EP3342633 - CONTROL DEVICE FOR ELECTRIC VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.08.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 30.09.2020 [2020/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Automotive Systems, Ltd. 2520 Takaba Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312-8503 / JP | [2018/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUKI, Keisuke c/o Hitachi Automotive Systems Ltd. 4-7-1 Onna Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-8510 / JP | [2018/27] | Representative(s) | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | [2018/27] | Application number, filing date | 16838984.9 | 22.07.2016 | [2018/27] | WO2016JP71525 | Priority number, date | JP20150165337 | 25.08.2015 Original published format: JP 2015165337 | [2018/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017033637 | Date: | 02.03.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3342633 | Date: | 04.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.03.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B60L15/20, B60L9/18, B60L3/10, B60L15/10, B60K6/52, B60K17/356 | [2018/39] | CPC: |
B60K6/52 (EP,US);
B60L3/0061 (US);
B60K17/356 (EP,US);
B60L15/10 (EP,US);
B60L15/20 (EP,US);
B60L3/106 (EP,US);
B60L2240/12 (EP,US);
B60L2240/16 (EP,US);
B60L2240/421 (EP,US);
B60L2240/423 (US);
B60L2240/461 (EP,US);
B60L2240/463 (EP,US);
B60L2240/486 (EP,US);
B60L2250/26 (US);
B60L2260/26 (EP,US);
B60L2260/28 (EP,US);
B60L9/18 (EP,US);
B60T2270/20 (EP,US);
B60Y2300/18175 (EP,US);
B60Y2400/82 (EP,US);
Y02T10/62 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/27] | B60L15/20, B60L9/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/27] | Title | German: | STEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN ELEKTROFAHRZEUG | [2018/27] | English: | CONTROL DEVICE FOR ELECTRIC VEHICLE | [2018/27] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE POUR VÉHICULE ÉLECTRIQUE | [2018/27] | Entry into regional phase | 16.02.2018 | Translation filed | 16.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.2018 | Search fee paid | 16.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/27] | 16.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.09.2020 | 12.05.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/40] | 22.05.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/40] | 17.09.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP2078653 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,9 * the whole document * [I] 2-8,10-17 | International search | [XY]JPH07163011 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1 * , paragraphs [0004], [0008] to [0017]; fig. 1, 3 & US 5534764 A column 1, lines 54 to 58; column 2, line 29 to column 6, line 39; fig. 1, 3 * [Y] 2-17; | [XY]JP2007331718 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1-2, 14-15 * , paragraphs [0006], [0017] to [0022], [0036], [0038], [0045] to [0051]; fig. 1 to 2, 4 to 6 (Family: none) * [Y] 2-17; | [Y]JP2015056965 (HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LTD) [Y] 3-7, 11, 16 * , paragraphs [0004], [0018], [0025], [0029], [0056]; fig. 1 to 2, 7, 19 to 20 & US 2016/0221468 A paragraphs [0004] to [0005], [0038] to [0039], [0048], [0052], [0090]; fig. 1 to 2, 7, 19 to 20 & WO 2015/037616 A1 & EP 3031662 A & CN 105492244 A & KR 10-2016-0034368 A *; | [Y]JP2008178216 (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 8-10, 12-13, 17 * , paragraphs [0026], [0076], [0096] & US 2010/0114447 A1 paragraphs [0041], [0092], [0111] & WO 2008/087925 A1 & EP 2106955 A1 *; | [A]JP2001016703 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-17 * , claims 6, 8 to 11; paragraphs [0039] to [0041], [0128] to [0148]; fig. 1 to 3, 6 to 7 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2005354774 (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1-17 * , claim 1; paragraphs [0009] to [0011], [0036] to [0038]; fig. 1 to 3 (Family: none) * |