EP3393889 - VEHICLE ARCHITECTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.08.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.04.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.08.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.07.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Softcar SA Passage du Cardinal 1700 Fribourg / CH | [2018/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THULIEZ, Jean-Luc Jolimont 48 2525 Le Landeron / CH | 02 /
CROZIER, Etienne Ruelle de l'Hôtel de Ville 3 2520 La Neuveville / CH | [2018/44] | Representative(s) | Grosfillier, Philippe André Roland SA IP Attorneys & Services Avenue Collonges 21 1004 Lausanne / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2022/37] | Grosfillier, Philippe ANDRE ROLAND S.A. IP Attorneys & Services Avenue Collonges 21 1004 Lausanne / CH | ||
Former [2018/44] | Grosfillier, Philippe ANDRE ROLAND S.A. P.O. Box 5107 1002 Lausanne / CH | Application number, filing date | 16834045.3 | 21.12.2016 | [2018/44] | WO2016IB57888 | Priority number, date | WO2015IB59980 | 24.12.2015 Original published format: PCT/IB2015/059980 | [2018/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017109726 | Date: | 29.06.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3393889 | Date: | 31.10.2018 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3393889 | Date: | 14.09.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B62D21/16, B62D29/04, B62D31/00, B62D63/02 | [2018/44] | CPC: |
B62D63/025 (EP);
B62D21/16 (EP);
B62D29/043 (EP);
B62D31/003 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/44] | Extension states | BA | 18.07.2018 | ME | 18.07.2018 | Validation states | MA | 18.07.2018 | MD | 18.07.2018 | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGARCHITEKTUR | [2018/44] | English: | VEHICLE ARCHITECTURE | [2018/44] | French: | ARCHITECTURE DE VEHICULE | [2018/44] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/44] | 17.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.08.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 14.09.2022 | BG | 14.09.2022 | CY | 14.09.2022 | CZ | 14.09.2022 | EE | 14.09.2022 | HR | 14.09.2022 | LT | 14.09.2022 | LV | 14.09.2022 | MC | 14.09.2022 | MK | 14.09.2022 | MT | 14.09.2022 | RS | 14.09.2022 | SI | 14.09.2022 | SK | 14.09.2022 | SM | 14.09.2022 | TR | 14.09.2022 | IE | 21.12.2022 | IS | 14.01.2023 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/34] | AL | 14.09.2022 | |
BG | 14.09.2022 | ||
CY | 14.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
MC | 14.09.2022 | ||
MK | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SI | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
TR | 14.09.2022 | ||
IE | 21.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
Former [2024/29] | AL | 14.09.2022 | |
CY | 14.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
MC | 14.09.2022 | ||
MK | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SI | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
TR | 14.09.2022 | ||
IE | 21.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
Former [2024/27] | AL | 14.09.2022 | |
CY | 14.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
MK | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SI | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
IE | 21.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 14.09.2022 | |
CY | 14.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SI | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
IE | 21.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 14.09.2022 | |
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SI | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
IE | 21.12.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 14.09.2022 | |
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SI | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 14.09.2022 | |
CZ | 14.09.2022 | ||
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/27] | CZ | 14.09.2022 | |
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
IS | 14.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | CZ | 14.09.2022 | |
EE | 14.09.2022 | ||
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SK | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | CZ | 14.09.2022 | |
HR | 14.09.2022 | ||
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | HR | 14.09.2022 | |
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
SM | 14.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | HR | 14.09.2022 | |
LT | 14.09.2022 | ||
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | LT | 14.09.2022 | |
LV | 14.09.2022 | ||
RS | 14.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | LT | 14.09.2022 | |
RS | 14.09.2022 | Cited in | International search | [XAI]JPS61166776 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1,2,8,10-13 * abstract * * figure - * [A] 5-7 [I] 4,9; | [XA]WO9715484 (THULIEZ JEAN LUC [CH]) [X] 1-3,5-13 * page 7, line 29 - page 14, line 17 * * figure - * [A] 4; | [A]EP0930220 (KOBE STEEL LTD [JP]) [A] 1-4,13 * paragraphs [0015] - [0018] * * paragraphs [0023] - [0027] * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE19963068 (PORSCHE AG [DE]) [A] 1,2,5-7 * column 1, lines 1-24 * * column 2, lines 8-44 * * column 3, lines 21-36 ** figures 2-4 *; | [XA]EP2431259 (TATA TECHNOLOGIES PTE LTD [SG]) [X] 1-4,8-13 * paragraphs [0042] - [0069] * * figure - * [A] 5-7 | Examination | WO9832622 | DE19926607 | DE102009038834 |