EP3390139 - METHOD FOR IMPLEMENTING POWER SUPPLY PROCEDURES FROM AT LEAST ONE POWER SUPPLY UNIT TO A PLURALITY OF MOTOR VEHICLES TO BE SUPPLIED WITH POWER AND POWER SUPPLY UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/43] | METHOD FOR IMPLEMENTING POWER SUPPLY PROCEDURES FROM AT LEAST ONE POWER SUPPLY UNIT TO A PLURALITY OF MOTOR VEHICLES TO BE SUPPLIED WITH POWER | ||
[2022/37] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.01.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.09.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.06.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volkswagen AG Berliner Ring 2 38440 Wolfsburg / DE | For all designated states KUKA Deutschland GmbH Zugspitzstraße 140 86165 Augsburg / DE | [2018/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHÜTZ, Daniel Schwester-Ella-Weg 31 38165 Lehre/Essenrode / DE | 02 /
GROTE, Michael Stralsunder Str.10 38518 Gifhorn / DE | 03 /
STIEG, Jürgen Dessauer Ring 14a 38550 Isenbüttel / DE | 04 /
JUNGE, Lutz Gliesmaroder Straße 92 38106 Braunschweig / DE | 05 /
HORSTMANN, Sven Treitschkestraße 8 12163 Berlin / DE | 06 /
BAGDONAT, Thorsten Mittelweg 96 38106 Braunschweig / DE | 07 /
GRYSCZYK, Sebastian Leonhardstr. 58 38102 Braunschweig / DE | 08 /
WEISER, Andreas Rosental 11 38114 Braunschweig / DE | 09 /
SETTELE, Norbert Rosenweg 13 86574 Petersdorf-Willprechtszell / DE | [2018/43] | Representative(s) | Zucker, Volker Patentanwälte Bressel und Partner mbB Potsdamer Platz 10 10785 Berlin / DE | [2018/43] | Application number, filing date | 16825724.4 | 19.12.2016 | [2018/43] | WO2016EP81680 | Priority number, date | DE201510225986 | 18.12.2015 Original published format: DE102015225986 | [2018/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017103250 | Date: | 22.06.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3390139 | Date: | 24.10.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3390139 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/06] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP3390139 | Date: | 22.03.2023 | [2023/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B60L53/30, B67D7/04, B60L53/35, B60L53/37 | [2022/34] | CPC: |
B60L53/30 (EP,US);
B60L53/37 (EP,KR,US);
B60L53/305 (KR);
B60L53/35 (EP,KR,US);
B67D7/0401 (EP,KR,US);
B60Y2200/91 (KR);
B60Y2200/92 (KR);
B67D2007/0473 (EP,KR,US);
Y02T10/70 (EP,US);
Y02T10/7072 (EP,KR,US);
Y02T90/12 (EP,US);
Y02T90/14 (EP,KR,US);
Y02T90/16 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/43] | B60L11/18, B67D7/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/09] |
Former [2018/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG VON ENERGIEVERSORGUNGSVORGÄNGEN ZWISCHEN WENIGSTENS EINER ENERGIEVERSORGUNGSEINHEIT UND MEHREREN MIT ENERGIE ZU VERSORGENDEN KRAFTFAHRZEUGEN, SOWIE ENERGIEVERSORGUNGSEINHEIT | [2022/37] | English: | METHOD FOR IMPLEMENTING POWER SUPPLY PROCEDURES FROM AT LEAST ONE POWER SUPPLY UNIT TO A PLURALITY OF MOTOR VEHICLES TO BE SUPPLIED WITH POWER AND POWER SUPPLY UNIT | [2022/37] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'EXÉCUTION DE PROCESSUS D'ALIMENTATION EN ÉNERGIE ENTRE AU MOINS UNE UNITÉ D'ALIMENTATION EN ÉNERGIE ET PLUSIEURS VÉHICULES AUTOMOBILES DEVANT ÊTRE ALIMENTÉS EN ÉNERGIE ET UNITÉ D'ALIMENTATION EN ÉNERGIE | [2022/37] |
Former [2018/43] | VERFAHREN ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG VON ENERGIEVERSORGUNGSVORGÄNGEN ZWISCHEN WENIGSTENS EINER ENERGIEVERSORGUNGSEINHEIT UND MEHREREN MIT ENERGIE ZU VERSORGENDEN KRAFTFAHRZEUGEN | ||
Former [2018/43] | METHOD FOR IMPLEMENTING POWER SUPPLY PROCEDURES FROM AT LEAST ONE POWER SUPPLY UNIT TO A PLURALITY OF MOTOR VEHICLES TO BE SUPPLIED WITH POWER | ||
Former [2018/43] | PROCÉDÉ D'EXÉCUTION DE PROCESSUS D'ALIMENTATION EN ÉNERGIE ENTRE AU MOINS UNE UNITÉ D'ALIMENTATION EN ÉNERGIE ET PLUSIEURS VÉHICULES AUTOMOBILES DEVANT ÊTRE ALIMENTÉS EN ÉNERGIE | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/43] | 14.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.12.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 09.11.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 08.02.2023 | DK | 08.02.2023 | EE | 08.02.2023 | ES | 08.02.2023 | FI | 08.02.2023 | HR | 08.02.2023 | IT | 08.02.2023 | LT | 08.02.2023 | LV | 08.02.2023 | MC | 08.02.2023 | NL | 08.02.2023 | PL | 08.02.2023 | RO | 08.02.2023 | RS | 08.02.2023 | SE | 08.02.2023 | SI | 08.02.2023 | SK | 08.02.2023 | SM | 08.02.2023 | NO | 08.05.2023 | GR | 09.05.2023 | IS | 08.06.2023 | PT | 09.06.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/26] | CZ | 08.02.2023 | |
