EP3328047 - IMAGE FORMING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.02.2020 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyocera Document Solutions Inc. 1-2-28, Tamatsukuri Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-8585 / JP | [2018/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIKUCHI Ryota c/o KYOCERA Document Solutions Inc. 1-2-28 Tamatsukuri Chuo-ku Osaka-Shi Osaka 540-8585 / JP | [2018/22] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/22] | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstraße 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16827664.0 | 12.07.2016 | [2018/22] | WO2016JP70539 | Priority number, date | JP20150143282 | 17.07.2015 Original published format: JP 2015143282 | [2018/22] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017014104 | Date: | 26.01.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3328047 | Date: | 30.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.01.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/00, H04N1/32, H04N1/00, G03B27/62, G03G21/00, H04N1/23, H04N1/047 | [2019/11] | CPC: |
H04N1/00718 (EP,US);
G03G15/5016 (EP,US);
G03G15/5029 (EP,US);
G03G15/55 (EP,US);
G03G15/6567 (EP,US);
H04N1/00 (US);
H04N1/00708 (EP,US);
H04N1/0074 (EP,US);
H04N1/047 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/22] | H04N1/00, G03B27/62, G03G15/00, G03G21/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/22] | Title | German: | BILDERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2018/22] | English: | IMAGE FORMING DEVICE | [2018/22] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FORMATION D'IMAGE | [2018/22] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2017 | Translation filed | 19.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 19.02.2018 | Search fee paid | 19.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/22] | 12.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/11] | 18.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2005019075 (ADACHI KOJI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * figures 1,2,10 * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraphs [0120] - [0123] * * paragraphs [0132] - [0137] * [Y] 7 [I] 2-6; | [Y]US2009237741 (KURAHASHI MASAHIRO [JP]) [Y] 7 * abstract * * figures 1,3,19 * * paragraphs [0040] , [0069] , [0115] * | International search | [A]JP2005033559 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * , paragraphs [0121], [0155]; fig. 13, 18 & US 2005/0050423 A1 paragraphs [0142], [0180]; fig. 13, 18A, 18B & US 2006/0207355 A1 & US 2007/0113692 A1 *; | [A]JP2013117573 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * , paragraph [0059]; fig. 12 (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH0971338 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * , paragraphs [0034] to [0035], [0061]; fig. 3 (Family: none) * |