EP3337364 - MODULAR BABY FOOD PREPARATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.09.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.05.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Capsulbar Technologies SYS 2014 Ltd P.O.B 42 6094600 Bitzaron / IL | [2018/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAZIEL, Eldad 32 Hamagen St. 7680400 Mazkeret Batia / IL | [2018/26] | Representative(s) | Brevalex Tour Trinity 1 B Place de la Défense 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2018/26] | Brevalex 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | Application number, filing date | 16836753.0 | 17.08.2016 | [2018/26] | WO2016IL50900 | Priority number, date | US201562205890P | 17.08.2015 Original published format: US 201562205890 P | US201562205885P | 17.08.2015 Original published format: US 201562205885 P | US201562205881P | 17.08.2015 Original published format: US 201562205881 P | [2018/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017029668 | Date: | 23.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3337364 | Date: | 27.06.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 23.02.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/40, B67D3/00 | [2018/26] | CPC: |
A47J31/407 (EP,US);
A23L33/40 (US);
A47J31/404 (US);
A47J31/56 (US);
A47J31/60 (US);
A61L2/04 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/26] | Title | German: | MODULARE VORRICHTUNG ZUR ZUBEREITUNG VON BABYNAHRUNG | [2018/26] | English: | MODULAR BABY FOOD PREPARATION DEVICE | [2018/26] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PRÉPARATION D'ALIMENT POUR BÉBÉ MODULAIRE | [2018/26] | Entry into regional phase | 12.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 12.03.2018 | Search fee paid | 12.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/26] | 12.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 03.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2008041236 (RAOUF DAVID [CH], et al) [I] 1-4,7,10,13 * figure 1 *; | [A]US2013291737 (SIMS BRIAN [US]) [A] 1,13* figure 2 *; | [A]US2013323371 (KUTCHER MIRIAM [US], et al) [A] 1,13 * figure 7 * | International search | [A]US2005150393 (BIDERMAN EYTAN [IL], et al)[A] 1-13; | [X]US2011163127 (DIBELLA-LENAWAY DANIELLE [US]) [X] 1-13 |