EP3325108 - TRAINING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.05.2021 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Left Hand Design Ltd. 3 Dvora Hanevia Street 3609174 Kiryat Tivon / IL | [2018/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VENTURA, Asaf, Avraham 3 Dvora Hanevia Street 3609174 Kiryat Tivon / IL | [2018/22] | Representative(s) | Colombo, Stefano Paolo, et al Marchi & Partners S.r.l. Via Vittor Pisani, 13 20124 Milano / IT | [2018/22] | Application number, filing date | 16827371.2 | 21.07.2016 | [2018/22] | WO2016IL50799 | Priority number, date | US201562194909P | 21.07.2015 Original published format: US 201562194909 P | [2018/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017013659 | Date: | 26.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3325108 | Date: | 30.05.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 26.01.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A63B21/06, A63B23/12, A63B23/035, A63B21/00 | [2018/22] | CPC: |
A63B21/0084 (EP,US);
A63B21/00065 (EP,US);
A63B21/00069 (EP,US);
A63B21/0606 (EP,US);
A63B21/0626 (EP,US);
A63B21/154 (EP,US);
A63B21/16 (EP,US);
A63B21/169 (EP,US);
A63B21/4034 (EP,US);
A63B21/4035 (EP,US);
A63B21/4043 (EP,US);
A63B22/001 (EP,US);
A63B22/0605 (EP,US);
A63B23/03541 (EP,US);
A63B23/03575 (EP,US);
A63B23/1209 (EP,US);
F16B47/006 (EP,US);
A63B21/225 (EP,US);
A63B2208/03 (EP,US);
A63B2210/50 (EP,US);
A63B2225/05 (EP,US);
A63B2225/055 (EP,US);
A63B2225/093 (EP,US);
A63B2225/60 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/22] | Title | German: | ÜBUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2018/22] | English: | TRAINING APPARATUS | [2018/22] | French: | APPAREIL D'ENTRAÎNEMENT | [2018/22] | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2018 | Search fee paid | 24.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/22] | 24.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/26] | 23.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2019 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   29.01.2020 | 31.07.2020 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5601514 (HORN TOM [US]) [X] 1,2,4-7,15 * column 5 - column 8; figure - * [Y] 3; | [Y]US8157713 (SISKOWIC STEVE [US], et al) [Y] 3 * column 4 - column 6; figure - *; | [X]US3014723 (BUTLER CHARLES E) [X] 1,15 * column 2 - column 3; figure - *; | [X]US3051117 (HUNTER JR OMER BENJAMIN) [X] 1,15 * column 2 - column 3; figure - *; | [X]US4519783 (BURKE JR EARL P [US]) [X] 1,15 * column 3 - column 9; figure - * | International search | [X]US5665039 (WASSERMAN JACK F [US], et al) [X] 28 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1020205 (SOGEIS S R L [IT]) [A] 1-39 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9322002 (ROWE VICTOR LOPEZ [US]) [A] 1-39 * the whole document * |