EP3331971 - ALL-STEAM GASIFICATION WITH CARBON CAPTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.05.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.05.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wormser Energy Solutions, Inc. 202 Hilltop Road Lancaster, MA 01523 / US | [2020/26] |
Former [2018/24] | For all designated states Wormser Energy Solutions, Inc. 18 Arnold Terrace Marblehead, MA 01945 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WORMSER, Alex 18 Arnold Terrace Marblehead, Massachusetts 01945 / US | 02 /
PARKES, John 791 Westminster Lane Los Altos, California 94022-1144 / US | 03 /
TODD, Douglas M. 6003 Parkis Mills Road Galway, New York 12074 / US | [2018/24] | Representative(s) | Dehns 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/24] | Noronha, Catherine Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 16833770.7 | 03.08.2016 | [2018/24] | WO2016US45268 | Priority number, date | US201562201625P | 06.08.2015 Original published format: US 201562201625 P | US201662329632P | 29.04.2016 Original published format: US 201662329632 P | [2018/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017023985 | Date: | 09.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3331971 | Date: | 13.06.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 09.02.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C10J3/20, C10J3/66, C10B49/10, C10J3/48, C10K3/04 | [2019/02] | CPC: |
C10J3/66 (EP,US);
C01B3/38 (EP,US);
C10B49/10 (EP,US);
C10G2/30 (EP,US);
C10J3/482 (EP,US);
C10K3/04 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0283 (EP,US);
C01B2203/045 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0465 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0485 (EP,US);
C01B2203/1058 (EP,US);
C01B2203/84 (EP,US);
C10J2200/152 (EP,US);
C10J2300/0906 (EP,US);
C10J2300/0993 (EP,US);
C10J2300/1215 (EP,US);
C10J2300/1246 (EP,US);
C10J2300/1606 (EP,US);
C10J2300/1612 (EP,US);
C10J2300/1618 (EP,US);
C10J2300/165 (EP,US);
C10J2300/1659 (EP,US);
C10J2300/1662 (EP,US);
C10J2300/1665 (EP,US);
C10J2300/1675 (EP,US);
C10J2300/1687 (EP,US);
C10J2300/1853 (EP,US);
Y02E20/18 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/24] | C10J3/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/24] | Title | German: | VOLLSTÄNDIGE DAMPFVERGASUNG MIT KOHLENSTOFFABSCHEIDUNG | [2018/24] | English: | ALL-STEAM GASIFICATION WITH CARBON CAPTURE | [2018/24] | French: | GAZÉIFICATION TOUT-VAPEUR AVEC CAPTURE DE CARBONE | [2018/24] | Entry into regional phase | 19.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 19.02.2018 | Search fee paid | 19.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/24] | 19.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/23] | 02.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/23] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 19.11.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 19.11.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.11.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0250214 (FUTURE ENERGY RESOURCES CORP [US]) [A] 1-15* figure 1 *; | [A]US2002117564 (HAHN WILLIAM E [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 1 * * the whole document *; | [A]US2010181539 (APANEL GEORGE [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 6,5 * * the whole document *; | [A]WO2011035241 (WORMSER ENERGY SOLUTIONS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-11 * * the whole document *; | [A]EP2484971 (SCHERRER INST PAUL [CH]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-3 * * the whole document *; | [XI]WO2013062800 (RENTECH INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,11,12,14,15 * paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0095] * * figures 1-4 * [I] 3-10,13 | International search | [A]US4578175 (GORIN EVERETT [US]) [A] 1-43 * See column 2, line 7-column 3, line 33; claim 1; figure 1. *; | [A]US2012167585 (WORMSER ALEX [US]) [A] 1-43 * See paragraphs [0034], [0037], [0039]-[0041], [0047], [0071], [0072], [0074]-0076]; figures 1-6, 10, 11. *; | [A]US2004045272 (MIYOSHI NORIHISA [JP], et al) [A] 1-43 * See paragraphs [0017]-[0025]; figure 1. *; | [A]US2012247080 (ISHII HIROMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-43 * See paragraphs [0034]-[0045]; claims 1, 5; figure 1. *; | [A]US2014296586 (CHANDRAN RAVI [US], et al) [A] 1-43 * See the whole document. * | by applicant | WO2013062800 | US2002117564 | WO2011035241 | EP2484971 | US2010181539 | WO0250214 |