EP3289640 - HIGH SPEED PLUG [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.11.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.07.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sentinel Connector Systems, Inc. 1953 Stanton Street York, PA 17404 / US | [2018/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAGNER, Justin 2468 Croll School Road York, Pennsylvania 17403 / US | [2018/10] | Representative(s) | Bartle Read Liverpool Science Park 131 Mount Pleasant Liverpool L3 5TF / GB | [2018/10] | Application number, filing date | 16828196.2 | 23.06.2016 | [2018/10] | WO2016US38992 | Priority number, date | US201562195027P | 21.07.2015 Original published format: US 201562195027 P | US201514952458 | 25.11.2015 Original published format: US201514952458 | [2018/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017014902 | Date: | 26.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3289640 | Date: | 07.03.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3289640 | Date: | 14.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 26.01.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/6595, H01R13/6596, H01R13/66, H05K1/02, H05K1/11, // H01R4/2416 | [2021/15] | CPC: |
H05K1/0215 (EP,IL,US);
H01R12/71 (IL,KR);
H01R12/00 (IL,US);
H01R12/50 (IL,US);
H01R13/46 (IL,KR);
H01R13/6581 (IL,US);
H01R13/6595 (EP,IL,US);
H01R13/6596 (EP,IL,US);
H01R13/665 (IL,US);
H01R13/6658 (EP,IL,US);
H01R4/2416 (EP,IL,US);
H01R4/66 (IL,KR);
H01R43/00 (IL,US);
H01R43/20 (IL,US);
H05K1/0216 (IL,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/49] | H01R13/6595, H01R13/6596, H01R13/66, H05K1/02, // H01R4/2416 | ||
Former IPC [2018/10] | H01R12/71, H01R4/66, H01R13/46 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOCHGESCHWINDIGKEITSSTECKER | [2018/10] | English: | HIGH SPEED PLUG | [2018/10] | French: | FICHE À GRANDE VITESSE | [2018/10] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2017 | Search fee paid | 10.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/10] | 10.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 16.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.11.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/47] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 16.10.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 16.10.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.10.2020 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 09.12.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 09.12.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.12.2019 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 09.12.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 09.12.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.12.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2019 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.08.2019 | 30.06.2022 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   18.10.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 14.12.2022 | AT | 14.12.2022 | CZ | 14.12.2022 | DK | 14.12.2022 | EE | 14.12.2022 | ES | 14.12.2022 | FI | 14.12.2022 | HR | 14.12.2022 | IT | 14.12.2022 | LT | 14.12.2022 | LV | 14.12.2022 | MC | 14.12.2022 | NL | 14.12.2022 | PL | 14.12.2022 | RO | 14.12.2022 | RS | 14.12.2022 | SE | 14.12.2022 | SI | 14.12.2022 | SK | 14.12.2022 | SM | 14.12.2022 | NO | 14.03.2023 | GR | 15.03.2023 | IS | 14.04.2023 | PT | 14.04.2023 | IE | 23.06.2023 | LU | 23.06.2023 | BE | 30.06.2023 | CH | 30.06.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/24] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
DK | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
MC | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SI | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
IE | 23.06.2023 | ||
LU | 23.06.2023 | ||
BE | 30.06.2023 | ||
CH | 30.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
DK | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
MC | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SI | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
IE | 23.06.2023 | ||
LU | 23.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/15] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
DK | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
MC | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SI | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
LU | 23.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
DK | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
MC | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SI | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
DK | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SI | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
DK | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
IS | 14.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
PL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SK | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 14.12.2022 | |
AT | 14.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 14.12.2022 | |
CZ | 14.12.2022 | ||
EE | 14.12.2022 | ||
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RO | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | EE | 14.12.2022 | |
ES | 14.12.2022 | ||
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
PT | 14.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 14.12.2022 | |
FI | 14.12.2022 | ||
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
SM | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | FI | 14.12.2022 | |
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
NL | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/27] | FI | 14.12.2022 | |
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
RS | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/24] | FI | 14.12.2022 | |
HR | 14.12.2022 | ||
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | FI | 14.12.2022 | |
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
LV | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
GR | 15.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | FI | 14.12.2022 | |
LT | 14.12.2022 | ||
SE | 14.12.2022 | ||
NO | 14.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 14.12.2022 | |
NO | 14.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2014349496 (ZHU JIAN-JUN [CN], et al) [Y] 1-8 * paragraph [0020]; figures 2-4 *; | [Y]US2015017837 (ROBINSON BRETT D [US]) [Y] 1-8* paragraph [0046]; figures 4A-6A * | International search | [A]JP2004039635 (MOLEX INC) [A] 1-20* See paragraphs [0010]-[0019] and figure 2. *; | [A]US2009209114 (LUETTERMANN DIETER [DE], et al) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0038]-[0040], claim 1 and figure 3. *; | [A]US2014051288 (SMINK RUTGER [BE], et al) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0023]-[0030], claims 1-3 and figures 1-3. *; | [A]US2014073183 (GOLKO ALBERT J [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0015]-[0028] and figures 1A-3. *; | [A]US2014349496 (ZHU JIAN-JUN [CN], et al) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0020]-[0021], claim 1 and figure 2. * | by applicant | US2014349496 | US2015017837 |