EP3332080 - METHOD OF FORMING EARTH-BORING TOOLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/24] | METHODS OF FORMING AND METHODS OF REPAIRING EARTH-BORING TOOLS | ||
[2023/23] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.09.2023 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.05.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LV | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baker Hughes Holdings LLC 17021 Aldine Westfield Houston, TX 77073 / US | [2023/44] |
Former [2018/24] | For all designated states Baker Hughes, a GE company, LLC P.O. Box 4740 Houston, TX 77210-4740 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OXFORD, James Andy 40810 Roundup Road Magnolia, Texas 77354 / US | 02 /
FOLKS, Gregory D. 75 Lake Reverie Place The Woodlands, Texas 77375 / US | 03 /
WAGENHEIM, Christoph Hohes Feld 28 30966 Hemmingen / DE | [2018/24] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Group Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / Geneva / CH | [2023/44] |
Former [2018/24] | Davies, Christopher Robert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 16834010.7 | 30.09.2016 | [2018/24] | WO2016US54928 | Priority number, date | US201615227261 | 03.08.2016 Original published format: US201615227261 | [2018/36] |
Former [2018/24] | US201514816758 | 03.08.2015 | |
US201615227261 | 03.08.2016 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2017024322 | Date: | 09.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3332080 | Date: | 13.06.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3332080 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 16.03.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | E21B10/42, B23P6/04, C23C26/00, B23K15/00, B23K26/34, C23C24/10, E21B10/43, G05B15/02, G05B19/4093, B33Y10/00, B23K101/20, B23K103/18 | [2019/17] | CPC: |
B23K26/34 (EP,US);
G05B15/02 (US);
B23K15/0086 (EP,US);
B23K15/0093 (EP,US);
B33Y10/00 (US);
C23C24/103 (EP,US);
C23C24/106 (EP,US);
G05B19/4093 (US);
G05B19/40937 (EP,US);
B23K2101/20 (EP,US);
B23K2103/26 (EP,US);
G05B2219/32228 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/24] | E21B10/42, B23P6/04, C23C26/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ERDBOHRWERKZEUGEN | [2023/23] | English: | METHOD OF FORMING EARTH-BORING TOOLS | [2023/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION D'OUTILS DE FORAGE | [2023/23] |
Former [2018/24] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR REPARATUR VON ERDBOHRWERKZEUGEN | ||
Former [2018/24] | METHODS OF FORMING AND METHODS OF REPAIRING EARTH-BORING TOOLS | ||
Former [2018/24] | PROCÉDÉS DE FORMATION ET PROCÉDÉS DE RÉPARATION D'OUTILS DE FORAGE | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.2018 | Search fee paid | 23.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.2016 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Priority | 23.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/24] | 23.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.04.2018 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 0001 | 21.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.11.2023 | ES | 01.11.2023 | HR | 01.11.2023 | LT | 01.11.2023 | LV | 01.11.2023 | NL | 01.11.2023 | PL | 01.11.2023 | RS | 01.11.2023 | SE | 01.11.2023 | BG | 01.02.2024 | NO | 01.02.2024 | GR | 02.02.2024 | IS | 01.03.2024 | PT | 01.03.2024 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/25] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 01.11.2023 | |
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 02.02.2024 | |
IS | 01.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2007157763 (OLDHAM THOMAS W [US]) [Y] 11-17 * paragraphs [0003] , [0010] , [0024] , [0027] , [0028] , [0031] , [0035]; figure 4; claim 1 *; | [A]US2008083568 (OVERSTREET JAMES L [US], et al) [A] 15* paragraphs [0002] , [0035] *; | [Y]US2008223832 (SONG LIJUN [US], et al) [Y] 2-6 * paragraphs [0002] , [0010] , [0029] , [0030]; figure 1 *; | [XYI]EP2190618 (BAKER HUGHES INC [US]) [X] 1,7,8,10 * paragraphs [0010] , [0012] , [0028] - [0030] - [0038] , [0048] , [0049] , [0059] , [0063] - [0068] - [0076]; figures 1,2,6,7; claim 1 * [Y] 2-6,11-17 [I] 9; | [Y]US2011240607 (STECKER SCOTT [US], et al) [Y] 2-6 * paragraphs [0002] , [0029] , [0031] , [0051] , [0055]; claim 9 *; | [Y]US2013273258 (LUCE DAVID KEITH [US], et al) [Y] 2-5,11,12 * paragraphs [0002] , [0024] , [0067] - [0095] - [0105] - [0135]; figures 5,10,12,14 * | International search | [A]US2002035895 (DAVIES PETER M [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * See paragraphs [0022]-[0030] and figures 1-5. *; | [Y]US2007157763 (OLDHAM THOMAS W [US]) [Y] 13-17 * See paragraphs [0003], [0027]-[0029] and figure 4. *; | [A]WO2008046039 (AIR PROD & CHEM [US], et al) [A] 1-17* See paragraphs [0032]-[0082] and figures 1, 3-4, 9. *; | [A]US2013149552 (YAO MATTHEW [CA], et al) [A] 1-17 * See paragraph [0053] and figure 7. *; | [XY]US2013273258 (LUCE DAVID KEITH [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * See paragraphs [0024], [0067]-[0095], [0105]-[0135] and figures 1-7, 11-12, 13A, 14-16, 19. * [Y] 13-17 | Examination | EP2190618 | by applicant | EP2190618 |