EP3333446 - VALVE STRUCTURE FOR BUFFER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.05.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KYB Corporation World Trade Center Bldg. 4-1, Hamamatsu-cho 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-6111 / JP | [2018/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIMISHIMA, Kazuyuki c/o KYB Corporation World Trade Center Bldg. 4-1 Hamamatsu-cho 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-6111 / JP | 02 /
YAMADA, Hideki c/o KYB Corporation World Trade Center Bldg. 4-1 Hamamatsu-cho 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-6111 / JP | 03 /
ARANO, Makoto c/o KYB Corporation World Trade Center Bldg. 4-1 Hamamatsu-cho 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-6111 / JP | 04 /
HIBI, Kenji c/o KYB Corporation World Trade Center Bldg. 4-1 Hamamatsu-cho 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-6111 / JP | 05 /
KAWAMURA, Koji c/o KYB Corporation World Trade Center Bldg. 4-1 Hamamatsu-cho 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-6111 / JP | [2018/24] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2018/24] | Application number, filing date | 16835029.6 | 02.08.2016 | [2018/24] | WO2016JP72699 | Priority number, date | JP20150157518 | 07.08.2015 Original published format: JP 2015157518 | [2018/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017026332 | Date: | 16.02.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3333446 | Date: | 13.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3333446 | Date: | 12.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.02.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F16F9/348, // F16F9/512 | [2024/09] | CPC: |
F16F9/3488 (EP,US);
F16F9/3484 (EP,US);
F16F9/3485 (EP,US);
F16F9/5126 (US);
B60G13/08 (US);
B60G2202/24 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/15] | F16F9/348, F16F9/512 | ||
Former IPC [2018/24] | F16F9/348 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VENTILANORDNUNG FÜR DÄMPFER | [2018/24] | English: | VALVE STRUCTURE FOR BUFFER | [2018/24] | French: | STRUCTURE DE SOUPAPE POUR DISPOSITIF D'AMORTISSEMENT | [2018/24] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2018 | Translation filed | 27.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2018 | Search fee paid | 27.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/24] | 27.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US4485900 (KATO TETUO [JP], et al); | [A]JPH01135935 (NHK SPRING CO LTD); | [A]JPH06185562 (TOKICO LTD); | [A]JPH09144799 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [X]GB2437185 (TENNECO AUTOMOTIVE OPERATING [US]); | [X]WO2009149331 (TENNECO AUTOMOTIVE OPERATING [US], et al); | [XY]US2014150897 (ASHIBA MASAHIRO [JP]) | International search | [Y]JPH01135935 (NHK SPRING CO LTD); | [A]JPH0730818U ; | [XY]JP2014129865 (HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LTD) | Examination | US4905799 | JP2000337422 |