EP3337123 - NETWORK ATTACK PREVENTION METHOD, APPARATUS AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.04.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.05.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.05.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alibaba Group Holding Limited Fourth Floor, One Capital Place P.O. Box 847 George Town Grand Cayman / KY | [2018/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XIAO, Hongliang Alibaba Group Legal Department 5/F Building 3 No.969 West Wen Yi Road Yu Hang District Hangzhou Zhejiang 311121 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Dacheng Alibaba Group Legal Department 5/F Building 3 No.969 West Wen Yi Road Yu Hang District Hangzhou Zhejiang 311121 / CN | [2018/25] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham, West Midlands B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/25] | Barker Brettell LLP Medina Chambers Town Quay Southampton SO14 2AQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 16834601.3 | 04.08.2016 | [2018/25] | WO2016CN93186 | Priority number, date | CN201510497226 | 13.08.2015 Original published format: CN201510497226 | [2018/25] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017024977 | Date: | 16.02.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3337123 | Date: | 20.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3337123 | Date: | 16.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 16.02.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L29/12 | [2019/14] | CPC: |
H04L63/0236 (EP,CN,US);
H04L63/1466 (CN,KR);
H04L63/1458 (EP,CN,US);
H04L1/1858 (CN);
H04L61/4511 (EP,US);
H04L63/101 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/25] | H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM ZUR VERMEIDUNG VON NETZWERKANGRIFFEN | [2018/25] | English: | NETWORK ATTACK PREVENTION METHOD, APPARATUS AND SYSTEM | [2018/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, APPAREIL ET SYSTÈME DE PRÉVENTION D'ATTAQUE DE RÉSEAU | [2018/25] | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.2018 | Translation filed | 08.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.2018 | Search fee paid | 08.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/25] | 08.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.05.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.03.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.08.2016 | AL | 16.06.2021 | AT | 16.06.2021 | CY | 16.06.2021 | CZ | 16.06.2021 | DK | 16.06.2021 | EE | 16.06.2021 | ES | 16.06.2021 | FI | 16.06.2021 | HR | 16.06.2021 | IT | 16.06.2021 | LT | 16.06.2021 | LV | 16.06.2021 | MC | 16.06.2021 | MK | 16.06.2021 | MT | 16.06.2021 | NL | 16.06.2021 | PL | 16.06.2021 | RO | 16.06.2021 | RS | 16.06.2021 | SE | 16.06.2021 | SI | 16.06.2021 | SK | 16.06.2021 | SM | 16.06.2021 | IE | 04.08.2021 | LU | 04.08.2021 | BE | 31.08.2021 | CH | 31.08.2021 | LI | 31.08.2021 | BG | 16.09.2021 | NO | 16.09.2021 | GR | 17.09.2021 | IS | 16.10.2021 | PT | 18.10.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 04.08.2016 | |
AL | 16.06.2021 | ||
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CY | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
IT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
MK | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SI | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
IE | 04.08.2021 | ||
LU | 04.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 04.08.2016 | |
AL | 16.06.2021 | ||
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CY | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
IT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SI | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
IE | 04.08.2021 | ||
LU | 04.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 04.08.2016 | |
AL | 16.06.2021 | ||
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
IT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SI | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
IE | 04.08.2021 | ||
LU | 04.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 16.06.2021 | |
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
IT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SI | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
IE | 04.08.2021 | ||
LU | 04.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 16.06.2021 | |
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SI | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
IE | 04.08.2021 | ||
LU | 04.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 16.06.2021 | |
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SI | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
LU | 04.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 16.06.2021 | |
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SI | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
LU | 04.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 16.06.2021 | |
AT | 16.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
LU | 04.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 16.06.2021 | |
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
LU | 04.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 16.06.2021 | |
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
DK | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AT | 16.06.2021 | |
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
MC | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 16.06.2021 | |
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
EE | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
PL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
IS | 16.10.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 16.06.2021 | |
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RO | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SK | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
PT | 18.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 16.06.2021 | |
CZ | 16.06.2021 | ||
ES | 16.06.2021 | ||
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 16.06.2021 | |
FI | 16.06.2021 | ||
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
NL | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
SM | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | FI | 16.06.2021 | |
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
RS | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | FI | 16.06.2021 | |
HR | 16.06.2021 | ||
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
LV | 16.06.2021 | ||
SE | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
NO | 16.09.2021 | ||
GR | 17.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | FI | 16.06.2021 | |
LT | 16.06.2021 | ||
BG | 16.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 16.06.2021 | |
LT | 16.06.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - ANAGNOSTOPOULOS MARIOS ET AL, "DNS amplification attack revisited", COMPUTERS & SECURITY, (20131130), vol. 39, doi:10.1016/J.COSE.2013.10.001, ISSN 0167-4048, pages 475 - 485, XP028780864 [X] 1-15 * Section 3.4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cose.2013.10.001 | [A] - FABRICE J RYBA ET AL, "Amplification and DRDoS Attack Defense -- A Survey and New Perspectives", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20150529), XP080809563 [A] 1-15 * Section V * | [A] - CHANGHUA SUN ET AL, "Efficient and Low-Cost Hardware Defense Against DNS Amplification Attacks", 2008 IEEE GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE : [IEEE GLOBECOM 2008] ; NEW ORLEANS, LOUISIANA, 30 NOVEMBER 2008 - 04 DECEMBER 2008, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20081130), ISBN 978-1-4244-2324-8, pages 1 - 5, XP031370080 [A] 1-15 * Section III; page 2, column 2 - page 3, column 2 * | International search | [A]CN102075592 (LU XIAOWEN, et al) [A] 1-21 * , the whole document *; | [A]US2013232574 (CAROTHERS MATTHEW EDWIN [US]) [A] 1-21* the whole document *; | [A]CN103391272 (TENCENT INC) [A] 1-21 * , the whole documen *; | [A]CN103856487 (OPZOON TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-21 * , description, paragraph [0006] *; | [A]CN104125242 (BEIJING YUELIAN INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-21 * , the whole document * |