EP3325462 - LYSYL OXIDASE-LIKE 2 INHIBITORS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pharmakea, Inc. 3030 Bunker Hill Street Suite 300 San Diego, California 92109 / US | [2018/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROWBOTTOM, Martin W. 8389 Reagan Glen San Diego, California 92127 / US | 02 /
HUTCHINSON, John Howard 1262 Upas Street San Diego, California 92103 / US | [2018/22] | Representative(s) | Campabadal Monfa, Gemma Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati LLP Rue Montoyer 47 1000 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/22] | Campabadal i Monfà, Gemma Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati LLP Rue Montoyer 47 1000 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 16828373.7 | 18.07.2016 | [2018/22] | WO2016US42826 | Priority number, date | US201562196203P | 23.07.2015 Original published format: US 201562196203 P | [2018/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017015221 | Date: | 26.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3325462 | Date: | 30.05.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 26.01.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07D311/22, C07D405/04, A61K31/352, A61K31/4155, C07D405/06, C07D405/12, C07D409/12 | [2019/25] | CPC: |
C07D311/22 (EP,US);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
C07D405/04 (EP,US);
C07D405/06 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/22] | C07D311/22, C07D405/04, A61K31/352, A61K31/4155 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/22] | Extension states | BA | 09.01.2018 | ME | 09.01.2018 | Title | German: | LYSYLOXIDASE-LIKE-2-INHIBITOREN UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2018/22] | English: | LYSYL OXIDASE-LIKE 2 INHIBITORS AND USES THEREOF | [2018/22] | French: | INHIBITEURS DE LA LYSYL OXYDASE-LIKE 2 ET UTILISATIONS DESDITS INHIBITEURS | [2018/22] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2018 | Search fee paid | 09.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/22] | 09.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.09.2018 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 19.10.2018 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 18.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/32] | 27.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2019 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US2011230550 (MCDONALD ANDREW [US], et al) [X] 1-5, 24 * See abstract; and paragraphs [0010]-[0022], [0066], [0079], [0104], [0122], [0176]. *; | [A]US2012059001 (MUTHUPPALANIAPPAN MEYYAPPAN [IN], et al) [A] 1-5, 24 * See abstract; and paragraphs [0025]-[0035]. *; | [A]US2015087699 (RAMAN JAYARAMAN V [IN], et al) [A] 1-5, 24 * See abstract; and page 2, Table 1. * | [A] - BILLONES, J. B. et al., "Structure-based design of inhibitors against Maltosyltransferase GlgE", Oriental Journal of Chemistry, (20140000), vol. 30, no. 3, pages 1137 - 1145, XP 055350231 [A] 1-5, 24 * See abstract; and page 1141, Table 3. * | [A] - USHASRI, S. et al., "Synthesis, Antioxidant and Antimicrobial Activity of New Series of 3-Substituted Chromen-4-One Derivatives", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL AND CHEMICAL SCIENCES, (20130000), vol. 2, no. 2, pages 634 - 639, XP009508453 [A] 1-5, 24 * See abstract; and page 637. * |