EP3386844 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN AUTOMOTIVE STRUCTURAL PART COMPRISING A LOWERSIDE SILL AND A LOWER FRONT PILLAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.12.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.08.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.06.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ArcelorMittal 24-26 Boulevard d'Avranches 1160 Luxembourg / LU | [2018/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VIAUX, Ivan 168 Rue Marcadet 75018 Paris / FR | [2018/42] | Representative(s) | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2018/42] | Application number, filing date | 16822899.7 | 09.12.2016 | [2018/42] | WO2016EP02077 | Priority number, date | WO2015IB59484 | 09.12.2015 Original published format: PCT/IB2015/059484 | [2018/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017097425 | Date: | 15.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3386844 | Date: | 17.10.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3386844 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B21D47/01, B21D53/88, B62D25/04, B62D65/02, C21D6/02, C21D6/00, C21D9/50, C21D1/673, C22C28/00, C22C38/00, C22C38/02, C22C38/04, C22C38/06, C22C38/28, B62D25/02, B21D22/02 | [2019/32] | CPC: |
B21D22/022 (EP,KR,US);
B62D25/025 (EP,KR,US);
B21D47/01 (US);
B21D53/88 (EP,KR,US);
B62D25/02 (EP,KR,RU,US);
B62D25/04 (US);
B62D65/02 (US);
C21D1/673 (EP,KR,US);
C21D6/002 (EP,US);
C21D6/005 (EP,US);
C21D6/008 (EP,US);
C21D9/50 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/00 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/001 (EP,US);
C22C38/002 (EP,US);
C22C38/02 (EP,US);
C22C38/04 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/06 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/42] | B62D25/02, B21D22/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | 07.06.2018 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGSTRUKTURBAUTEILS MIT EINEM UNTERSEITENSCHWELLER UND EINER UNTEREN FRONTSÄULE | [2018/42] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN AUTOMOTIVE STRUCTURAL PART COMPRISING A LOWERSIDE SILL AND A LOWER FRONT PILLAR | [2018/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR PRODUIRE UNE PARTIE STRUCTURELLE D'AUTOMOBILE COMPRENANT UN BAS DE CAISSE CÔTÉ INFÉRIEUR ET UN MONTANT AVANT INFÉRIEUR | [2018/42] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/42] | 07.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.08.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.11.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 05.02.2020 | CY | 05.02.2020 | DK | 05.02.2020 | EE | 05.02.2020 | HR | 05.02.2020 | LT | 05.02.2020 | LV | 05.02.2020 | MC | 05.02.2020 | MK | 05.02.2020 | MT | 05.02.2020 | RS | 05.02.2020 | SI | 05.02.2020 | SM | 05.02.2020 | BG | 05.05.2020 | NO | 05.05.2020 | GR | 06.05.2020 | IS | 05.06.2020 | PT | 28.06.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/28] | CY | 05.02.2020 | |
DK | 05.02.2020 | ||
EE | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
MC | 05.02.2020 | ||
MT | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SI | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | DK | 05.02.2020 | |
EE | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
MC | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SI | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/13] | DK | 05.02.2020 | |
EE | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SI | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | DK | 05.02.2020 | |
EE | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 05.02.2020 | |
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 05.02.2020 | |
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | HR | 05.02.2020 | |
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | HR | 05.02.2020 | |
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | HR | 05.02.2020 | |
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | HR | 05.02.2020 | |
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
RS | 05.02.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | NO | 05.05.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH04215570 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-7 * Fig.1,2; paragraphs [0001] - [0060]; figure -; claim - *; | [A]JP2001180518 (CENTRAL MOTOR CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2011195107 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * pos.41 (outer part) mounted on pos.22 (19) (inner part) & par.39 - pos.35 is hot - stamped; paragraphs [0005] - [0074]; figure -; claim - *; | [A]JP2011195103 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102011117951 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1-7 * par.39, Fig.1 pos.20,21,25; paragraphs [0005] - [0098]; figure -; claim - *; | [A]US2012319432 (BODIN HANS [SE], et al) [A] 1-7 * Claim 1,4,5 & Fig.1 pos.15,12 & Fig.3; paragraphs [0003] - [0012]; figure -; claim - *; | [A]DE102014106356 (PORSCHE AG [DE]) [A] 1-7* the whole document * |