EP3336941 - NONAQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE BATTERY BINDER COMPOSITION, AND NONAQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE BATTERY SLURRY COMPOSITION, NONAQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE BATTERY NEGATIVE ELECTRODE, AND NONAQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE BATTERY USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.07.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.05.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kuraray Co., Ltd. 1621, Sakazu Kurashiki-shi Okayama 710-0801 / JP | [2018/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OHTA, Yuki c/o Kuraray Co. Ltd. 2045-1 Sakazu Kurashiki-shi Okayama 710-0801 / JP | 02 /
TANAKA, Toshimitsu c/o Kuraray Co. Ltd. 2045-1 Sakazu Kurashiki-shi Okayama 710-0801 / JP | 03 /
FUJIOKA, Junji c/o Kuraray Co. Ltd. 2045-1 Sakazu Kurashiki-shi Okayama 710-0801 / JP | 04 /
CHO, Jun-Sang c/o Kuraray Co. Ltd. 2045-1 Sakazu Kurashiki-shi Okayama 710-0801 / JP | 05 /
IWASAKI, Hideharu c/o Kuraray Co. Ltd. 2045-1 Sakazu Kurashiki-shi Okayama 710-0801 / JP | [2018/25] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2018/25] | Application number, filing date | 16835172.4 | 09.08.2016 | [2018/25] | WO2016JP73405 | Priority number, date | JP20150158268 | 10.08.2015 Original published format: JP 2015158268 | [2018/25] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017026475 | Date: | 16.02.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3336941 | Date: | 20.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.02.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/62, C08K3/20, C08K5/17, C08L23/26, H01M4/13, H01M4/139 | [2018/25] | CPC: |
H01M4/622 (EP,KR,US);
C08K3/20 (EP,US);
C08K5/17 (EP,US);
C08L23/025 (US);
C08L23/26 (EP,US);
C08L35/02 (US);
H01M10/052 (KR);
H01M4/0404 (EP);
H01M4/13 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/139 (EP,US);
H01M4/62 (US);
C08L2203/20 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/25] | Title | German: | BINDEMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR BATTERIE MIT WASSERFREIEM ELEKTROLYT, SUSPENSIONSZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR BATTERIE MIT WASSERFREIEM ELEKTROLYT, NEGATIVE ELEKTRODE FÜR BATTERIE MIT WASSERFREIEM ELEKTROLYT UND BATTERIE MIT WASSERFREIEM ELEKTROLYT DAMIT | [2018/25] | English: | NONAQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE BATTERY BINDER COMPOSITION, AND NONAQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE BATTERY SLURRY COMPOSITION, NONAQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE BATTERY NEGATIVE ELECTRODE, AND NONAQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE BATTERY USING SAME | [2018/25] | French: | COMPOSITION DE LIANT POUR BATTERIE À ÉLECTROLYTE NON AQUEUX, COMPOSITION DE BOUILLIE POUR BATTERIE À ÉLECTROLYTE NON AQUEUX METTANT EN UVRE CETTE COMPOSITION, ÉLECTRODE NÉGATIVE DE BATTERIE À ÉLECTROLYTE NON AQUEUX, ET BATTERIE À ÉLECTROLYTE NON AQUEUX | [2018/25] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2018 | Translation filed | 10.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.2018 | Search fee paid | 10.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/25] | 27.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/32] | 08.04.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS5714679 ; | [X]US4389513 (MIYAZAKI HIROTOSHI [JP]) [X] 1-3 * examples 1-7; claims 1-15 *; | [X]WO2005014698 (UNIV MCMASTER [CA], et al) [X] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]US2014087250 (COOWAR FAZLIL [GB], et al) [A] 1-5* the whole document *; | [XP]WO2016067843 (KURARAY CO [JP]) [XP] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1982, no. 09, Database accession no. 1982-16934E, XP002786526 & JPS5714679 A 19820125 (KURARAY CO LTD) [X] 1-3 * abstract * | International search | [A]WO2008029502 (UNITIKA LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * , & US 2009/0325069 A1 & EP 2058882 A1 & TW 200823259 A *; | [A]JP2010009940 (DENSO CORP, et al) [A] 1-5 * , (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2014098151 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-5 * , & US 2014/0131630 A1 & KR 10-2014-0061955 A & CN 103804599 A *; | [A]JP2015128006 (KAO CORP) [A] 1-5 * , (Family: none) *; | [PX]JP2015151402 (UNITIKA LTD) [PX] 1, 3-5* , claims; paragraphs [0011] to [0024], [0055] to [0079] (Family: none) * |