EP3389723 - COMPOSITION FOR TREATMENT OF CRIGLER-NAJJAR SYNDROME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.11.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.06.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Trustees of The University of Pennsylvania 3160 Chestnut Street Suite 200 Philadelphia, PA 19104 / US | [2018/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TRETIAKOVA, Anna, P. 28 Central Street Woburn, MA 01801 / US | 02 /
SIDRANE, Jenny, Agnes 1280 W. Evergreen Drive Phoenixville, PA 19460 / US | 03 /
WILSON, James, M. 1831 Delancey Street Philadelphia, PA 19103 / US | [2018/43] | Representative(s) | Pohlman, Sandra M. df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | [2018/43] | Application number, filing date | 16825943.0 | 14.12.2016 | [2018/43] | WO2016US66657 | Priority number, date | US201562266969P | 14.12.2015 Original published format: US 201562266969 P | US201662348029P | 09.06.2016 Original published format: US 201662348029 P | [2018/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017106345 | Date: | 22.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3389723 | Date: | 24.10.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.06.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K48/00, C12N9/10, C12N15/864, A61P1/16 | [2018/43] | CPC: |
A61K48/0058 (EP,IL,US);
C12N9/1051 (EP,IL,US);
A61K35/761 (IL,US);
A61K48/0008 (IL,US);
A61P1/16 (EP,IL,US);
C12N15/62 (EP,IL,US);
C12Y204/01017 (EP,IL,US);
C12N2750/14143 (EP,IL,US);
C12N2810/6027 (EP,IL,US);
C12N2830/008 (EP,IL,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/43] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON CRIGLER-NAJJAR-SYNDROM | [2018/43] | English: | COMPOSITION FOR TREATMENT OF CRIGLER-NAJJAR SYNDROME | [2018/43] | French: | COMPOSITION POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU SYNDROME DE CRIGLER-NAJJAR | [2018/43] | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/43] | 12.07.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division to which search results under Rule 164(2) EPC are annexed (Time limit: M06) [2020/01] | 27.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO03052051 (UNIV PENNSYLVANIA [US], et al); | [A]WO2014151341 (UNIV PENNSYLVANIA [US]); | [I]WO2015162302 (GENETHON [FR], et al); | by applicant | US5139941 | US5478745 | US5741683 | US6057152 | US6204059 | US6268213 | US6491907 | EP1310571 | WO03042397 | US6660514 | WO2005033321 | US6951753 | US7094604 | WO2006110689 | US7172893 | US2007036760 | US7201898 | US7229823 | US7282199 | US7439065 | US2009197338 | US7588772 | US7790449 | US7906111 | WO2011126808 | US8319480 | WO2013004943 | US2013045186 | WO2015013313 | US8962330 | US8962332 | WO2016US65976 | WO2016US65974 | WO2016US66013 | WO2016US65970 |