Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017035371 | Global Dossier | 02.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562209577 | 25.08.2015 | US201615247418 | 25.08.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10408054 | Global Dossier | 10.09.2019 | B2 | US2017058668 | 02.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562209577 | 25.08.2015 | US201615247418 | 25.08.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2995998 | Global Dossier | 02.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562209577 | 25.08.2015 | WO2016US48728 | 25.08.2016 | US201615247418 | 25.08.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3341562 | Global Dossier | 16.03.2022 | B1 | EP3341562 | 14.11.2018 | A4 | EP3341562 | 04.07.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562209577 | 25.08.2015 | WO2016US48728 | 25.08.2016 |