EP3345865 - POWDER OF HEXAGONAL BORON NITRIDE, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING SAME, RESIN COMPOSITION, AND RESIN SHEET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.10.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.06.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Showa Denko K.K. 13-9 Shibadaimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8518 / JP | [2018/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OTSUKA, Yuki c/o SHOWA DENKO CERAMICS CO. LTD. Shiojiri Plant 1 Oaza Soga Shiojiri-shi Nagano 399-6461 / JP | 02 /
FUKASAWA, Masaru c/o SHOWA DENKO CERAMICS CO. LTD. Shiojiri Plant 1 Oaza Soga Shiojiri-shi Nagano 399-6461 / JP | [2018/28] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2018/28] | Application number, filing date | 16841544.6 | 19.08.2016 | [2018/28] | WO2016JP74278 | Priority number, date | JP20150174106 | 03.09.2015 Original published format: JP 2015174106 | [2018/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017038512 | Date: | 09.03.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3345865 | Date: | 11.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3345865 | Date: | 24.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.03.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C01B21/064, C08K3/38, C08L101/00, C09K5/14, C08K7/00 | [2019/16] | CPC: |
C09K5/14 (EP,US);
C01B21/0645 (EP,KR,US);
C01B21/064 (US);
C08K3/38 (EP,US);
C08K7/00 (US);
C08L101/00 (EP,KR,US);
C01P2002/60 (EP,US);
C01P2004/03 (EP,US);
C01P2004/50 (EP,KR,US);
C01P2004/61 (EP,KR,US);
C01P2006/11 (EP,US);
C01P2006/12 (EP,KR,US);
C01P2006/32 (EP,US);
C08K2003/385 (EP,KR,US);
C08K2201/001 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08K3/38, C08L101/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/28] | C01B21/064, C08K3/38, C08L101/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PULVER AUS HEXAGONALEM BORNITRID, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON, HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND HARZFOLIE | [2018/28] | English: | POWDER OF HEXAGONAL BORON NITRIDE, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING SAME, RESIN COMPOSITION, AND RESIN SHEET | [2018/28] | French: | POUDRE DE NITRURE DE BORE HEXAGONAL, PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION CORRESPONDANT, COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE, ET FEUILLE DE RÉSINE | [2018/28] | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2018 | Translation filed | 12.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.2018 | Search fee paid | 12.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/28] | 26.03.2019 | Observations by third parties | 27.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 14.10.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.08.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.08.2016 | AL | 24.11.2021 | AT | 24.11.2021 | CY | 24.11.2021 | CZ | 24.11.2021 | DK | 24.11.2021 | EE | 24.11.2021 | ES | 24.11.2021 | FI | 24.11.2021 | HR | 24.11.2021 | LT | 24.11.2021 | LV | 24.11.2021 | MC | 24.11.2021 | MK | 24.11.2021 | MT | 24.11.2021 | NL | 24.11.2021 | PL | 24.11.2021 | RO | 24.11.2021 | RS | 24.11.2021 | SE | 24.11.2021 | SI | 24.11.2021 | SK | 24.11.2021 | SM | 24.11.2021 | TR | 24.11.2021 | BG | 24.02.2022 | NO | 24.02.2022 | GR | 25.02.2022 | IS | 24.03.2022 | PT | 24.03.2022 | GB | 19.08.2022 | IE | 19.08.2022 | LU | 19.08.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 19.08.2016 | |
AL | 24.11.2021 | ||
AT | 24.11.2021 | ||
CY | 24.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
DK | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
MC | 24.11.2021 | ||
MK | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SI | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
TR | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
GB | 19.08.2022 | ||
IE | 19.08.2022 | ||
LU | 19.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 19.08.2016 | |
AL | 24.11.2021 | ||
AT | 24.11.2021 | ||
CY | 24.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
DK | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
MC | 24.11.2021 | ||
MK | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SI | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
GB | 19.08.2022 | ||
IE | 19.08.2022 | ||
LU | 19.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 19.08.2016 | |
AL | 24.11.2021 | ||
AT | 24.11.2021 | ||
CY | 24.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
DK | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
MC | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SI | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
GB | 19.08.2022 | ||
IE | 19.08.2022 | ||
LU | 19.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 19.08.2016 | |
AL | 24.11.2021 | ||
AT | 24.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
DK | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
MC | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SI | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
GB | 19.08.2022 | ||
IE | 19.08.2022 | ||
LU | 19.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/47] | AL | 24.11.2021 | |
AT | 24.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
DK | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
