13.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] |
31.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] |
19.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
29.03.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] |
15.09.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.10.2023 [2023/42] |
28.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.08.2023 [2023/35] |
14.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] |
21.04.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.05.2023 [2023/21] |
17.03.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.04.2023 [2023/16] |
03.02.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.03.2023 [2023/10] |
20.01.2023 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 22.02.2023 [2023/08] |
13.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.02.2023 [2023/07] |
02.12.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.01.2023 [2023/01] |
18.11.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.12.2022 [2022/51] |
11.11.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.12.2022 [2022/50] |
04.11.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.12.2022 [2022/49] |
28.10.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.11.2022 [2022/48] |
21.10.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.11.2022 [2022/47] |
30.09.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.11.2022 [2022/44] |
26.08.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.09.2022 [2022/39] |
12.08.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.09.2022 [2022/37] |
05.08.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2022 [2022/36] |
29.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.08.2022 [2022/35] |
15.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] |
11.02.2022 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 16.03.2022 [2022/11] |
04.02.2022 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
04.02.2022 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
04.02.2022 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
05.01.2022 |
Change - representative |
|
21.12.2021 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
26.11.2021 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
05.10.2021 |
Change - representative |
|
20.08.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.07.2021 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
12.03.2021 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
11.01.2021 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
16.09.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
21.08.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.04.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
19.02.2020 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.10.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.08.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.06.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
14.06.2019 |
Change - applicant |
published on 17.07.2019 [2019/29] |
19.04.2019 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.03.2019 |
Change - applicant |
published on 17.04.2019 [2019/16] |
19.12.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
07.12.2018 |
First examination report |
|
02.11.2018 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 05.12.2018 [2018/49] |
02.11.2018 |
Change - extension states |
published on 05.12.2018 [2018/49] |
18.10.2018 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
12.10.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
12.10.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
27.08.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.06.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
01.06.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.06.2018 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 04.07.2018 [2018/27] |
01.06.2018 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
01.06.2018 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 04.07.2018 [2018/27] |
08.05.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.03.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.03.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.03.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.03.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
02.03.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
02.03.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.02.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.03.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.03.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|