EP3243073 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING CONTINUOUS CHROMATOGRAPHY AND MULTI-COLUMN CHROMATOGRAPHY ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/46] | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING CONTINUOUS CHROMATOGRAPHY AND MULTI-COLUMN CHROMATOGRAPHY ARRANGEMENT | ||
[2018/16] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.02.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.05.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.10.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.06.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | Change: Date of oral proceedings | 01.03.2024 | Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Karlsruher Institut für Technologie Kaiserstrasse 12 76131 Karlsruhe / DE | [2017/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUBBUCH, Jürgen Bruckner Straße 7b 76327 Pfinztal / DE | 02 /
BRESTRICH, Nina Horburgstrasse 114 4057 Basel / CH | 03 /
RÜDT, Matthias Welfenstr. 14a 76137 Karlsruhe / DE | 04 /
ROLINGER, Laura Zur Kopp 27 66706 Perl / DE | [2019/11] |
Former [2017/46] | 01 /
HUBBUCH, Jürgen Bruckner Straße 7b 76327 Pfinztal / DE | ||
02 /
BRESTRICH, Nina Henriette-Obermüller-Strasse 15 76137 Karlsruhe / DE | |||
03 /
RÜDT, Matthias Kriegststrasse 187 76135 Karlsruhe / DE | |||
04 /
ROLINGER, Laura Zur Kopp 27 66706 Perl / DE | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2017/46] | Application number, filing date | 16825323.5 | 25.11.2016 | [2017/46] | WO2016EP01995 | Priority number, date | EP20150196599 | 26.11.2015 Original published format: EP 15196599 | [2017/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017088979 | Date: | 01.06.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3243073 | Date: | 15.11.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3243073 | Date: | 13.03.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01N30/86, G01N30/88, G01N30/46 | [2017/46] | CPC: |
B01D15/1871 (EP,US);
B01D15/1814 (EP,US);
G01N30/46 (EP,US);
G01N30/74 (US);
G01N30/78 (EP,US);
G01N30/86 (EP,US);
G01N30/8658 (US);
G01N30/8675 (US);
G01N2030/8831 (EP,US);
G01N2201/129 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG KONTINUIERLICHER CHROMATOGRAPHIE UND MULTISÄULEN-CHROMATOGRAPHIE-ANORDNUNG | [2017/46] | English: | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING CONTINUOUS CHROMATOGRAPHY AND MULTI-COLUMN CHROMATOGRAPHY ASSEMBLY | [2018/16] | French: | PROCEDE DE COMMANDE DE CHROMATOGRAPHIE EN CONTINU ET AGENCEMENT DE CHROMATOGRAPHIE MULTICOLONNE | [2018/16] |
Former [2017/46] | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING CONTINUOUS CHROMATOGRAPHY AND MULTI-COLUMN CHROMATOGRAPHY ARRANGEMENT | ||
Former [2017/46] | PROCÉDÉ POUR CONTRÔLER UNE CHROMATOGRAPHIE CONTINUE ET ENSEMBLE DE CHROMATOGRAPHIE MULTI-COLONNES | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.2017 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.08.2017 | Examination requested [2017/46] | 09.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 13.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.11.2018 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 16.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.10.2019
11.10.2019
WITHDRAWN Bayer AG / Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 1 / Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 51373 Leverkusen / 40789 Monheim / DE Opponent's representative BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | 02
13.12.2019
17.12.2019
ADMISSIBLE Aechter, Bernd Nymphenburgerstrasse 4 80335 München / DE Opponent's representative Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2023/15] |
Former [2020/04] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.10.2019
11.10.2019
ADMISSIBLE Bayer AG / Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 1 / Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 51373 Leverkusen / 40789 Monheim / DE Opponent's representative BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | ||
02
13.12.2019
17.12.2019
ADMISSIBLE Aechter, Bernd Nymphenburgerstrasse 4 80335 München / DE Opponent's representative Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | |||
Former [2019/46] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.10.2019
ADMISSIBLE Bayer AG / Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 1 / Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 51373 Leverkusen / 40789 Monheim / DE Opponent's representative BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | 07.01.2020 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 02.06.2020 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 02.12.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.01.2022 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 13.01.2022 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | Appeal following opposition | 23.03.2022 | Appeal received No. T0758/22 | 23.03.2022 | Payment of appeal fee | 23.05.2022 | Statement of grounds filed | 27.11.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2018 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.01.2019 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.11.2016 | AL | 13.03.2019 | CY | 13.03.2019 | CZ | 13.03.2019 | DK | 13.03.2019 | EE | 13.03.2019 | ES | 13.03.2019 | FI | 13.03.2019 | HR | 13.03.2019 | IT | 13.03.2019 | LT | 13.03.2019 | LV | 13.03.2019 | MC | 13.03.2019 | MK | 13.03.2019 | MT | 13.03.2019 | NL | 13.03.2019 | PL | 13.03.2019 | RO | 13.03.2019 | RS | 13.03.2019 | SE | 13.03.2019 | SI | 13.03.2019 | SK | 13.03.2019 | SM | 13.03.2019 | TR | 13.03.2019 | BG | 13.06.2019 | NO | 13.06.2019 | GR | 14.06.2019 | IS | 13.07.2019 | PT | 13.07.2019 | IE | 25.11.2019 | LU | 25.11.2019 | BE | 30.11.2019 | AT | 25.11.2021 | [2023/07] |
Former [2022/32] | HU | 25.11.2016 | |
AL | 13.03.2019 | ||
CY | 13.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
MC | 13.03.2019 | ||
MK | 13.03.2019 | ||
MT | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SI | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
TR | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
IE | 25.11.2019 | ||
LU | 25.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/34] | HU | 25.11.2016 | |
AL | 13.03.2019 | ||
CY | 13.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
MC | 13.03.2019 | ||
MT | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SI | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
TR | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
IE | 25.11.2019 | ||
LU | 25.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 25.11.2016 | |
AL | 13.03.2019 | ||
CY | 13.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
MC | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SI | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
