EP3393396 - METHOD FOR DESIGNING A RESTORATION AND A REDUCTION COPING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.07.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LT, NO | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3Shape A/S Holmens Kanal 7 1060 Copenhagen K / DK | [2018/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FISKER, Rune Kaplevej 87 2830 Virum / DK | [2018/44] | Representative(s) | Guardian IP Consulting I/S Diplomvej, Building 381 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | [2018/44] | Application number, filing date | 16822992.0 | 21.12.2016 | [2018/44] | WO2016EP82127 | Priority number, date | DK20150070842 | 21.12.2015 Original published format: DK 201570842 | [2018/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017108919 | Date: | 29.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3393396 | Date: | 31.10.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3393396 | Date: | 14.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61C13/00 | [2018/44] | CPC: |
A61C13/0004 (EP,US);
A61C9/004 (US);
G06F30/00 (US);
A61C19/04 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ENTWURF EINER RESTAURATION UND EINER REDUKTIONSKAPPE | [2018/44] | English: | METHOD FOR DESIGNING A RESTORATION AND A REDUCTION COPING | [2018/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CONCEPTION D'UNE RESTAURATION ET D'UNE COIFFE DE RÉDUCTION | [2018/44] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/44] | 13.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 12.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 04.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 12.07.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 12.07.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.07.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LT | 14.02.2024 | NO | 14.05.2024 | IS | 14.06.2024 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/32] | IS | 14.06.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2008220395 (MARSHALL MICHAEL C [US], et al)[A] 6-9; | [A]US2012143364 (MCLEOD RODDY [US], et al) [A] 1-11; | [A]US2014004071 (BROWN WILLIAM STEVEN [US]) [A] 6-9; | [A]US2014342302 (KOPELMAN AVI [US], et al) [A] 1-11; | [XI]US2015056576 (NIKOLSKIY SERGEY VLADIMIROVICH [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6-8,10,11 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0117] * * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0096] * [I] 3-5,9 |