858 12.09.2019A1
Priority number Date
WO2016US64865 02.12.2016
US201615781089 02.12.2016
US201662417284 03.11.2016
US201562263612 04.12.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP4012415Global Dossier 07.12.2022A3
EP4012415 15.06.2022A2
Priority number Date
WO2016US64865 02.12.2016
US201662417284 03.11.2016
EP16822558 02.12.2016
US201562263612 04.12.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3384294Global Dossier 13.10.2021B1
EP3384294 10.10.2018A1
Priority number Date
WO2016US64865 02.12.2016
US201662417284 03.11.2016
US201562263612 04.12.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2901795T 23.03.2022T3
Priority number Date
WO2016US64865 02.12.2016
US201662417284 03.11.2016
US201562263612 04.12.2015
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2017096331Global Dossier 08.06.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201662417284 03.11.2016
US201562263612 04.12.2015
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
MA43377 19.05.2021A
Priority number Date
US201662417284 03.11.2016
US201562263612 04.12.2015
TypeType Divisional application
 EP4012415