EP3329359 - QUANTUM RANDOM NUMBER GENERATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.2021 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.08.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.05.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Triad National Security, LLC Los Alamos National Laboratory P.O. Box 1663, MS A187 Los Alamos, NM 87545 / US | [2018/51] |
Former [2018/23] | For all designated states Los Alamos National Security, LLC Los Alamos National Laboratory PPO. Box 1663 LC/IP MS A187 Los Alamos, NM 87545 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NORDHOLT, Jane, Elizabeth 1193 San Ildefonso Los Alamos, NM 87544 / US | 02 /
HUGHES, Richard, John 1193 San Ildefonso Los Alamos, NM 87544 / US | 03 /
NEWELL, Raymond, Thorson 1944 Thomas Avenue Santa Fe, NM 87505 / US | 04 /
PETERSON, Charles, Glen 1670 Solana Los Alamos, NM 87544 / US | 05 /
ROSIEWICZ, Alexander 36 Treaty Elm Lane Stow, MA 01775 / US | [2018/23] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2018/23] | Application number, filing date | 16831127.2 | 22.07.2016 | [2018/23] | WO2016US43561 | Priority number, date | US201514812623 | 29.07.2015 Original published format: US201514812623 | [2018/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017019507 | Date: | 02.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3329359 | Date: | 06.06.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3329359 | Date: | 09.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.02.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F7/58 | [2018/23] | CPC: |
G06F7/588 (EP,KR);
H04L9/0852 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | QUANTENZUFALLSZAHLENGENERATOREN | [2018/23] | English: | QUANTUM RANDOM NUMBER GENERATORS | [2018/23] | French: | GÉNÉRATEURS QUANTIQUES DE NOMBRES ALÉATOIRES | [2018/23] | Entry into regional phase | 16.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.2018 | Search fee paid | 16.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/23] | 16.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.08.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP20186875.9 / EP3745254 | Opposition(s) | 10.06.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.07.2016 | AL | 09.09.2020 | AT | 09.09.2020 | CY | 09.09.2020 | CZ | 09.09.2020 | DK | 09.09.2020 | EE | 09.09.2020 | FI | 09.09.2020 | HR | 09.09.2020 | LT | 09.09.2020 | LV | 09.09.2020 | MC | 09.09.2020 | MK | 09.09.2020 | MT | 09.09.2020 | PL | 09.09.2020 | RO | 09.09.2020 | RS | 09.09.2020 | SE | 09.09.2020 | SI | 09.09.2020 | SK | 09.09.2020 | SM | 09.09.2020 | BG | 09.12.2020 | NO | 09.12.2020 | GR | 10.12.2020 | IS | 09.01.2021 | PT | 11.01.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 22.07.2016 | |
AL | 09.09.2020 | ||
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CY | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
MK | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 22.07.2016 | |
AL | 09.09.2020 | ||
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CY | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 22.07.2016 | |
AL | 09.09.2020 | ||
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 09.09.2020 | |
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2012045053 (QI BING [CA], et al) [X] 1,5-7,11-15 * paragraphs [0013] , [0029] - [0075] *; | [X]US2012221615 (CERF NICOLAS [BE], et al) [X] 1,5-7,11-15 * paragraphs [0030] - [0056] *; | [A] - STIPCEVIC M ET AL, "Quantum random number generator based on photonic emission in semiconductors", REVIEW OF SCIENTIFIC INSTRUMENTS, AIP, MELVILLE, NY, US, (20070409), vol. 78, no. 4, doi:10.1063/1.2720728, ISSN 0034-6748, pages 45104 - 45104, XP012103926 [A] 1-15 * section I-III * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.2720728 | [A] - YOU-QI NIE ET AL, "68 Gbps quantum random number generation by measuring laser phase fluctuations", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20150602), doi:10.1063/1.4922417, XP080794253 [A] 1-15 * section I * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.4922417 | International search | [Y]US5986790 (OTA TAKESHI [JP], et al) [Y] 9-10 and 25-26 * , entire document especially Abstract; col 3, In 60 to col 4, In 45 *; | [Y]US2005007666 (KUZNETSOV MARK E [US]) [Y] 11-13 and 27-29 * , entire document especially Abstract; Para [0011], [0084]-[0087] *; | [Y]US2012200422 (DUNCAN ROGER GLEN [US], et al) [Y] 6-7 and 22-23 * , entire document especially Abstract; Para [0025], [0029]-[0031] *; | [XY]US2012221615 (CERF NICOLAS [BE], et al) [X] 1, 14-17 and 30-32 * , entire document especially Abstract; Para [0020], [0031], [0035], [0048]-[0050] * [Y] 2-13 and 18-29; | [Y]US2013336651 (BATO KOJI [JP], et al) [Y] 2-8 and 18-24 * , entire document especially Abstract; Para [0027], [0036]-[0040], [0051] *; | [A]WO2014058150 (SK TELECOM CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-32 * , entire document *; | [A] - MARTIN et al., "Quantum random number generation for 1.25 GHz quantum key distribution systems.", Journal of Lightwave Technology, vol. 33, no. Issue: 13, (20150701), URL: htto:/IieeexDIore.ieee.orq/document/70813571, (20161015), XP011583086 [A] 1-32 * . entire document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JLT.2015.2416914 | by applicant | US2012221615 | - P. L'ECUYERR. SIMARD, "TestUOl: A C library for empirical testing of random number generators", ACM Transactions on Mathematical Software (TOMS, (20070800), vol. 33, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1145/1268776.1268777, XP055147077 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1268776.1268777 | - J. VON NEUMANN, "Various techniques used in connection with random digits", Appl. Math. Ser., Notes by G. E. Forstyle, Nat. Bur. Stad., (19510000), vol. 12, pages 36 - 38 | - U. V. VAZIRANI, "Towards a Strong Communication Complexity Theory or Generating Quasi-random sequences from two communicating semi-random sources", 15th Annual ACM Symp. on Theory of Computing, (19830000), pages 366 - 378 | - M. BLUM, "Independent Unbiased Coin Flips from a Correlated Biased Source - A Finite State Markov Chain", Combinatorica, (19850214), vol. 6, no. 2, pages 97 - 109 | - Recommendation for Random Number Generation Using Deterministic Random Bit Generators, National Institute of Standards and Technology Special Publication, (20130000), pages 800 - 90 A | - D. R. STINSON, "Universal hash families and the left-over hash lemma, and applications to cryptography and computing", J. Combin. Math. Combin. Comput., (20020000), vol. 42, no. 3 | - J. L. CARTERM. N. WEGMAN, "Universal classes of hash functions", J. Comp. Sys. Sci., (19790000), vol. 18, page 143 | - H. KRAWCZYK, "LFSR-based hashing and authentication", Lect. Notes Comp. Sci., (19940000), vol. 839, doi:doi:10.1007/3-540-48658-5_15, page 129, XP019194289 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/3-540-48658-5_15 | - Y. DODIS et al., "Randomness extraction and key derivation using the CBC, Cascade and HMAC modes", Lect. Notes. Comp. Sci., (20040000), vol. 3152, page 494 |