EP3394300 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A HIGH STRENGTH STEEL SHEET HAVING IMPROVED DUCTILITY AND FORMABILITY, AND OBTAINED STEEL SHEET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 09.09.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.09.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.07.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2022 | Opposition rejected | published on 12.10.2022 [2022/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ArcelorMittal 24-26 Boulevard d'Avranches 1160 Luxembourg / LU | [2020/19] |
Former [2018/44] | For all designated states Arcelormittal 24-26 Boulevard d'Avranches 1160 Luxembourg / LU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOSPODINOVA, Maya c/o ArcelorMittal R&D Voie Romaine BP30320 57283 Maizieres-les-Metz / FR | 02 /
HEBERT, Véronique 23 rue Charles-Louis de France 57070 Saint-Julien-les-Metz / FR | 03 /
VENKATASURYA, Pavan c/o Arcelormittal Global R&D 3001 E. Columbus Drive East Chicago, Indiana 46312 / US | [2020/20] |
Former [2018/44] | 01 /
GOSPODINOVA, Maya c/o ArcelorMittal R&D Voie Romaine BP30320 57283 Maizieres-les-Metz / FR | ||
02 /
HEBERT, Véronique 23 Rue Charles-Louis de France 57070 Saint-Julien-les-Metz / FR | |||
03 /
VENKATASURYA, Pavan c/o Arcelormittal Global R&D 3001 E. Columbus Drive East Chicago, Indiana 46312 / US | Representative(s) | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2018/44] | Application number, filing date | 16822986.2 | 20.12.2016 | [2018/44] | WO2016EP82037 | Priority number, date | WO2015IB59839 | 21.12.2015 Original published format: PCT/IB2015/059839 | [2018/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017108866 | Date: | 29.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3394300 | Date: | 31.10.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3394300 | Date: | 13.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C21D9/46, C22C38/00 | [2018/44] | CPC: |
C21D9/46 (EP,KR,RU,US);
B23K11/10 (RU);
B23K11/11 (US);
B32B15/013 (EP,US);
C21D1/18 (EP,US);
C21D6/002 (EP,US);
C21D6/005 (EP,US);
C21D6/008 (EP,US);
C21D8/02 (RU);
C21D8/0205 (EP,US);
C21D8/0226 (EP,KR,US);
C21D8/0236 (EP,KR,US);
C21D8/0247 (EP,US);
C21D8/0263 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/00 (EP,RU,US);
C22C38/02 (KR);
C22C38/04 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/06 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/22 (EP,US);
C22C38/26 (EP,US);
C22C38/34 (EP,US);
C22C38/38 (EP,US);
C23C2/06 (US);
C23C2/40 (US);
C21D2211/001 (EP,KR,US);
C21D2211/002 (EP,US);
C21D2211/005 (EP,KR,US);
C21D2211/008 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | 21.06.2018 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES HOCHFESTEN STAHLBLECHS MIT VERBESSERTER LEITFÄHIGKEIT UND VERFORMBARKEIT UND HERGESTELLTES STAHLBLECH | [2018/44] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A HIGH STRENGTH STEEL SHEET HAVING IMPROVED DUCTILITY AND FORMABILITY, AND OBTAINED STEEL SHEET | [2018/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA PRODUCTION D'UNE TÔLE D'ACIER À HAUTE RÉSISTANCE AYANT UNE DUCTILITÉ ET UNE APTITUDE AU FORMAGE AMÉLIORÉES ET TÔLE D'ACIER AINSI OBTENUE | [2018/44] | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.10.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/44] | 21.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 31.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 01.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19217801.0 / EP3656880 | EP21184063.2 / EP3910084 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.02.2021
16.02.2021
ADMISSIBLE JFE Steel Corporation Hibiya Kokusai Building 2-3 Uchisaiwa-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP Opponent's representative Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2021/12] | 02.03.2021 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 01.07.2021 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 17.05.2022 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2022/41] | 17.05.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.05.2022 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 27.05.2022 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 13.05.2020 | CY | 13.05.2020 | DK | 13.05.2020 | EE | 13.05.2020 | HR | 13.05.2020 | LT | 13.05.2020 | LV | 13.05.2020 | MC | 13.05.2020 | MK | 13.05.2020 | MT | 13.05.2020 | RS | 13.05.2020 | SI | 13.05.2020 | SM | 13.05.2020 | BG | 13.08.2020 | NO | 13.08.2020 | GR | 14.08.2020 | IS | 13.09.2020 | PT | 14.09.2020 | IE | 20.12.2020 | LU | 20.12.2020 | CH | 31.12.2020 | LI | 31.12.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
CY | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
MT | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SI | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
IE | 20.12.2020 | ||
LU | 20.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SI | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
IE | 20.12.2020 | ||
LU | 20.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SI | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
IE | 20.12.2020 | ||
LU | 20.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SI | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SI | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
SM | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 13.05.2020 | |
HR | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | HR | 13.05.2020 | |
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | HR | 13.05.2020 | |
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
RS | 13.05.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | HR | 13.05.2020 | |
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LV | 13.05.2020 | ||
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | LT | 13.05.2020 | |
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 13.05.2020 | |
NO | 13.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 13.09.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2004074575 (KASHIMA TAKAHIRO [JP], et al); | [A]WO2007142197 (KOBE STEEL LTD [JP], et al); | [A]US2009214377 (HENNIG WOLFGANG [DE], et al); | [I]JP2012041573 (NIPPON STEEL CORP); | [A]JP2012237042 (JFE STEEL CORP); | [A]EP2824210 (JFE STEEL CORP [JP]) | Opposition | EP1365037 | EP2617849 | EP2738276 | EP3034644 |