EP3328873 - TARGETED OLIGONUCLEOTIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.06.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.05.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Caris Science, Inc. 750 West John Carpenter Freeway, Suite 800 Irving, TX 75039 / US | [2019/14] |
Former [2018/23] | For all designated states Caris Science, Inc. 6655 N. MacArthur Boulevard Irving, TX 75039 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
O'NEILL, Heather 1252 W Laguna Azul Avenue Mesa, AZ 85202 / US | 02 /
MAYER, Gunter Martin-Legrosstrasse 59 53123 Bonn / DE | 03 /
MIGLARESE, Mark 1620 East Silverwood Drive Phoenix, AZ 85048 / US | 04 /
SPETZLER, David 6045 N. 40th Street Paradise Valley, AZ 85253 / US | [2018/23] | Representative(s) | Patent Boutique LLP 10A Printing House Yard Hackney Road London E2 7PR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/23] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 16831384.9 | 28.07.2016 | [2018/23] | WO2016US44595 | Priority number, date | US201562198051P | 28.07.2015 Original published format: US 201562198051 P | US201562198110P | 28.07.2015 Original published format: US 201562198110 P | US201562220652P | 18.09.2015 Original published format: US 201562220652 P | US201562239226P | 08.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562239226 P | US201562269671P | 18.12.2015 Original published format: US 201562269671 P | US201662305536P | 09.03.2016 Original published format: US 201662305536 P | [2018/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017019918 | Date: | 02.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3328873 | Date: | 06.06.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/50, C12N15/113, C07H21/02 | [2019/14] | CPC: |
C07H21/00 (EP,IL,US);
C12N15/10 (EP,IL,US);
C07H19/173 (US);
A61K47/6911 (US);
A61K47/6929 (US);
A61K9/0014 (US);
A61K9/0019 (US);
A61K9/0053 (US);
A61P25/28 (EP,US);
A61P29/00 (EP,US);
A61P31/00 (EP,US);
A61P35/02 (EP,US);
A61P37/00 (EP,US);
A61P9/00 (EP,US);
C07H19/09 (US);
C07H19/19 (US);
C12N15/113 (IL);
C12N15/115 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6886 (EP,US);
G01N33/5308 (EP,US);
G01N33/57484 (EP,US);
G01N33/68 (EP,US);
G06T7/0012 (US);
C12N2310/16 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/23] | C07H19/173, C07H21/00, C07H19/19, C07H19/09 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/23] | Title | German: | GEZIELTE OLIGONUKLEOTIDE | [2018/23] | English: | TARGETED OLIGONUCLEOTIDES | [2018/23] | French: | OLIGONUCLÉOTIDES CIBLÉS | [2018/23] | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.2018 | Search fee paid | 08.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/23] | 08.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | deleted | [2024/17] |
Former [2019/14] | ID: | 01 | |
For: | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | ||
Date: | 19.12.2018 | ||
[2024/17] | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2011147193 (UNIV HONG KONG [CN], et al) [X] 1,6,8 * claim 2; sequence 7 * [I] 2,6-14; | [XI]JP2013094067 (HITACHI HIGH TECH CORP) [X] 1,6,8 * page 8; sequences 12,14 * [I] 2,6-14; | [X] - "Pseudorca crassidens DNA, BAC clone: QGB1-271M02_F, 5'end.", EMBL, (20131212), Database accession no. DE820782, URL: EBI, XP002789005 [X] 1,6,8 * the whole document * | [XI] - KOUTSIOUMPA MARINA ET AL, "Cell surface nucleolin as a target for anti-cancer therapies", RECENT PATENTS ON ANTI-CANCER DRUG DISCOVERY, BENTHAM SCIENCE, SHARJAH, UNITED ARAB EMIRATES, (20140430), vol. 9, no. 2, doi:10.2174/1574892808666131119095953, ISSN 2212-3970, pages 137 - 152, XP009511363 [X] 1,3-6,8 * page 143 * [I] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2174/1574892808666131119095953 | [XI] - MONGELARD FABIEN ET AL, "AS-1411, a guanosine-rich oligonucleotide aptamer targeting nucleolin for the potential treatment of cancer, including acute myeloid leukemia", CURRENT OPINION IN MOLECULAR THERAPEUTICS, THOMSON REUTERS (SCIETIFIC) LTD, (20100131), vol. 12, no. 1, ISSN 2040-3445, pages 107 - 114, XP009511364 [X] 1,3-6,8 * the whole document * [I] 1-15 | [XDPI] - FELIPE OPAZO ET AL, "Modular Assembly of Cell-targeting Devices Based on an Uncommon G-quadruplex Aptamer", MOLECULAR THERAPY-NUCLEIC ACIDS, (20150901), vol. 4, doi:10.1038/mtna.2015.25, ISSN 2162-2531, pages 1 - 10, XP055561058 [XDP] 1-6,8 * the whole document * [I] 1-8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/mtna.2015.25 | [T] - Sonal S Tonapi, "Abstract 2469: The B-cell lymphoma specific aptamer C10.36 binds a ribonucleoprotein complex on the cell surface of cancer cells | Cancer Research", (20170701), URL: http://cancerres.aacrjournals.org/content/77/13_Supplement/2469, (20190218), XP055558346 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1538-7445.AM2017-2469 | [T] - TONAPI SONAL S ET AL, "Aptamer C10.36 Reveals a Ribonucleoprotein Complex on the Surface of Non-Hodgkin Lymphoma Cells Providing Candidates for Multi-Target Therapeutics", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (20171207), Database accession no. PREV201800668307, XP002789040 [T] * abstract * | [ ] - BLOOD, 59TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN-SOCIETY-OF-HEMATOLOGY (ASH); ATLANTA, GA, USA; DECEMBER 09 -12, 2017, (20171207), vol. 130, no. Suppl. 