MC | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SI | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
GB | 19.08.2022 | ||
IE | 19.08.2022 | ||
LU | 19.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 24.11.2021 | |
AT | 24.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
DK | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
MC | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SI | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
IE | 19.08.2022 | ||
LU | 19.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 24.11.2021 | |
AT | 24.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
DK | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
MC | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SI | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
LU | 19.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/16] | AL | 24.11.2021 | |
AT | 24.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
DK | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
MC | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SI | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 24.11.2021 | |
AT | 24.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
DK | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SI | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 24.11.2021 | |
AT | 24.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
DK | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 24.11.2021 | |
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
DK | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 24.11.2021 | |
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 24.11.2021 | |
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 24.11.2021 | |
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 24.11.2021 | |
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 24.11.2021 | |
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 24.11.2021 | |
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 24.11.2021 | |
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 24.02.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2015119198 ; | [T]WO2016092951 ; | [T]JP2018104260 ; | [XYI]WO2014202649 (ESK CERAMICS GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [X] 1,6,7 * page 15, lines 16-24; claims 1, 3, 13 * * page 16, line 8 - page 17, line 4 * * page 18, line 27 - page 19, line 6 * * page 32, line 11 - page 33, line 34 * * the whole document * [Y] 8 [I] 2-5,8-13; | [XYI]WO2014202652 (ESK CERAMICS GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,6,7 * page 12, lines 7-30; example 18; claims 1,10 * * page 17, lines 27-29 * * the whole document * [Y] 8 [I] 2-5,8-13; | [Y]WO2015119198 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP [JP]) [Y] 8 * citatios refer to the machine translation into English; paragraph [0020] *; | [T]WO2018123788 (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP]) [T] 1-13* the whole document *; | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2015, no. 56, Database accession no. 2015-46250R, XP002789390 & WO2015119198 A1 20150813 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CO LTD) [Y] 8 * abstract * | [T] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2016, no. 43, Database accession no. 2016-368589, XP002789391 & WO2016092951 A1 20160616 (SHOWA DENKO KK) [T] 1-13 * abstract * * citations refer to the machine translation into English;; figures 1,6,7 * * the whole document * | [T] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2018, no. 50, Database accession no. 2018-52647U, XP002789392 & JP2018104260 A 20180705 (SHOWA DENKO KK) [T] 1-13 * abstract * * references refer to the machine translation into English also see: WO2018123788 * | International search | [Y]JPH1160216 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO) [Y] 4, 5, 8-13 * , claim 2; paragraph [0011] & US 6054520 A claim 2; column 3, lines 3 to 10 *; | [YA]WO2009041300 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 1-7 * , claims; paragraphs [0017] to [0026]; fig. 1 to 3, 10 & JP 5184543 B2 & US 2010/0226095 A1 claims; paragraphs [0034] to [0049]; fig. 1 to 3, 10 & CN 101809734 A * [A] 8-13; | [Y]JP4750220B (Mizushima Ferroalloy Co., Ltd.) [Y] 5* , claim 1; paragraph [0049] & US 2012/0196128 A1 claim 1; paragraph [0061] & WO 2011/043082 A1 & EP 2487134 A1 & CA 2774842 A1 & CN 102574684 A & KR 10-2012-0101345 A *; | [Y]WO2014003193 (MIZUSHIMA FERROALLOY CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-13 * , claims; table 1 & JP 5689985 B2 & US 2015/0152251 A1 claims; table 1 & EP 2868641 A1 & CN 104470873 A *; | [Y]WO2014202649 (ESK CERAMICS GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-13 * , claims; page 5, lines 13 to 18; page 16, line 8 to page 22, line 3 & JP 2016-522298 A & US 2016/0145411 A1 & EP 2816083 A1 & CN 105579511 A & KR 10-2016-0021832 A *; | [Y]WO2014202652 (ESK CERAMICS GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 1-13 * , claims; page 4, lines 12 to 17; page 12, line 7 to page 16, line 21 & JP 2016-522299 A & US 2016/0122502 A1 & EP 2816082 A1 & CN 105308111 A & KR 10-2016-0022868 A *; | [Y]WO2015119198 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-13 * , paragraphs [0048], [0049], [0123] & JP 2016-135729 A * |