EP3331299 - WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.05.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2018/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Shuanshuan ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
DAI, Bo ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 03 /
HUANG, Shuanghong ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 04 /
CHEN, Lin ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 05 /
LIU, Ying ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 06 /
HE, Haigang ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2018/23] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2018/23] | Application number, filing date | 16832216.2 | 21.07.2016 | [2018/23] | WO2016CN90847 | Priority number, date | CN201510466640 | 31.07.2015 Original published format: CN201510466640 | [2018/23] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017020728 | Date: | 09.02.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3331299 | Date: | 06.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3331299 | Date: | 10.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 09.02.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/02 | [2023/06] | CPC: |
H04W72/02 (EP);
H04W72/044 (CN);
H04W72/04 (US);
H04W72/40 (EP);
H04L67/12 (CN);
H04W72/23 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2018/23] | H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2018/23] | English: | WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHOD AND DEVICE | [2018/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2018/23] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2018 | Translation filed | 27.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2018 | Search fee paid | 27.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/23] | 27.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.02.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.05.2023 | CZ | 10.05.2023 | DK | 10.05.2023 | EE | 10.05.2023 | ES | 10.05.2023 | FI | 10.05.2023 | HR | 10.05.2023 | IT | 10.05.2023 | LT | 10.05.2023 | LV | 10.05.2023 | MC | 10.05.2023 | NL | 10.05.2023 | PL | 10.05.2023 | RO | 10.05.2023 | RS | 10.05.2023 | SE | 10.05.2023 | SI | 10.05.2023 | SK | 10.05.2023 | SM | 10.05.2023 | IE | 21.07.2023 | LU | 21.07.2023 | BE | 31.07.2023 | CH | 31.07.2023 | NO | 10.08.2023 | GR | 11.08.2023 | IS | 10.09.2023 | PT | 11.09.2023 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
CZ | 10.05.2023 | ||
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
IT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
MC | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SI | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
LU | 21.07.2023 | ||
BE | 31.07.2023 | ||
CH | 31.07.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
CZ | 10.05.2023 | ||
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
MC | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SI | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
LU | 21.07.2023 | ||
BE | 31.07.2023 | ||
CH | 31.07.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/18] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
CZ | 10.05.2023 | ||
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
MC | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
LU | 21.07.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/14] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
CZ | 10.05.2023 | ||
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
MC | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
CZ | 10.05.2023 | ||
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
ES | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 10.05.2023 | |
PT | 11.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2014376400 (KANAMARLAPUDI SITARAMANJANEYULU [US], et al) [Y] 3,8 * page 5, line 13, paragraph [0050] - line 17 * * page 5, line 1, paragraph [0051] - page 6, line 6 * * page 6, line 9, paragraph [0055] - line 12 * * page 6, paragraph [0056] * [A] 1,2,4-7,9-15; | [YA]WO2015050394 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 5,11 * the whole document * [A] 1-4,6-10,12-15; | [XAYI]WO2015067197 (CHINA ACADEMY OF TELECOMM TECH [CN]) [X] 1,2,4,6,7,9,14 * the whole document * [A] 12,13 [Y] 3,5,8,11 [I] 10,15; | EP3068172 [ ] (CHINA ACADEMY OF TELECOMM TECH [CN]) [ ] * page 3, line 45 * * page 3, line 47 - line 48 * * page 4, line 25 - line 28 * * page 4, line 35 - line 41 * * page 8, line 1 - line 3 *; | US2016295595 [ ] (CHAE HYUKJIN [KR], et al) [ ] * page 1, paragraph [0008] ** page 5, paragraph [0083] - page 6 *; | [XA] - LG ELECTRONICS INC, "Resource pool selection with group priority", vol. RAN WG2, no. Sanfrancisco, USA; 20141117 - 20141121, (20141117), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-145078 [D2D-C] RESOURCE POOL SELECTION WITH GROUP PRIORITY, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN2/Docs/, (20141117), XP050877195 [X] 1,6 * page 1, line 13, paragraph 2 - line 21 * * Proposals 2-3; page 2 * [A] 2-5,7-15 | [XA] - ERICSSON, "Considerations on ProSe group priority", vol. RAN WG1, no. Belgrade, Serbia; 20150420 - 20150424, (20150419), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-151763 PROSE GROUP PRIORITY, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20150419), XP050934624 [X] 1,6 * page 1, line 9, paragraph 2.2 - page 2, line 22, paragraph 2.2 * [A] 2-5,7-15 | International search | [A]CN101909354 (DATANG MOBILE COMM EQUIP CO) [A] 1-24 * , the whole document *; | [XY]CN103024911 (UNIV BEIJING POSTS & TELECOMM) [X] 1-24 * , description, paragraphs 48-73, description, paragraphs 48-73 * [Y] 7-9, 19-22; | [XY]CN103238285 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD) [X] 1-24 * , description, paragraphs 27-31, and claims 1-7, description, paragraphs 27-31, and claims 1-7 * [Y] 7-9, 19-22; | [Y]CN103795646 (UNIV BEIJING) [Y] 7-9, 19-22 * , description, paragraphs 13 *; | [A]WO2014173429 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1-24* , the whole document *; | [PXY]CN105451211 (ZTE CORP) [PX] 1-24 * , claims 1-9, claims 1-9 * [PY] 7-9, 19-22 | Examination | WO2014146302 | EP2947838 | - ZTE, "Discussion on T-RPT Scheme for Mode 1 and Mode 2", vol. RAN WG1, no. Dresden, Germany; 20140818 - 20140822, (20140817), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-143135 T-RPT FOR MODE 1 AND MODE 2, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20140817), XP050788613 |