TR | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
IE | 25.11.2019 | ||
LU | 25.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
CY | 13.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
MC | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SI | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
TR | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
IE | 25.11.2019 | ||
LU | 25.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
MC | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SI | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
TR | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
IE | 25.11.2019 | ||
LU | 25.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
MC | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SI | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
TR | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
IE | 25.11.2019 | ||
LU | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
MC | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SI | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
TR | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
LU | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SI | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
TR | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
LU | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SI | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
TR | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SI | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
DK | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
IS | 13.07.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
PL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
SM | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 13.03.2019 | |
CZ | 13.03.2019 | ||
EE | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 13.03.2019 | ||
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RO | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
SK | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 13.03.2019 | |
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 13.03.2019 | |
FI | 13.03.2019 | ||
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | FI | 13.03.2019 | |
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
IT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 13.03.2019 | |
HR | 13.03.2019 | ||
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
LV | 13.03.2019 | ||
NL | 13.03.2019 | ||
RS | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 13.03.2019 | |
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
BG | 13.06.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 13.03.2019 | |
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
GR | 14.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 13.03.2019 | |
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
SE | 13.03.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 13.03.2019 | |
LT | 13.03.2019 | ||
NO | 13.06.2019 | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO0045929 (CPBD INC [US]) [X] 12-14 * figure 5; claim 3 * * page 27, lines 20-22; claim 12 * * page 31, lines 4-6 * * page 23, lines 26-27 * * page 46, lines 9-14 * * page 18, lines 15-20 * * page 48, lines 21-28 * * page 40, lines 13-19 * [Y] 1-11; | [A]WO2004106915 (WATERS INVESTMENTS LTD [US], et al) [A] 1,12 * page 4, paragraph 3; figure 7; claims 1,2 *; | [Y]DE102010047427 (KARLSRUHER INST TECHNOLOGIE [DE]) [Y] 1-11 * claims 1,2-6,11 * * paragraphs [0031] - [0032] *; | [A]US2014251913 (LACKI KAROL [SE], et al) [A] 1,12 * figures 1,5,11; claims 1,20 * * paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0057] * | [YA] - BORTOLATO SANTIAGO A ET AL, "Chemometric processing of second-order liquid chromatographic data with UV-vis and fluorescence detection. A comparison of multivariate curve resolution and parallel factor analys", ANALYTICA CHIMICA ACTA, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20140714), vol. 842, doi:10.1016/J.ACA.2014.07.007, ISSN 0003-2670, pages 11 - 19, XP029045047 [Y] 1,5 * abstract * * page 18, column r * [A] 12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.aca.2014.07.007 | [YA] - GARCIA-MARTIN S ET AL, "Solid-phase microextraction gas chromatography-mass spectrometry (HS-SPME-GC-MS) determination of volatile compounds in orujo spirits: Multivariate chemometric characterisation", FOOD CHEMISTRY, ELSEVIER LTD, NL, vol. 118, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.FOODCHEM.2009.04.105, ISSN 0308-8146, (20100115), pages 456 - 461, (20090503), XP026497695 [Y] 1 * abstract * * page 460, column r, paragraph 4 * [A] 12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.foodchem.2009.04.105 | Opposition | WO0045929 | WO2010019814 | WO2012045396 | US5457260 | WO2004106915 | US7606681 | US2009312851 | WO2010151214 | DE102010047427 | WO2014166799 | - Abel, S. et al, "Optimizing control of simulated moving beds -experimental implementation", Journal of Chromatography A, (20050000), vol. 1092, pages 2 - 16, XP005091366 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.chroma.2005.04.101 | - HARYNUK et al., "Application of Chemometrics Published online to the Interpretation of Analytical Separations", Chemometrics in Practical Applications, (20120323), XP055650806 | - SANTIAGO A. BORTOLATO et al., "Chemometric processing of second-order liquid Chromatographie data with UV-vis and fluorescence detection. A comparison of multivariate curve resolution and parallel factor analysis 2", Analytica Chimica Acta, (2014), vol. 842, pages 11 - 19, XP029045047 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.aca.2014.07.007 | - S. GARCIA-MARTIN et al., "Solid-phase microextraction gas chromato- graphy-mass spectrometry (HS-SPME-GC-MS) determination of volatile compounds in orujo spirits: Multivariate chemometric characterisation", FOOD CHEMISTRY,, (2010), vol. 118, no. 2, pages 456 - 461, XP026497695 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.foodchem.2009.04.105 | - N. BRESTRICH et al., "A Tool for Selective Inline Quantification of Co- Eluting Proteins in Chromatography Using Spectral Analysis and Partial Least Squares", Biotechnology and Bioengineering, (20140700), vol. 111, no. 7, pages 1365 - 1373, XP055663656 | - N. BRESTRICH et al., "Advances in Inline Quantification of Co-Eluting Pro- teins in Chromatography: Process-Data-Based Model Calibration and Ap- plication Towards Real-Life Separation Issues", Biotechnology and Bioengineering, (20150700), vol. 112, no. 7, pages 1406 - 1416, XP055663660 | - C. ÜNDEY et al., "Applied advanced process analytics in biopharmaceutical manufacturing: Challenges and prospects in real-time monitoring and control", Journal of Process Control, (20100000), vol. 20, pages 1009 - 1018, XP027265910 |