EP3491824 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DATA HIDING IN PREDICTION PARAMETERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.12.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.02.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2019/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FILIPPOV, Alexey Konstantinovich Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
RUFITSKIY, Vasily Alexeevich Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2019/23] | Representative(s) | Körber, Martin Hans, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/23] | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16838091.3 | 04.08.2016 | [2019/23] | WO2016RU00508 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018026299 | Date: | 08.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3491824 | Date: | 05.06.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3491824 | Date: | 26.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/467, H04N19/463, H04N19/513, H04N19/593 | [2019/23] | CPC: |
H04N19/463 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/139 (US);
H04N19/107 (US);
H04N19/159 (US);
H04N19/184 (KR);
H04N19/196 (US);
H04N19/467 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/521 (US);
H04N19/70 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DATENVERDECKUNG IN PRÄDIKTIONSPARAMETERN | [2019/23] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DATA HIDING IN PREDICTION PARAMETERS | [2019/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR CACHER DES DONNÉES DANS DES PARAMÈTRES DE PRÉDICTION | [2019/23] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/23] | 27.02.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.04.2023 | CZ | 26.04.2023 | DK | 26.04.2023 | EE | 26.04.2023 | ES | 26.04.2023 | FI | 26.04.2023 | HR | 26.04.2023 | IT | 26.04.2023 | LT | 26.04.2023 | LV | 26.04.2023 | MC | 26.04.2023 | NL | 26.04.2023 | PL | 26.04.2023 | RO | 26.04.2023 | RS | 26.04.2023 | SE | 26.04.2023 | SI | 26.04.2023 | SK | 26.04.2023 | SM | 26.04.2023 | NO | 26.07.2023 | GR | 27.07.2023 | GB | 04.08.2023 | IE | 04.08.2023 | LU | 04.08.2023 | IS | 26.08.2023 | PT | 28.08.2023 | BE | 31.08.2023 | CH | 31.08.2023 | FR | 31.08.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
CZ | 26.04.2023 | ||
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
MC | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SI | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
GB | 04.08.2023 | ||
IE | 04.08.2023 | ||
LU | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
FR | 31.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
CZ | 26.04.2023 | ||
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
MC | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SI | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
GB | 04.08.2023 | ||
IE | 04.08.2023 | ||
LU | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
CZ | 26.04.2023 | ||
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
MC | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SI | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
LU | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
CZ | 26.04.2023 | ||
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
MC | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SI | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
LU | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
CZ | 26.04.2023 | ||
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
MC | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
LU | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/16] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
CZ | 26.04.2023 | ||
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
MC | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
CZ | 26.04.2023 | ||
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 26.04.2023 | |
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | NL | 26.04.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XI] - AARON T SHARP ET AL, "Digital video authentication with motion vector watermarking", SIGNAL PROCESSING AND COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS (ICSPCS), 2010 4TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20101213), doi:10.1109/ICSPCS.2010.5709757, ISBN 978-1-4244-7908-5, pages 1 - 4, XP031898828 [X] 1,2,8-12,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [000I] , [0 II] * [I] 3-7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICSPCS.2010.5709757 | [X] - YANN BODO ET AL, "A comparative study of different modes of perturbation for video watermarking based on motion vectors", 2004 12TH EUROPEAN SIGNAL PROCESSING CONFERENCE, IEEE, ISBN 978-3-200-00165-7, (20040906), pages 1501 - 1504, (20150403), XP032760625 [X] 1,8,11,12,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * | [X] - WANG PEI ET AL, "A Video Watermarking Scheme Based on Motion Vectors and Mode Selection", COMPUTER SCIENCE AND SOFTWARE ENGINEERING, 2008 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20081212), ISBN 978-0-7695-3336-0, pages 233 - 237, XP031377993 [X] 1,2,8,11,12,15 * abstract * * paragraph [00II] * | [XI] - GANG QIU ET AL, "A hybrid watermarking scheme for H.264/AVC video", PATTERN RECOGNITION, 2004. ICPR 2004. PROCEEDINGS OF THE 17TH INTERNAT IONAL CONFERENCE ON CAMBRIDGE, UK AUG. 23-26, 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA, (20040823), vol. 4, doi:10.1109/ICPR.2004.1333909, ISBN 978-0-7695-2128-2, pages 865 - 868, XP010724057 [X] 1,8,11,12,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * [I] 13,14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICPR.2004.1333909 |