Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP3325488 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3325488



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






All documents(41)
Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 647
29.04.2021 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
06.07.2020 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
28.05.2020 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
14.05.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.05.2020 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
14.05.2020 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
14.05.2020 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
09.01.2020 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
09.01.2020 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
09.01.2020 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
09.01.2020 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 96
09.01.2020 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 96
10.12.2019 Examination started Search / examination 1
22.10.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
22.10.2019 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
10.05.2019 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
15.04.2019 Submission concerning change of applicant's name Search / examination 2
12.04.2019 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
26.03.2019 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
26.03.2019 European search opinion Search / examination 3
26.03.2019 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
26.03.2019 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
13.03.2019 Search started Search / examination 1
23.10.2018 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
23.10.2018 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
03.05.2018 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
18.04.2018 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
26.02.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
26.02.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
26.02.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
26.02.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
26.02.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
26.02.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
12.02.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.02.2018 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
05.02.2018 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
04.12.2017 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
14.02.2017 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 119
14.02.2017 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 146
26.01.2017 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
26.01.2017 Published international application - A1 Search / examination 118