EP3322448 - A NOVEL APPROACH FOR TREATMENT OF CANCER USING IMMUNOMODULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.02.2020 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OnkosXcel Therapeutics, LLC 555 Long Wharf Drive, 12th Floor New Haven, CT 06511 / US | [2023/13] |
Former [2018/21] | For all designated states Bioxcel Therapeutics, Inc. 780 East Main Street Branford, CT 06405 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEHTA, Vimal D. 47 Leighton Trail Guilford, Connecticut 06437 / US | 02 /
RASTELLI, Luca 11 Laurelwood Drive Norwell, Massachusetts 02061 / US | 03 /
SAPRA, Aparna Katoch 19 Taxila IIT Delhi New Delhi 110016 / IN | [2018/21] | Representative(s) | Cooley (UK) LLP 22 Bishopsgate London EC2N 4BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/21] | Cooley (UK) LLP Dashwood 69 Old Broad Street London EC2M 1QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 16825310.2 | 18.07.2016 | [2018/21] | WO2016US42798 | Priority number, date | US201562193348P | 16.07.2015 Original published format: US 201562193348 P | US201562204495P | 13.08.2015 Original published format: US 201562204495 P | [2018/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017011831 | Date: | 19.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3322448 | Date: | 23.05.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.01.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.01.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K45/08, A61K38/04, C07K16/24, C12N15/11 | [2018/21] | CPC: |
A61K31/69 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
A61K31/198 (RU);
A61K39/3955 (CN,KR,US);
A61K31/40 (RU);
A61K38/04 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/395 (RU);
A61K39/39541 (EP,KR,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,CN,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,CN,KR,RU);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P35/04 (CN);
A61P37/04 (EP,RU);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K16/2818 (EP,KR,US);
C12N15/1137 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2039/545 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/21 (KR,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/69, A61K2300/00 (US,CN,EP);
A61K39/39541, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K39/3955, A61K2300/00 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/21] | Extension states | BA | 16.02.2018 | ME | 16.02.2018 | Validation states | MA | 16.02.2018 | Title | German: | NEUARTIGES VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS MIT IMMUNMODULATION | [2018/21] | English: | A NOVEL APPROACH FOR TREATMENT OF CANCER USING IMMUNOMODULATION | [2018/21] | French: | NOUVELLE APPROCHE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER PAR IMMUNOMODULATION | [2018/21] | Entry into regional phase | 16.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.2018 | Search fee paid | 16.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 16.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/21] | 16.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2008066729 (POINT THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al) [Y] 7-16 * the whole document *; | [XY]US2015125447 (HEIDER KARL-HEINZ [AU]) [X] 1-6 * paragraph [0085] * * paragraph [0087] *[Y] 7-16 | International search | [XY]US2014271725 (BACHOVCHIN WILLIAM W [US]) [X] 1, 2, 5, 7, 9, 11 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0067], [0070], [0145], [0147], [0148], [0150], [0154]), * [Y] 6, 28, 29; | [XY]WO2014144600 (ROSCHKE VIKTOR [US], et al) [X] 8, 21, 22 * ; paragraphs [0017], [0019], [0277], [0331], [0336], [0632], [0636], * [Y] 6, 30; | [Y]US2014335048 (STOGNIEW MARTIN [US], et al) [Y] 30* ; paragraph [0031] *; | [Y] - JANSEN, KOEN et al., "Selective Inhibitors of Fibroblast Activation Protein (FAP) with a (4- Quinolinoyl)-glycyl-2-cyanopyrrolidine Scaffold", ACS Medicinal Chemistry Letters, (20130318), vol. 4, pages 491 - 496, XP055186472 [Y] 28, 29 * , second column, second paragraph; page 2, first column, first paragraph * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ml300410d | [Y] - WALSH, MEGHAAN et al., "Val-BoroPro Accelerates T Cell Priming via Modulation of Dendritic Cell Trafficking Resulting in Complete Regression of Established Murine Tumors", PLOS One, (20130300), vol. 8, no. Issue 3, pages 1 - 13, XP055344567 [Y] 1, 4, 10, 23 * , e58860; abstract; page 9, fist column, second paragraph, figure 9 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0058860 | [Y] - FEIG, CHRISTINE et al., "Targeting CXCL12 from FAP-expressing carcinomaassociated fibroblasts synergizes with anti-PD-L1 immunotherapy in pancreatic cancer", PNAS, (20130000), vol. 110, no. 50, pages 20212 - 20217, XP002760317 [Y] 1, 4, 10, 23 * ; abstract; page 20212, second column, first paragraph, figure 3D, E * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1320318110 |