EP3340976 - IMPROVED PROCESS FOR PRODUCING FUCOXANTHIN AND/OR POLYSACCHARIDES FROM MICROALGAE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.04.2023 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Algahealth (AH) Ltd. 17 T'chelet St., Trendlines bldg. Misgav 2017400 / IL | [2018/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AYALON, Oran 30a Hamagen St. 76804 Mazkeret Batya / IL | [2018/27] | Representative(s) | Straus, Alexander, et al 2K Patent- und Rechtsanwälte - München Keltenring 9 82041 Oberhaching / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/27] | Becker Kurig Straus Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16840965.4 | 23.08.2016 | [2018/27] | WO2016IL50917 | Priority number, date | US201562211094P | 28.08.2015 Original published format: US 201562211094 P | [2018/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017037692 | Date: | 09.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3340976 | Date: | 04.07.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.03.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/336, A61K31/715, A61K36/02, C07D303/02, C07D303/12, C12N1/12 | [2018/27] | CPC: |
A61K31/336 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/715 (EP,KR);
A61K36/02 (EP,KR);
A61K9/0014 (US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
B01D11/0403 (US);
B01D11/0492 (US);
B01D15/08 (US);
C07D303/16 (EP,KR);
C12N1/02 (US);
C12N1/12 (EP,KR,US);
C12P19/04 (EP,KR);
C12P7/62 (US);
A61K2236/00 (EP,KR)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/336, A61K2300/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/27] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTES VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON FUCOXANTHIN UND/ODER POLYSACCHARIDEN AUS MIKROALGEN | [2018/27] | English: | IMPROVED PROCESS FOR PRODUCING FUCOXANTHIN AND/OR POLYSACCHARIDES FROM MICROALGAE | [2018/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ AMÉLIORÉ POUR FABRIQUER DE LA FUCOXANTHINE ET/OU DES POLYSACCHARIDES À PARTIR DE MICROALGUES | [2018/27] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2018 | Search fee paid | 27.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/27] | 27.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2019 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.02.2020 | 31.08.2020 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   02.02.2021 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2007167398 (DILLON HARRISON F [US], et al) [I] 1-15* the whole document *; | [I]WO2007136428 (SOLAZYME INC [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I]WO2012101459 (ALGAECYTES LTD [GB], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XI]US2013309719 (GRIFFITHS HYWEL DAVID [NZ]) [X] 12-15 * the whole document * [I] 1-15; | [I]CN103396979B (UNIV SOUTH CHINA TECH) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I]US8927522 (CORAGLIOTTI ANNA [US], et al) [I] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [I]CN104531604 (GONG YIFU) [I] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]EP0612725 (SASOL CHEM IND PTY [ZA]) [Y] 14 * ; column 1, lines 8-17; column 2, lines 5-7 *; | [Y]CA2057760 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [Y] 8 * ; page 2, second column, sixth paragraph; page 3, second paragraph; page 4, second paragraph *; | [Y]US2011086386 (CZARTOSKI THOMAS J [US], et al) [Y] 9 * ; paragraphs [0058], [0066], [0098] *; | [Y]US2011179699 (D ADDARIO EZIO NICOLA [IT], et al) [Y] 13 * ; paragraphs [0028]-[0029], [0043] *; | [Y]US2013309719 (GRIFFITHS HYWEL DAVID [NZ]) [Y] 1-5, 7-23 * ; paragraphs [0002], [0156], [0158], [0177]-[0180], [0182]-[0183], [0185]-[0186], [0190], [0197]-[0198], [0200]-[0207], [0251] *; | [Y]KR101410632B (RESTORE LABS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 17, 21 * (English translation); abstract; page 1, second column, first paragraph; page 5, ninth paragraph, page 6, first-second and seventh-ninth paragraphs; page 7, first-third paragraphs; paragraphs [0003], [00008] *; | [Y]KR101413874B (RESTORE LABS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 9 * (English translation); page 1, second column, first paragraph; paragraphs [0023]-[0024] *; | [Y]US8927522 (CORAGLIOTTI ANNA [US], et al) [Y] 1-23 * ; column 20, lines 15-20, 30-36 *; | [Y]US2015065568 (UEKITA KEN [JP], et al) [Y] 22 * ; paragraphs [0008], [0046], [0048] *; | [Y]CN104531604 (GONG YIFU) [Y] 1-3, 5-7 * (English translation); abstract; paragraphs [0003]-[0011], [0042] *; | [Y]US2015119355 (BAVINGTON CHARLES DANIEL [GB], et al) [Y] 10, 16, 18 * ; paragraphs [0123]-[0124], [0134]-[0136], [0139]-[0140], [0143], [0147], [0151] *; | [Y]US2015140619 (REDDY CHRISTOPHER M [US], et al) [Y] 19-23 * ; figure 1; paragraphs [0074], [0077]-[0079], [0107] *; | [Y]US2015225322 (LOOTEN PHILIPPE [FR], et al) [Y] 1* ; paragraphs [0010]-[0011], [0051]-0056] * |