EP3327089 - FUNCTIONAL PARTICLE PIGMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Pencil Company, Limited 5-23-37, Higashi-Ohi, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-8537 / JP | [2023/52] |
Former [2018/22] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Pencil Co., Ltd. 23-37, Higashi Ohi 5-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-8537 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ICHIKAWA Shuji c/o MITSUBISHI PENCIL COMPANY LIMITED Yokohama Jigyousho 2-5-12 Irie Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-8550 / JP | [2018/22] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2018/22] | Application number, filing date | 16827704.4 | 14.07.2016 | [2018/22] | WO2016JP70825 | Priority number, date | JP20150143171 | 17.07.2015 Original published format: JP 2015143171 | [2018/22] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017014144 | Date: | 26.01.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3327089 | Date: | 30.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.01.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C09B67/08, C09C3/10, C09D11/037, C09B67/02, C09B67/00 | [2019/11] | CPC: |
C09B67/0013 (EP,US);
C09B67/0032 (US);
C09B67/0077 (EP,US);
C09B67/0097 (EP,US);
C09C3/10 (EP,US);
C09D11/52 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/22] | C09B67/08, C09C3/10, C09D11/037 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/22] | Title | German: | FUNKTIONSPARTIKELPIGMENT | [2018/22] | English: | FUNCTIONAL PARTICLE PIGMENT | [2018/22] | French: | PIGMENT PARTICULAIRE FONCTIONNEL | [2018/22] | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.2018 | Translation filed | 12.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.2018 | Search fee paid | 12.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/22] | 11.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPH05107749 (BROTHER IND LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0009] - [0025] * [I] 2; | [X]JPH10217617 (OJI PAPER CO) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0008] - [0098] * * abstract *; | [X]JPH10236005 (OJI PAPER CO) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * paragraphs [0009] - [0089] *; | [XI]JP2002137541 (ASAHI OPTICAL CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] - [0038] * [I] 2; | [XI]JP2002144737 (ASAHI OPTICAL CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] - [0038] *[I] 2 | International search | [A]JPS59170852 (CANON KK) [A] 1-2 * , claims; page 4, upper left column, line 19 to lower left column, line 11 (Family: none) *; | [XA]WO8808300 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]) [X] 1 * , claims; page 7, lines 15 to 18; example 1 & JP 2-504025 A & US 4861627 A & EP 358677 A1 * [A] 2; | [A]JPH057767 (SAKURA COLOR PROD CORP) [A] 1-2 * , claims & US 5180637 A *; | [XA]JPH05107749 (BROTHER IND LTD) [X] 1 * , claims; paragraphs [0014] to [0015]; fig. 1 (Family: none) * [A] 2; | [A]JP2002113483 (NIPPON ZEON CO) [A] 1-2* , claims; paragraph [0055] (Family: none) *; | [XA]JP2002137541 (ASAHI OPTICAL CO LTD) [X] 1 * , claims; paragraphs [0025] to [0026]; examples (Family: none) * [A] 2; | [XA]JP2002144737 (ASAHI OPTICAL CO LTD) [X] 1 * , claims; paragraphs [0025] to [0026]; examples (Family: none) * [A] 2; | [A]JP2003313453 (MATSUI SHIKISO CHEM CO LTD) [A] 1-2 * , claims; paragraph [0020] (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2004337839 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [A] 1-2 * , claims; paragraph [0041] & US 2004/0265589 A1 *; | [XA]WO2006137393 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1 * , claims; paragraphs [0024] to [0025], [0036], [0151] & US 2009/0214834 A1 paragraphs [0098] to [0099], [0157], [0284] to [0288]; claims & EP 1905803 A1 & CN 101208395 A * [A] 2; | [A]JP2008293017 (XEROX CORP) [A] 1-2 * , fig. 1, 2 & US 2008/0291526 A1 & EP 1995630 A1 & CN 101311807 A & KR 10-2008-0103928 A & TW 200907524 A * |