EP3306979 - USER TERMINAL, WIRELESS BASE STATION, AND WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DOCOMO, INC. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2018/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKEDA, Kazuki c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO, INC. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 02 /
UCHINO, Tooru c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO, INC. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 03 /
NAGATA, Satoshi c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO, INC. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2018/15] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2018/15] | Application number, filing date | 16827636.8 | 08.07.2016 | [2018/15] | WO2016JP70305 | Priority number, date | JP20150142930 | 17.07.2015 Original published format: JP 2015142930 | [2018/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017014074 | Date: | 26.01.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3306979 | Date: | 11.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.01.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04W28/04, H04W28/06, H04W72/12, H04L5/00, H04L1/18 | [2019/07] | CPC: |
H04L1/1854 (EP,US);
H04W28/04 (EP,KR,US);
H04W72/0446 (US);
H04L1/1864 (EP,US);
H04L1/1887 (EP,US);
H04L1/1896 (EP,US);
H04L5/0055 (US);
H04W28/06 (EP,KR,US);
H04W72/12 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/15] | H04W28/04, H04W28/06, H04W72/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/15] | Title | German: | BENUTZERENDGERÄT, DRAHTLOSE BASISSTATION UND DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN | [2018/15] | English: | USER TERMINAL, WIRELESS BASE STATION, AND WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHOD | [2018/15] | French: | TERMINAL D'UTILISATEUR, STATION DE BASE SANS FIL, ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2018/15] | Entry into regional phase | 03.01.2018 | Translation filed | 03.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 03.01.2018 | Search fee paid | 03.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/15] | 03.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/11] | Divisional application(s) | EP21154517.3 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP3261379 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [E] 1-5,9,10 * figures 13,14 ** paragraphs [0026] , [ 76 ] , [0077] *; | [XA] - LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES, "Variable Delay ACK/NACK Feedback", 3GPP DRAFT; 12A010064, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20020128), vol. RAN WG1, no. Sophia Antipolis, France; 20020128, XP050111131 [X] 1,9,10 * figure 1 * * Section 2 - Variable Delay ACK/NACK Feedback *; pages 1,2 * [A] 2-8 | International search | [A]JP2009506679 (Qualcomm Inc.) [A] 1-10* , paragraphs [0046] to [0054]; fig. 8 & WO 2007/025160 A2 paragraphs [0059] to [0067]; fig. 8 & US 2007/0047485 A1 & CN 101292456 A & KR 10-2008-0032656 A *; | [A] - ERICSSON, "Areas for reducing latency", 3GPP TSG- RAN WG2#90, R2-152415, (20150529), XP050972421 [A] 1-10 | [A] - HUAWEI, HISILICON, "Motivation of New SI Proposal Latency Reduction", 3GPP TSG-RAN#67, RP-150238, (20150312), XP050932028 [A] 1-10 |