EP3393391 - DEVICE FOR INTRAOPERATIVE IMAGE-GUIDED NAVIGATION DURING SURGICAL INTERVENTIONS IN THE VICINITY OF THE SPINE AND THE ADJOINING THORACIC, PELVIC OR HEAD AREA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/44] | DEVICE FOR INTRAOPERATIVE IMAGE-CONTROLLED NAVIGATION DURING SURGICAL PROCEDURES IN THE REGION OF THE SPINAL COLUMN AND IN THE ADJACENT REGIONS OF THE THORAX, PELVIS OR HEAD | ||
[2022/23] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.05.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.07.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SpineMind AG Alter Postplatz 2 6370 Stans / CH | [2018/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JESZENSZKY, Dezsö János Seestrasse 176 8700 Küsnacht / CH | 02 /
FEKETE, Tamás Fülöp Münchhaldenstrasse 15 8008 Zürich / CH | [2022/44] |
Former [2018/44] | 01 /
JESZENSZKY, Dezsö János Grundwiesstrasse 27 8700 Küsnacht / CH | ||
02 /
FEKETE, Tamás Fülöp Münchhaldenstrasse 15 8008 Zürich / CH | Representative(s) | EGLI-EUROPEAN PATENT ATTORNEYS Giesshübelstrasse 62 8045 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2022/44] | EGLI-EUROPEAN PATENT ATTORNEYS Giesshübelstrasse 62 8045 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2018/44] | EGLI-EUROPEAN PATENT ATTORNEYS Horneggstrasse 4 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 16829399.1 | 15.12.2016 | [2018/44] | WO2016CH00155 | Priority number, date | EP20150405076 | 22.12.2015 Original published format: EP 15405076 | [2018/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017106980 | Date: | 29.06.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3393391 | Date: | 31.10.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3393391 | Date: | 02.11.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B90/00, A61B34/20 | [2018/44] | CPC: |
A61B90/36 (EP,US);
A61B34/20 (US);
A61B34/10 (US);
A61B34/25 (US);
A61B5/0507 (US);
A61B6/5247 (US);
A61B8/0875 (US);
A61B8/12 (US);
A61B8/4245 (US);
A61B8/5253 (US);
A61B8/5261 (US);
A61B90/39 (US);
A61B17/1757 (US);
A61B2034/107 (US);
A61B2034/2051 (EP,US);
A61B2034/2055 (US);
A61B2034/2072 (US);
A61B2090/364 (EP,US);
A61B2090/365 (EP,US);
A61B2090/371 (EP,US);
A61B2090/373 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG FÜR DIE INTRAOPERATIVE BILDGESTEUERTE NAVIGATION BEI CHIRURGISCHEN EINGRIFFEN IM BEREICH DER WIRBELSÄULE UND IM DARAN ANGRENZENDEN THORAX-, BECKEN- ODER KOPFBEREICH | [2018/44] | English: | DEVICE FOR INTRAOPERATIVE IMAGE-GUIDED NAVIGATION DURING SURGICAL INTERVENTIONS IN THE VICINITY OF THE SPINE AND THE ADJOINING THORACIC, PELVIC OR HEAD AREA | [2022/25] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR LA NAVIGATION GUIDÉE PAR IMAGE INTRA-OPÉRATOIRE LORS D'INTERVENTIONS CHIRURGICALES DANS LA RÉGION DE LA COLONNE VERTÉBRALE ET DANS LA ZONE ADJACENTE DU THORAX, DU BASSIN OU DE LA TÊTE | [2022/25] |
Former [2018/44] | DEVICE FOR INTRAOPERATIVE IMAGE-CONTROLLED NAVIGATION DURING SURGICAL PROCEDURES IN THE REGION OF THE SPINAL COLUMN AND IN THE ADJACENT REGIONS OF THE THORAX, PELVIS OR HEAD | ||
Former [2018/44] | DISPOSITIF DE NAVIGATION INTRA-OPÉRATOIRE GUIDÉE PAR L'IMAGE LORS D'OPÉRATIONS CHIRURGICALES DANS LA RÉGION DE LA COLONNE VERTÉBRALE ET DANS LA RÉGION ADJACENTE DU THORAX, DU BASSIN OU DE LA TÊTE | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/44] | 16.07.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.09.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.12.2016 | AL | 02.11.2022 | BG | 02.11.2022 | CY | 02.11.2022 | CZ | 02.11.2022 | DK | 02.11.2022 | EE | 02.11.2022 | FI | 02.11.2022 | HR | 02.11.2022 | LT | 02.11.2022 | LV | 02.11.2022 | MC | 02.11.2022 | MK | 02.11.2022 | MT | 02.11.2022 | PL | 02.11.2022 | RO | 02.11.2022 | RS | 02.11.2022 | SI | 02.11.2022 | SK | 02.11.2022 | SM | 02.11.2022 | IE | 15.12.2022 | LU | 15.12.2022 | GR | 03.02.2023 | IS | 02.03.2023 | PT | 02.03.2023 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/34] | HU | 15.12.2016 | |
AL | 02.11.2022 | ||
BG | 02.11.2022 | ||
CY | 02.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
MC | 02.11.2022 | ||
MK | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SI | 02.11.2022 | ||
SK | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
IE | 15.12.2022 | ||
LU | 15.12.2022 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2024/29] | HU | 15.12.2016 | |
AL | 02.11.2022 | ||
CY | 02.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
MC | 02.11.2022 | ||
MK | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SI | 02.11.2022 | ||
SK | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
IE | 15.12.2022 | ||
LU | 15.12.2022 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 15.12.2016 | |
AL | 02.11.2022 | ||
CY | 02.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
MK | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SI | 02.11.2022 | ||
SK | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
IE | 15.12.2022 | ||
LU | 15.12.2022 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 15.12.2016 | |
AL | 02.11.2022 | ||
CY | 02.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SI | 02.11.2022 | ||
SK | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
IE | 15.12.2022 | ||
LU | 15.12.2022 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 15.12.2016 | |
AL | 02.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SI | 02.11.2022 | ||
SK | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
IE | 15.12.2022 | ||
LU | 15.12.2022 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SI | 02.11.2022 | ||
SK | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
IE | 15.12.2022 | ||
LU | 15.12.2022 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SK | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
IE | 15.12.2022 | ||
LU | 15.12.2022 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SK | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
LU | 15.12.2022 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | CZ | 02.11.2022 | |
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | DK | 02.11.2022 | |
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | DK | 02.11.2022 | |
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | FI | 02.11.2022 | |
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/24] | FI | 02.11.2022 | |
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | FI | 02.11.2022 | |
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | FI | 02.11.2022 | |
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 02.11.2022 | Cited in | International search | [XI]DE10015826 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-7,9,14-16,18,19 * paragraphs [0019] - [0033]; figures 1,2 * [I] 3,8,10-13,17,20; | [XI]US2009318756 (FISHER JAMES BRIAN [US], et al) [X] 1,3-7,9,14,15 * paragraphs [0015] - [0023] - [0029]; figures 1,2,5 *[I] 2,8,10-13,16-20; | [XI]WO2013001031 (SCOPIS GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-9,14-20 * page 12, line 29 - page 15, line 11; figures 1-5 * [I] 10-13 | by applicant | WO9611624 |