EP3332591 - TECHNIQUES FOR FLEXIBLE DUPLEXING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.02.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.05.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2018/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEI, Chao 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
CHEN, Wanshi 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
GAAL, Peter 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
HOU, Jilei 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2018/24] | Representative(s) | Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2021/33] |
Former [2018/24] | Wegner, Hans Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16832161.0 | 01.07.2016 | [2018/24] | WO2016CN88168 | Priority number, date | WO2015CN86214 | 06.08.2015 Original published format: PCT/CN2015/086214 | [2018/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017020673 | Date: | 09.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3332591 | Date: | 13.06.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3332591 | Date: | 18.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 09.02.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04, H04L5/14, H04L5/00 | [2021/07] | CPC: |
H04W72/0453 (EP,KR,US);
H04W72/23 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/1812 (KR,US);
H04L5/003 (EP,US);
H04L5/14 (EP,US);
H04W28/04 (US);
H04W72/0446 (EP,KR,US);
H04W72/1268 (US);
H04J2211/005 (US);
H04L5/001 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/12] | H04W72/04, H04L5/14 | ||
Former IPC [2018/24] | H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TECHNIKEN FÜR FLEXIBLES DUPLEX | [2018/24] | English: | TECHNIQUES FOR FLEXIBLE DUPLEXING | [2018/24] | French: | TECHNIQUES DE DUPLEXAGE FLEXIBLE | [2018/24] | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2018 | Search fee paid | 29.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/24] | 29.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.05.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.07.2016 | AL | 18.08.2021 | AT | 18.08.2021 | CY | 18.08.2021 | CZ | 18.08.2021 | DK | 18.08.2021 | EE | 18.08.2021 | FI | 18.08.2021 | HR | 18.08.2021 | LT | 18.08.2021 | LV | 18.08.2021 | MC | 18.08.2021 | MK | 18.08.2021 | MT | 18.08.2021 | PL | 18.08.2021 | RO | 18.08.2021 | RS | 18.08.2021 | SI | 18.08.2021 | SK | 18.08.2021 | SM | 18.08.2021 | BG | 18.11.2021 | NO | 18.11.2021 | GR | 19.11.2021 | IS | 18.12.2021 | PT | 20.12.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 01.07.2016 | |
AL | 18.08.2021 | ||
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CY | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
MK | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 01.07.2016 | |
AL | 18.08.2021 | ||
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CY | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 01.07.2016 | |
AL | 18.08.2021 | ||
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 18.08.2021 | |
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
SM | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
RS | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1259092 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [X] 1,11,12,15 * paragraphs [0020] , [0021] * * paragraphs [0027] , [0028] * * paragraph [0032] * * paragraphs [0037] - [0039] * * paragraph [0048]; figures 9A, 9B, 9C * [I] 4; | [XI]US2010290369 (HUI YAN [US], et al) [X] 1,11,12,15 * paragraphs [0027] - [0030] * * paragraph [0049] * * figures 4,18 * [I] 4; | [XI]WO2015012655 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1,11,12,15 * figures 8,13 * * paragraphs [0111] - [0132] * [I] 2-10,13,14; | [E]WO2016138662 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [E] 1,11,12,15 * figures 2,4,5,6,7 * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraphs [0005] - [0011] ** paragraphs [0044] , [0045] * | International search | [A]US2011205976 (ROESSEL SABINE [DE], et al) [A] 1-30* the whole document *; | [A]CN103580830 (BEIJING SAMSUNG COMM TECH RES, et al) [A] 1-30 * the whole document *; | [A]CN104396178 (QUALCOMM INC) [A] 1-30 * abstract, description, paragraphs [0093]-[0140], [0202], figures 6A-10B, 13 *; | [A]CN104579596 (CHINA TELECOM CO LTD ) [A] 1-30 * the whole document *; | [A] - NTT DOCOMO, INC., "PCell mandatory/optional support for TDD-FDD CA", 3GPP TSG RAN Meeting #68 RP-150818, (20150618), XP050984537 [A] 1-30 * , the whole document * |