DK | 08.02.2023 | ||
EE | 08.02.2023 | ||
ES | 08.02.2023 | ||
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
IT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
PL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RO | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
SE | 08.02.2023 | ||
SI | 08.02.2023 | ||
SK | 08.02.2023 | ||
SM | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.05.2023 | ||
IS | 08.06.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | CZ | 08.02.2023 | |
DK | 08.02.2023 | ||
EE | 08.02.2023 | ||
ES | 08.02.2023 | ||
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
PL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RO | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
SE | 08.02.2023 | ||
SI | 08.02.2023 | ||
SK | 08.02.2023 | ||
SM | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.05.2023 | ||
IS | 08.06.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | CZ | 08.02.2023 | |
DK | 08.02.2023 | ||
EE | 08.02.2023 | ||
ES | 08.02.2023 | ||
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
PL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RO | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
SE | 08.02.2023 | ||
SK | 08.02.2023 | ||
SM | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.05.2023 | ||
IS | 08.06.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | CZ | 08.02.2023 | |
DK | 08.02.2023 | ||
EE | 08.02.2023 | ||
ES | 08.02.2023 | ||
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
PL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RO | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
SE | 08.02.2023 | ||
SM | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.05.2023 | ||
IS | 08.06.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | DK | 08.02.2023 | |
EE | 08.02.2023 | ||
ES | 08.02.2023 | ||
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
PL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
SE | 08.02.2023 | ||
SM | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.05.2023 | ||
IS | 08.06.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | DK | 08.02.2023 | |
ES | 08.02.2023 | ||
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
PL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
SE | 08.02.2023 | ||
SM | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.05.2023 | ||
IS | 08.06.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | ES | 08.02.2023 | |
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
PL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
SE | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.05.2023 | ||
IS | 08.06.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | ES | 08.02.2023 | |
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
PL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
SE | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.05.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | ES | 08.02.2023 | |
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
SE | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
GR | 09.05.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | ES | 08.02.2023 | |
FI | 08.02.2023 | ||
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
LV | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
SE | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | ES | 08.02.2023 | |
HR | 08.02.2023 | ||
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
NL | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
NO | 08.05.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 08.02.2023 | |
LT | 08.02.2023 | ||
RS | 08.02.2023 | ||
PT | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 08.02.2023 | |
LT | 08.02.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9403391 (BRAZZELLI GIAN CARLO [IT], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract *; | [A]EP2500888 (KAPSCH TRAFFICCOM AG [AT]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE102012216980 (GM GLOBAL TECH OPERATIONS INC [US], et al) [AD] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US2013338820 (CORBETT ADRIAN [US], et al) [A] 1-9* the whole document *; | [X]US2014305545 (BUTLER JR CHARLES ROLAND [US]) [X] 8 * abstract * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0067] *; | [A]US2015042278 (LEARY KEVIN WALTER [US]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US9056555 (ZHOU WESLEY [US]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | Examination | EP2332772 | WO2015126320 | WO2016096194 |