EP3390045 - LAMINATED WINDSHIELD FOR A VEHICLE, COMPRISING AN INTERNAL LUMINOUS SIGNAGE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.10.2022 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.06.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.11.2022 [2022/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAINT-GOBAIN GLASS FRANCE Tour Saint-Gobain 12 place de l'Iris 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2020/24] |
Former [2018/43] | For all designated states Saint-Gobain Glass France 18 Avenue d'Alsace 92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LALUET, Jean-Yves 14 rue Petit 75019 Paris / FR | [2018/43] | Representative(s) | Saint-Gobain Recherche B.P. 135 39, quai Lucien Lefranc 93303 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | [2018/43] | Application number, filing date | 16826093.3 | 13.12.2016 | [2018/43] | WO2016FR53367 | Priority number, date | FR20150062515 | 16.12.2015 Original published format: FR 1562515 | [2018/43] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017103427 | Date: | 22.06.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3390045 | Date: | 24.10.2018 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B32B17/10, C03C27/12, F21V33/00 | [2018/43] | CPC: |
B32B17/10541 (EP,KR,US);
B32B17/10018 (EP,KR,US);
B32B17/10036 (EP,KR,US);
B32B17/10174 (EP,KR,US);
B32B17/10348 (EP,KR,US);
B32B17/10761 (EP,KR,US);
B32B17/1077 (EP,KR,US);
B32B17/10788 (EP,KR,US);
B60J1/02 (US);
B60K35/00 (EP,US);
B60K35/23 (EP,US);
B60K35/60 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/43] | Title | German: | VERBUNDGLASSCHEIBE MIT EINEM INTERNEN LEUCHTENDEN BESCHILDERUNGSSYSTEM FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG | [2018/43] | English: | LAMINATED WINDSHIELD FOR A VEHICLE, COMPRISING AN INTERNAL LUMINOUS SIGNAGE SYSTEM | [2018/43] | French: | PARE-BRISE FEUILLETÉ DE VÉHICULE AVEC SIGNALÉTIQUE LUMINEUSE INTERNE | [2018/43] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/43] | 30.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/48] | 27.07.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2022/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2021 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE102004016808 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 1,2,7,14-17 * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0049]; figure 3; claims 1,6,8,9 *; | [A]EP2592331 (VALEO VISION [FR]) [A] 1* figures 19-23; claims 1-5 *; | [YD]WO2013093351 (SAINT GOBAIN [FR]) [YD] 1,2,7,14-17 * figure 2; claims 1,12-14 *; | [A]EP2719531 (SCHMID HOLZBAU GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-17 * figures 14-16; claims 1-4,6,7,10 *; | [A]DE102013014340 (DIEHL AEROSPACE GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - * |