EP3393716 - METHOD FOR OPERATING A COMBUSTION-DRIVEN SETTING TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/44] | FUEL-OPERATED FIRING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A FIRING DEVICE OF THIS TYPE | ||
[2020/40] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.12.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.01.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.07.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Feldkircherstrasse 100 9494 Schaan / LI | [2018/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DITTRICH, Tilo Gallmiststr. 17 6800 Feldkirch / AT | 02 /
JUNG, Daniel Frankfurter Ring 160 80807 München / DE | 03 /
SCHMIDT, Dominik Chlini Grof 16 9470 Buchs / CH | 04 /
HEEB, Norbert Brunnenstrasse 19 9470 Buchs / CH | 05 /
BRUGGMUELLER, Peter Länderweg 18 6719 Bludesch / AT | [2018/44] | Representative(s) | Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Corporate Intellectual Property Feldkircherstrasse 100 Postfach 333 9494 Schaan / LI | [2018/44] | Application number, filing date | 16822977.1 | 20.12.2016 | [2018/44] | WO2016EP81917 | Priority number, date | EP20150201899 | 22.12.2015 Original published format: EP 15201899 | [2018/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017108787 | Date: | 29.06.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3393716 | Date: | 31.10.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3393716 | Date: | 03.02.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B25C1/08 | [2018/44] | CPC: |
B25C1/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES BRENNKRAFTBETRIEBENEN SETZGERÄTS | [2020/40] | English: | METHOD FOR OPERATING A COMBUSTION-DRIVEN SETTING TOOL | [2020/40] | French: | PROCEDE DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN OUTIL DE SCELLEMENT | [2020/40] |
Former [2018/44] | BRENNKRAFTBETRIEBENES SETZGERÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES DERARTIGEN SETZGERÄTS | ||
Former [2018/44] | FUEL-OPERATED FIRING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A FIRING DEVICE OF THIS TYPE | ||
Former [2018/44] | OUTIL DE POSE ACTIONNÉ PAR LA PRESSION D'UNE COMBUSTION ET PROCÉDÉ POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER UN OUTIL DE POSE DE CE TYPE | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/44] | 12.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.09.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 16.11.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.11.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 04.11.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.12.2016 | AL | 03.02.2021 | CY | 03.02.2021 | CZ | 03.02.2021 | DK | 03.02.2021 | EE | 03.02.2021 | ES | 03.02.2021 | FI | 03.02.2021 | HR | 03.02.2021 | IT | 03.02.2021 | LT | 03.02.2021 | LV | 03.02.2021 | MC | 03.02.2021 | MK | 03.02.2021 | MT | 03.02.2021 | NL | 03.02.2021 | PL | 03.02.2021 | RO | 03.02.2021 | RS | 03.02.2021 | SE | 03.02.2021 | SI | 03.02.2021 | SK | 03.02.2021 | SM | 03.02.2021 | BG | 03.05.2021 | NO | 03.05.2021 | GR | 04.05.2021 | IS | 03.06.2021 | PT | 04.06.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 20.12.2016 | |
AL | 03.02.2021 | ||
CY | 03.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
ES | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
IT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
MC | 03.02.2021 | ||
MK | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RO | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SI | 03.02.2021 | ||
SK | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 20.12.2016 | |
AL | 03.02.2021 | ||
CY | 03.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
ES | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
IT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
MC | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RO | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SI | 03.02.2021 | ||
SK | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 03.02.2021 | |
CY | 03.02.2021 | ||
CZ | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
ES | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
IT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
MC | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RO | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SI | 03.02.2021 | ||
SK | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 03.02.2021 | |
CZ | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
ES | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
IT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
MC | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RO | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SI | 03.02.2021 | ||
SK | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 03.02.2021 | |
CZ | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
ES | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
IT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RO | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SI | 03.02.2021 | ||
SK | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 03.02.2021 | |
CZ | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
ES | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RO | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SI | 03.02.2021 | ||
SK | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 03.02.2021 | |
CZ | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
ES | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RO | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SK | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 03.02.2021 | |
CZ | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
ES | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RO | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SK | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 03.02.2021 | |
CZ | 03.02.2021 | ||
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RO | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SK | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | CZ | 03.02.2021 | |
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RO | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SK | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | CZ | 03.02.2021 | |
DK | 03.02.2021 | ||
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | CZ | 03.02.2021 | |
EE | 03.02.2021 | ||
FI | 03.02.2021 | ||
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 03.02.2021 | |
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
SM | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | FI | 03.02.2021 | |
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
IS | 03.06.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | FI | 03.02.2021 | |
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
PL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | FI | 03.02.2021 | |
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
NL | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
SE | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 03.02.2021 | |
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
LV | 03.02.2021 | ||
RS | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 03.02.2021 | |
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
BG | 03.05.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
GR | 04.05.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 03.02.2021 | |
HR | 03.02.2021 | ||
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 03.02.2021 | |
LT | 03.02.2021 | ||
NO | 03.05.2021 | ||
PT | 04.06.2021 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4913331 (UTSUMI HIROMU [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, lines 6-38 * * column 5, lines 7-20 *; | [A]DE10232035 (HILTI AG [LI]) [A] 1,9,13 * paragraphs [0024] - [0029] ** figure 1 *; | [Y]US2004144357 (ADAMS JOSEPH S [CA]) [Y] 1-8 * paragraphs [0005] , [0007] *; | [A]DE10327191 (HILTI AG [LI]) [A] 1,5,9,13 * paragraphs [0028] , [0029] , [0040] *; | [YA]EP2106883 (HILTI AG [LI]) [Y] 1-8 * paragraphs [0015] - [0021] * * figure 1 * [A] 9,13 |