EP3323504 - SCR CATALYST FOR REMOVING NITROGEN OXIDES AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.02.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.01.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.09.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hyundai Heavy Industries Co., Ltd. 1000 Bangeojinsunhwando-ro Dong-gu Ulsan 682-792 / KR | [2018/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUNG, Sam Kyung 1000 Bangeojinsunhwando-ro Dong-gu Ulsan 44032 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Sang Ek 1000 Bangeojinsunhwando-ro Dong-gu Ulsan 44032 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Do Yun 1000 Bangeojinsunhwando-ro Dong-gu Ulsan 44032 / KR | 04 /
KIM, Hyun Soo 1000 Bangeojinsunhwando-ro Dong-gu Ulsan 44032 / KR | 05 /
CHUNG, Mong Kyu 1000 Bangeojinsunhwando-ro Dong-gu Ulsan 44032 / KR | 06 /
PARK, Chan Do 1000 Bangeojinsunhwando-ro Dong-gu Ulsan 44032 / KR | [2018/21] | Representative(s) | Stepney, Gregory John Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [2022/34] |
Former [2018/21] | Stepney, Gregory John Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 16824692.4 | 11.07.2016 | [2018/21] | WO2016KR07520 | Priority number, date | KR20150100674 | 15.07.2015 Original published format: KR 20150100674 | [2018/21] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017010775 | Date: | 19.01.2017 | Language: | KO | [2017/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3323504 | Date: | 23.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3323504 | Date: | 24.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.01.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/22, B01J23/30, B01J21/06, B01J37/00 | [2018/21] | CPC: |
B01J23/30 (EP,US);
B01D53/8628 (EP);
B01D53/9418 (EP,US);
B01J21/06 (US);
B01J21/063 (EP);
B01J21/16 (US);
B01J23/22 (EP,US);
B01J23/28 (US);
B01J35/19 (US);
B01J37/00 (US);
B01J37/04 (US);
B01J37/08 (US);
B01D2255/20707 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20723 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20769 (US);
B01D2255/20776 (EP,US);
B01D2255/40 (EP);
B01D2257/404 (EP);
B01J2229/42 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCR-KATALYSATOR ZUR ENTFERNUNG VON STICKSTOFFOXIDEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2018/21] | English: | SCR CATALYST FOR REMOVING NITROGEN OXIDES AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | [2018/21] | French: | CATALYSEUR DE RÉDUCTION CATALYTIQUE SÉLECTIVE POUR L'ÉLIMINATION D'OXYDES D'AZOTE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | [2018/21] | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.2018 | Translation filed | 07.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2018 | Search fee paid | 07.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/21] | 07.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 20.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.06.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 25.05.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 24.08.2022 | AT | 24.08.2022 | CZ | 24.08.2022 | EE | 24.08.2022 | ES | 24.08.2022 | HR | 24.08.2022 | IT | 24.08.2022 | LT | 24.08.2022 | LV | 24.08.2022 | MC | 24.08.2022 | NL | 24.08.2022 | PL | 24.08.2022 | RO | 24.08.2022 | RS | 24.08.2022 | SE | 24.08.2022 | SI | 24.08.2022 | SK | 24.08.2022 | SM | 24.08.2022 | NO | 24.11.2022 | GR | 25.11.2022 | IS | 24.12.2022 | PT | 26.12.2022 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/14] | AL | 24.08.2022 | |
AT | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
MC | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SI | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 24.08.2022 | |
AT | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SI | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 24.08.2022 | |
AT | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 24.08.2022 | |
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 24.08.2022 | |
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | HR | 24.08.2022 | |
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | HR | 24.08.2022 | |
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | HR | 24.08.2022 | |
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | HR | 24.08.2022 | |
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | LT | 24.08.2022 | |
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | LT | 24.08.2022 | |
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2014170032 (YANG HEE-SUNG [KR], et al) [X] 1,3-9 * paragraphs [0002] , [0009]; examples 1,2 *[I] 2 | International search | [A]US5415850 (YANG RALPH T [US], et al) [A] 1-9* See abstract, claims 1-11; and figure 1. *; | [Y]JP2001300309 (HYUN DAI HEAVY IND CO LTD) [Y] 3, 4, 7 * See abstract, and paragraph [0039]. *; | [A]KR20060099611 (HYUN DAI HEAVY IND CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-9 * See abstract; and claims 1-14. *; | [XY]KR20080075145 (TENNECO AUTOMOTIVE OPERATING [US]) [X] 1, 2, 5, 6, 8, 9 * See paragraphs [0028], [0029] and [0034]; and claims 1 and 2. * [Y] 3, 4, 7; | [A] - CHAE, HO JEONG et al., "Selective Catalytic Reduction of NOx by NH3 over V2O5/Ti-PILC Catalyst", Chemical Engineering, (20000000), vol. 38, no. 6, pages 783 - 790, XP055347275 [A] 1-9 * See abstract, and page 783, left column, line 1-page 784, right column, line 16. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02706390 |