EP3393634 - FILTER ELEMENT AND A METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.02.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.07.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2023 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BL Technologies, Inc. 5951 Clearwater Drive Minnetonka, MN 55341 / US | [2019/10] |
Former [2018/44] | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Linglu 1800 Cailun Road Zhangjiang High-Tech Park Shanghai Shanghai 201203 / CN | 02 /
HUANG, Jie 1800 Cailun Road Zhangjiang High-Tech Park Shanghai Shanghai 201203 / CN | 03 /
PENG, Yun 1800 Cailun Road Zhangjiang High-Tech Park Shanghai Shanghai 201203 / CN | 04 /
CHEN, Lin 1800 Cailun Road Zhangjiang High-Tech Park Shanghai Shanghai 201203 / CN | 05 /
LU, Su 1800 Cailun Road Zhangjiang High-Tech Park Shanghai Shanghai 201203 / CN | [2018/44] | Representative(s) | Atout PI Laplace Immeuble Up On 25 Boulevard Romain Rolland CS 40072 75685 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2018/44] | Fonquernie, Sophie Benedicte, et al Marks & Clerk France Immeuble Visium 22, avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 16831778.2 | 14.12.2016 | [2018/44] | WO2016US66537 | Priority number, date | CN201510988731 | 24.12.2015 Original published format: CN201510988731 | [2018/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017112478 | Date: | 29.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3393634 | Date: | 31.10.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B01D63/10, B01D69/10 | [2018/44] | CPC: |
B01D63/101 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01D61/145 (US);
B01D63/1031 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01D63/12 (CN);
B01D67/0016 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01D69/02 (KR,US);
B01D69/10 (CN,KR);
B01D69/1213 (KR);
B01D71/68 (US);
B01D2313/143 (KR,US);
B01D2323/26 (CN,US);
B01D2323/42 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/44] | Title | German: | FILTERELEMENT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2018/44] | English: | FILTER ELEMENT AND A METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THEREOF | [2018/44] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE FILTRE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2018/44] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/44] | 07.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.10.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/10] | 02.11.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2022 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]EP0215508 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]); | [A]US5275726 (FEIMER JOSEPH L [US], et al); | [X]WO02051528 (OSMONICS INC [US], et al); | [A]EP1625885 (VITO [BE]) | by applicant | US2004222158 |