EP3346135 - COMPRESSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Kobe Seiko Sho (Kobe Steel, Ltd.) 2-4, Wakinohama-Kaigandori 2-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-8585 / JP | [2018/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJIOKA, Koumei c/o Takasago Works in Kobe Steel, Ltd. 3-1, Shinhama 2-chome, Arai-cho Takasago-shi, Hyogo 676-8670 / JP | [2018/28] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2018/28] | Application number, filing date | 16841941.4 | 01.09.2016 | [2018/28] | WO2016JP75597 | Priority number, date | JP20150172518 | 02.09.2015 Original published format: JP 2015172518 | [2018/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017038912 | Date: | 09.03.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3346135 | Date: | 11.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.03.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F04D29/62 | [2023/22] | CPC: |
F04D25/163 (EP,US);
F04D29/056 (EP,KR,US);
F04D17/12 (EP,KR,US);
F04D25/16 (KR);
F04D29/053 (KR,US);
F04D29/4206 (EP,US);
F04D29/624 (EP);
F16H1/227 (US);
F16H57/022 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/16] | F04D29/056, F04D17/12, F04D25/16, F04D29/053, F04D29/42, F16H1/22, F16H57/02, F16H57/022 | ||
Former IPC [2018/28] | F04D29/056, F04D17/12, F04D25/16, F04D29/053 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/28] | Title | German: | VERDICHTER | [2018/28] | English: | COMPRESSOR | [2018/28] | French: | COMPRESSEUR | [2018/28] | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.2018 | Translation filed | 15.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.2018 | Search fee paid | 15.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/28] | 15.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/12] | 16.11.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2024/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]NL276194 (BORSIG AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,8 * page 3, line 29 - page 4, line 14; figures 1,2 * * page 4, line 52 - page 5, line 12 * [Y] 4; | [Y]EP1895164 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) [Y] 5-7 * paragraphs [0032] - [0038]; figures 5-7 *; | [XY]DE102009044959 (MAN TURBO AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,8 * paragraphs [0051] - [0056]; figures 3a,3b,4a,4b * [Y] 5-7; | [A]WO2012058111 (BORGWARNER INC [US], et al) [A] 5-7* page 7, line 7 - page 9, line 2; figures 5a,7a,8a,8b *; | [XY]DE102014207283 (VOITH PATENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,8 * paragraphs [0052] - [0054]; figures 4b,5 * [Y] 4; | [X]WO2014195390 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,8 * page 6, line 20 - page 9, line 22; figures 1,2 * | International search | [A]DE3146160 (PUMPEN & VERDICHTER VEB K [DD]) [A] 1-8* , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JPS5815677Y (Ishikawajima-Harima Heavy Industries Co., Ltd.) [A] 1-8 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JPS6293499 (JOY MFG CO) [A] 1-8 * , entire text; all drawings & US 4750861 A *; | [A]JPH0518394 (BORSIG BABCOCK AG) [A] 1-8 * , entire text; all drawings & US 5154571 A & EP 440902 A1 & DE 4003482 A1 *; | [A]US5382132 (MENDEL JUERGEN [DE]) [A] 1-8 * , entire text; all drawings & EP 602491 A1 & DE 4241141 A1 *; | [A]JPH10246198 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1-8 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) * |