EP3341298 - CONTAINER FOR USE IN FOOD PROCESSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.2021 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commonwealth Scientific and Industrial Research Organisation Clunies Ross Street Acton, ACT 2601 / AU | [2018/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KNOERZER, Kai 3 Calais Court Hoppers Crossing, Victoria 3029 / AU | [2018/27] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2020/23] |
Former [2018/27] | Dehns St. Brides House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 16838137.4 | 26.08.2016 | [2018/27] | WO2016AU50801 | Priority number, date | AU20150903447 | 26.08.2015 Original published format: AU 2015903447 | [2018/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017031552 | Date: | 02.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3341298 | Date: | 04.07.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3341298 | Date: | 03.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 02.03.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B65B55/14, B65B31/04, A23L3/00, B65D81/00 | [2018/27] | CPC: |
B65B55/14 (EP,KR,US);
A23L3/0155 (EP,KR,US);
A23L3/10 (EP,KR,US);
B32B1/00 (US);
B32B27/322 (US);
B32B33/00 (US);
B65B25/001 (EP,KR,US);
B65B55/12 (EP,US);
B65D81/00 (EP,US);
B65D81/18 (US);
B65D81/28 (KR);
B32B2307/30 (US);
B32B2323/043 (US);
B32B2323/10 (US);
B32B2327/18 (US);
B32B2439/40 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEHÄLTER ZUR VERWENDUNG IN DER LEBENSMITTELVERARBEITUNG | [2018/27] | English: | CONTAINER FOR USE IN FOOD PROCESSING | [2018/27] | French: | RÉCIPIENT À UTILISER DANS LA TRANSFORMATION ALIMENTAIRE | [2018/27] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2018 | Search fee paid | 28.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 28.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/27] | 28.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 04.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.08.2016 | AL | 03.06.2020 | AT | 03.06.2020 | CY | 03.06.2020 | CZ | 03.06.2020 | DK | 03.06.2020 | EE | 03.06.2020 | FI | 03.06.2020 | HR | 03.06.2020 | LT | 03.06.2020 | LV | 03.06.2020 | MC | 03.06.2020 | MK | 03.06.2020 | MT | 03.06.2020 | PL | 03.06.2020 | RO | 03.06.2020 | RS | 03.06.2020 | SE | 03.06.2020 | SI | 03.06.2020 | SK | 03.06.2020 | SM | 03.06.2020 | TR | 03.06.2020 | IE | 26.08.2020 | LU | 26.08.2020 | CH | 31.08.2020 | LI | 31.08.2020 | BG | 03.09.2020 | NO | 03.09.2020 | IS | 03.10.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 26.08.2016 | |
AL | 03.06.2020 | ||
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CY | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
MT | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
TR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IE | 26.08.2020 | ||
LU | 26.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
IE | 26.08.2020 | ||
LU | 26.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
LU | 26.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
LU | 26.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/18] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 03.06.2020 | |
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 03.06.2020 | |
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 03.06.2020 | |
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 03.06.2020 | |
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 03.06.2020 | |
NO | 03.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS5550671B (QP CORP) [Y] 1-15* the whole document *; | [Y]WO8404037 (FIELD GROUP RES PTY LTD [AU]) [Y] 1-15 * page 7, lines 15-19 *; | [Y]US5316745 (TING EDMUND Y [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * column 4, line 62 - column 5, line 5 *; | [Y]US2003228239 (MEYER RICHARD S [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0014] *; | [Y]US2004033296 (YUAN JAMES T C [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0049] *; | [Y]US2007144587 (BERGMAN CARL [SE], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0059] - [0061] * | International search | [X]US5165974 (ODAKA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-12, 15-18 * Abstract, col 1 lines 20-22, col 17 lines 58-68, col 18 lines 1-7, figure 27 *; | [X]US5178293 (SUZUKI TAKANORI [JP], et al) [X] 1-12, 15-18 * Abstract column 1 lines 18-20, column 17 lines 19-23, figure 27 *; | [X]US5316603 (AKAZAWA SEIGO [JP], et al) [X] 1-8, 12, 15-18 * Abstract, col 1 lines 08, col 2 line 33, col 6 lines 60-65, all figures *; | [X]US5319910 (TAKATA YUKIO [JP], et al) [X] 1-12, 15-18 * Abstract, col 1 lines 20-22, col 17 lines 58-68, col 18 lines 01-07, figure 27 *; | [A]WO9711838 (INT PAPER CO [US]) [A] 1-26 * Abstract and figures *; | [A]WO9732708 (CONTINENTAL PET TECHNOLOGIES [US]) [A] 1-26 * Abstract and figures *; | [X]US2002192109 (TING EDMUND Y [US], et al) [X] 1, 3, 6-9,12,13,15-18, 20- 26 * Abstract, paragraphs 0001, 0002, 0012, 0015 to 0028, figure 1 *; | [X]WO2004082405 (FLOW HOLDINGS SAGL [CH], et al) [X] 1, 6, 7 10-19 * Abstract, page 01 lines 01 to 23, page 05 lines 22 to 35, page 09 lines 14 to 16, page 13 lines 01 to 05 and page 25 line 25, page 21 lines 30 to page 22 line 05, figs 1 and 2 *; | [A]KR20040100244 (HYUNDAI MOTOR CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-26 * WPI Abstract and figures *; | [A]US2007292646 (SAFIAN JOHN W [US], et al) [A] 1-26 * Abstract and figures *; | [A]US2013248411 (BADER HERBERT [DE], et al) [A] 1-26 * Abstract and figures *; | [A]US2014186499 (HUKELMANN BERNHARD [DE], et al) [A] 1-26* Abstract and figures * | by applicant | JPS5550671B | WO8404037 | US5316745 | US2002192109 | US2003228239 | US2004033296 | WO2004082405 | US2007144587 | - KNOERZER et al., Journal of Food Engineering, (20100000), vol. 96, pages 229 - 238 | - KNOERZER et al., Food Engineering Reviews, (20100000), vol. 2, pages 216 - 225 | - KNOERZER et al., AlChE Journal, (20070000), vol. 53, no. 11, pages 2996 - 3010 | - KNOERZERCHAPMAN, Journal of Food Engineering, (20110000), vol. 104, pages 404 - 413 |