Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024166558 | ![]() | 23.05.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202017034281 | 28.09.2020 | US201662320095 | 08.04.2016 | US201615376057 | 12.12.2016 | US201562266411 | 11.12.2015 | US202418411468 | 12.01.2024 | US202217953668 | 27.09.2022 | US201662365534 | 22.07.2016 | US201662364687 | 20.07.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9908811 | ![]() | 06.03.2018 | B2 | US2017349483 | 07.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715682735 | 22.08.2017 | US201662320095 | 08.04.2016 | US201615376057 | 12.12.2016 | US201562266411 | 11.12.2015 | US201662364687 | 20.07.2016 | US201662365534 | 22.07.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11878936 | ![]() | 23.01.2024 | B2 | US2023097645 | 30.03.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202017034281 | 28.09.2020 | US201662320095 | 08.04.2016 | US201615376057 | 12.12.2016 | US201562266411 | 11.12.2015 | US202217953668 | 27.09.2022 | US201662365534 | 22.07.2016 | US201662364687 | 20.07.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11472734 | ![]() | 18.10.2022 | B2 | US2021017072 | 21.01.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202017034281 | 28.09.2020 | US201662320095 | 08.04.2016 | US201615376057 | 12.12.2016 | US201562266411 | 11.12.2015 | US201662364687 | 20.07.2016 | US201662365534 | 22.07.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10787387 | ![]() | 29.09.2020 | B2 | US2017166478 | 15.06.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662320095 | 08.04.2016 | US201615376057 | 12.12.2016 | US201562266411 | 11.12.2015 | US201662364687 | 20.07.2016 | US201662365534 | 22.07.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20240019400 | ![]() | 14.02.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20227014253 | 09.12.2016 | WO2016US65932 | 09.12.2016 | US201662320095 | 08.04.2016 | US201562266411 | 11.12.2015 | US201662364687 | 20.07.2016 | US201662365534 | 22.07.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102634633B | ![]() | 08.02.2024 | B1 | KR20220061272 | 12.05.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016US65932 | 09.12.2016 | US201662320095 | 08.04.2016 | KR20197028727 | 09.12.2016 | US201562266411 | 11.12.2015 | US201662364687 | 20.07.2016 | US201662365534 | 22.07.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102393206B | ![]() | 03.05.2022 | B1 | KR20190114031 | 08.10.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016US65932 | 09.12.2016 | US201662320095 | 08.04.2016 | US201562266411 | 11.12.2015 | KR20187019570 | 09.12.2016 | US201662364687 | 20.07.2016 | US201662365534 | 22.07.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102029948B | ![]() | 27.10.2021 | B9 | KR102029948B | 08.10.2019 | B1 | KR20180090887 | 13.08.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016US65932 | 09.12.2016 | US201662320095 | 08.04.2016 | US201562266411 | 11.12.2015 | US201662364687 | 20.07.2016 | US201662365534 | 22.07.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7504172B | ![]() | 21.06.2024 | B2 | JP2022180475 | 06.12.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662320095 | 08.04.2016 | US201562266411 | 11.12.2015 | JP2021020975 | 12.02.2021 | US201662364687 | 20.07.2016 | US201662365534 | 22.07.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6839192B | ![]() | 03.03.2021 | B2 | JP2018536615 | 13.12.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016US65932 | 09.12.2016 | US201662320095 | 08.04.2016 | US201562266411 | 11.12.2015 | US201662364687 | 20.07.2016 | US201662365534 | 22.07.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3909927 | ![]() | 17.11.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016US65932 | 09.12.2016 | US201662320095 | 08.04.2016 | US201562266411 | 11.12.2015 | EP16823100 | 09.12.2016 | US201662364687 | 20.07.2016 | US201662365534 | 22.07.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN116199430 | ![]() | 02.06.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662320095 | 08.04.2016 | US201562266411 | 11.12.2015 | CN201611141439 | 12.12.2016 | US201662364687 | 20.07.2016 | US201662365534 | 22.07.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110372229 | ![]() | 25.10.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662320095 | 08.04.2016 | US201562266411 | 11.12.2015 | CN201611141439 | 12.12.2016 | US201662364687 | 20.07.2016 | US201662365534 | 22.07.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3386930 | ![]() | 16.06.2021 | B1 | EP3386930 | 17.10.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016US65932 | 09.12.2016 | US201662320095 | 08.04.2016 | US201562266411 | 11.12.2015 | US201662364687 | 20.07.2016 | US201662365534 | 22.07.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3386930T | 26.07.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2016US65932 | 09.12.2016 | US201662320095 | 08.04.2016 | US201562266411 | 11.12.2015 | US201662364687 | 20.07.2016 | US201662365534 | 22.07.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2879650T | 22.11.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2016US65932 | 09.12.2016 | US201662320095 | 08.04.2016 | US201562266411 | 11.12.2015 | US201662364687 | 20.07.2016 | US201662365534 | 22.07.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3386930T | 25.10.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2016US65932 | 09.12.2016 | US201662320095 | 08.04.2016 | US201562266411 | 11.12.2015 | EP16823100 | 09.12.2016 | US201662364687 | 20.07.2016 | US201662365534 | 22.07.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017100646 | ![]() | 15.06.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662320095 | 08.04.2016 | US201562266411 | 11.12.2015 | US201662364687 | 20.07.2016 | US201662365534 | 22.07.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7145251B | ![]() | 30.09.2022 | B2 | JP2021075461 | 20.05.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662320095 | 08.04.2016 | US201562266411 | 11.12.2015 | US201662364687 | 20.07.2016 | US201662365534 | 22.07.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106866000 | ![]() | 20.06.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662320095 | 08.04.2016 | US201562266411 | 11.12.2015 | US201662364687 | 20.07.2016 | US201662365534 | 22.07.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN206986034U | 09.02.2018 | U | Priority number | Date | US201662320095 | 08.04.2016 | US201562266411 | 11.12.2015 | US201662364687 | 20.07.2016 | US201662365534 | 22.07.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE202016008722U | 21.03.2019 | U1 | Priority number | Date | US201662320095 | 08.04.2016 | US201562266411 | 11.12.2015 | US201662364687 | 20.07.2016 | US201662365534 | 22.07.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE202016008995U | 20.04.2021 | U1 | Priority number | Date | US201662320095 | 08.04.2016 | US201562266411 | 11.12.2015 | US201662364687 | 20.07.2016 | US201662365534 | 22.07.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI675810B | 01.11.2019 | B | TW201731788 | 16.09.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662320095 | 08.04.2016 | US201562266411 | 11.12.2015 | US201662364687 | 20.07.2016 | US201662365534 | 22.07.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI697463B | 01.07.2020 | B | TW202010718 | 16.03.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662320095 | 08.04.2016 | US201562266411 | 11.12.2015 | US201662364687 | 20.07.2016 | US201662365534 | 22.07.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI739442B | 11.09.2021 | B | TW202110762 | 16.03.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662320095 | 08.04.2016 | US201562266411 | 11.12.2015 | US201662364687 | 20.07.2016 | US201662365534 | 22.07.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI773480B | 01.08.2022 | B | TW202146350 | 16.12.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662320095 | 08.04.2016 | US201562266411 | 11.12.2015 | US201662364687 | 20.07.2016 | US201662365534 | 22.07.2016 | Type | ![]() | EP3909927 |