Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9957437 | Global Dossier | 01.05.2018 | B2 | US2017037298 | 09.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562202196 | 07.08.2015 | US201615228446 | 04.08.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107849436 | Global Dossier | 27.03.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201562202196 | 07.08.2015 | WO2016US45541 | 04.08.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2994677 | Global Dossier | 16.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562202196 | 07.08.2015 | WO2016US45541 | 04.08.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2016304757B | Global Dossier | 06.02.2020 | B2 | AU2016304757 | 22.02.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562202196 | 07.08.2015 | WO2016US45541 | 04.08.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3331962 | Global Dossier | 17.02.2021 | B1 | EP3331962 | 13.03.2019 | A4 | EP3331962 | 13.06.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562202196 | 07.08.2015 | WO2016US45541 | 04.08.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112018002476 | 18.09.2018 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201562202196 | 07.08.2015 | WO2016US45541 | 04.08.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2018001619 | 22.05.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201562202196 | 07.08.2015 | WO2016US45541 | 04.08.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017027317 | Global Dossier | 16.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562202196 | 07.08.2015 |