1, ISSN 0006-4971(print), page 3346 | International search | [A]US2007083334 (MINTZ LIAT [US], et al) | by applicant | US86 | US141 | US5216 | US5596 | US3687808 | US4275149 | US4469863 | US4476301 | US4551435 | US4587044 | US4605735 | US4666828 | US4667025 | US4683202 | US4737456 | US4762779 | US4789737 | US4795698 | US4801531 | US4824941 | US4828979 | US4835263 | US4845205 | US4876335 | US4904582 | US4925788 | US4948882 | US4958013 | US5013830 | US5023243 | US5034506 | WO9119813 | US5082830 | US5108933 | US5109124 | WO9207065 | US5112963 | US5118802 | US5130302 | US5134066 | US5138045 | US5149797 | US5158871 | US5166315 | US5175273 | US5177196 | US5185444 | US5186827 | US5188897 | EP0527905 | US5192659 | US5200084 | US5214134 | US5214136 | US5218105 | US5220007 | US5235033 | US5245022 | US5254469 | US5256775 | US5258506 | WO9322684 | US5262536 | US5264423 | US5264562 | US5264564 | US5270163 | US5272057 | US5272250 | US5276019 | US5278302 | US5286717 | US5292873 | US5317098 | US5321131 | US5366878 | US5367066 | US5371241 | US5376252 | US5399676 | US5403711 | US5405939 | US5405938 | US5414077 | US5416203 | US5432272 | US5434257 | US5453496 | US5455233 | US5457187 | US5459255 | US5466677 | US5470967 | US5475096 | US5476925 | US5484908 | US5486603 | US5489677 | US5491133 | US5496938 | US5502177 | US5510475 | US5512439 | US5512667 | US5514785 | US5519126 | US5525711 | US5525465 | US5536821 | US5539082 | US5541306 | US5541307 | US5541313 | US5545730 | US5550111 | US5552540 | US5552538 | US5561225 | US5563253 | US5565350 | US5565552 | US5567588 | US5567810 | US5571799 | US5574142 | US5578717 | US5578718 | US5580737 | US5580731 | US5585481 | US5587361 | US5587469 | US5587371 | US5591584 | US5596091 | US5595726 | US5597696 | US5599923 | US5599928 | US5602240 | US5608046 | US5610289 | US5614617 | US5618704 | US5623065 | US5623070 | US5625050 | US5633360 | US5637459 | US5648214 | US5652355 | US5652356 | US5660985 | US5663312 | US5672695 | US5677437 | US5677439 | US5681941 | US5683867 | US5688941 | US5698687 | US5700922 | US5705337 | US5707796 | US5714331 | US5719262 | US5736330 | WO9818480 | US5750692 | US5763177 | US5789163 | US5817635 | US5861254 | US5958691 | US6011020 | US6051698 | US6057107 | EP1065378 | US6269957 | US6329209 | US6357601 | US6365418 | US6406921 | US6408878 | US6475808 | US6475809 | US2003061687 | US6599331 | US6623526 | US6645432 | US6719868 | US6773812 | US6793753 | US6812023 | US2005084421 | US2005112882 | US6899137 | US6899863 | US2005129581 | US2005145496 | US2005158708 | US6929030 | US2005201901 | US2005214173 | US2005252773 | US2006006067 | US7040338 | US7118910 | US7118661 | US7125711 | US7135147 | US7138062 | US7141978 | US7144616 | US7189581 | US7189580 | US7189368 | US7195986 | US7198923 | US7201881 | US7216671 | US7229538 | US7233865 | US7238324 | US7238255 | US7250128 | US7253003 | US7258837 | US7261824 | WO2007103572 | US7274316 | US7323140 | US7329391 | US7338637 | US7351592 | US7351380 | US7357864 | US7381471 | US7390463 | US7399632 | US7399600 | US7402229 | US7411184 | US7413709 | US7419822 | US7419639 | US7422725 | US7422669 | US7431887 | US7445844 | US7449096 | US7452713 | US7452509 | US7467928 | US7485214 | US7488596 | US7494555 | US7501245 | US7518726 | US7541578 | US7544506 | US7552741 | US7568399 | US7575722 | US7579136 | US7581429 | US7591936 | US7601270 | US7640947 | US7666361 | US7691333 | US7704735 | WO2010065765 | WO2010072410 | US7751053 | US7754010 | US7837946 | WO2010141862 | WO2011066589 | US7955802 | US8008019 | WO2011127219 | US8124015 | US2012258870 | WO2012174282 | US2013017837 | WO2013020995 | WO2013022995 | WO2014082083 | US2014371088 | WO2015031694 | US19610604307 | US19740604874 | US19390605170 | US19900536428 | US20030729581 | US20040873856 | US20050632946 | US20060884269 | WO2007US69286 | WO2008US71235 | WO2008US76109 | WO2009US60630 | WO2009US62880 | WO2009US06095 | WO2010US00407 | WO2010US54366 | WO2010US58461 | WO2011US21160 | WO2011US26750 | WO2011US31479 | WO2011US48327 | WO2011US67527 | WO2012US25741 | WO2012US41393 | WO2012US41387 | WO2012US42519 | WO2012US49615 | WO2012US50030 | WO2013US30302 | WO2013IB03092 | WO2013US72019 | WO2013US73184 | WO2013US76611 | WO2014US39858 | WO2014US53306 | WO2015US13618 | WO2015US62184 | WO2016US20657 |