|
20.01.2023 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2022 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2022 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.02.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.2022 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.2022 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.02.2022 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.02.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.01.2022 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2022 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.12.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.12.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.12.2021 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2021 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2021 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.12.2021 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2021 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
22.12.2021 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
06.12.2021 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2021 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.12.2021 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2021 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.11.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.11.2021 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2021 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.10.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2021 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.10.2021 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.10.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2021 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.10.2021 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2021 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2021 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2021 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.07.2021 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.03.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.2021 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.03.2021 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.01.2021 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.01.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2021 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.09.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.09.2020 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.04.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.04.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2020 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
24.04.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2020 |
Description |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
24.04.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.04.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.02.2020 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.02.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2020 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.10.2019 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.06.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.06.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.06.2019 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
17.06.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2019 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.06.2019 |
Description |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
17.06.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.06.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.06.2019 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2019 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.04.2019 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2019 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.03.2019 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.2019 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.12.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.10.2018 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.2018 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.2018 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.09.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2018 |
Reply to the invitation to clarify the claims/the subject matter of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.2018 |
Invitation to indicate the claims to be searched |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.07.2018 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2018 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.2018 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.04.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2018 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.2018 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
01.03.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.03.2018 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.03.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.03.2018 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.02.2018 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2018 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.03.2017 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
46 |
|
02.03.2017 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.2017 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
35 |