EP3345642 - OPTICALLY INDUCED INJECTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pusan National University Hospital 179 Gudeok-ro Seo-gu, Busan / KR | [2018/29] |
Former [2018/28] | For all designated states Pusan National University Industry - University Cooperation Foundation Pusan National University Jangjeon-dong 2 Busandaehang-ro 63beon-gil Geumjeong-gu Busan 46241 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHA, Wonjae 602-402 503 Geumgang-ro Geumjeong-gu Busan 46232 / KR | [2018/28] | Representative(s) | Tergau & Walkenhorst Intellectual Property GmbH Lurgiallee 12 60439 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/28] | Tergau & Walkenhorst Patentanwälte PartGmbB Eschersheimer Landstrasse 105-107 60322 Frankfurt/Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 16842159.2 | 18.08.2016 | [2018/28] | WO2016KR09067 | Priority number, date | KR20150124856 | 03.09.2015 Original published format: KR 20150124856 | [2018/28] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017039193 | Date: | 09.03.2017 | Language: | KO | [2017/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3345642 | Date: | 11.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 09.03.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/42, A61M5/31, A61B1/07, A61M5/34, A61M5/178 | [2019/28] | CPC: |
A61M5/427 (EP,US);
A61B1/00087 (EP,US);
A61B1/0676 (US);
A61B1/07 (EP,US);
A61B1/267 (EP,US);
A61M5/178 (EP,US);
A61M5/31 (EP,US);
A61M5/345 (EP,US);
A61M5/42 (US);
G02B23/2461 (EP,US);
G02B23/2469 (EP,US);
G02B23/2476 (EP,US);
G02B23/26 (EP,US);
A61B5/0084 (US);
A61M2205/587 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/28] | A61M5/42, A61M5/31 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/28] | Title | German: | OPTISCH INDUZIERTE INJEKTIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2018/28] | English: | OPTICALLY INDUCED INJECTION DEVICE | [2018/28] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'INJECTION À INDUCTION OPTIQUE | [2018/28] | Entry into regional phase | 14.02.2018 | Translation filed | 14.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 14.02.2018 | Search fee paid | 14.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/28] | 14.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 18.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2019 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2014135630 (BERNDT MALKA S [US]) [X] 1,5,6,13 * paragraphs [0013] - [0015] - [0035] , [0045] - [0047] * * figures 1,3-5 * [I] 2-4,7-12,14,15; | [XI]US2015057530 (ROGGEVEEN STEPHAN ADRIAAN [NL], et al) [X] 1,5,6,13 * paragraphs [0034] , [0035] , [0045] * * figures 2-6,8,9 * [I] 2-4,7-12,14,15; | [XI]EP1137454 (ENTERIC MED TECH INC [US]) [X] 1,5,6,13 * paragraphs [0021] , [0022] , [0032] * * figure 1 * [I] 2-4,7-12,14,15; | [XI]US2007202186 (YAMAMOTO RONALD [US], et al) [X] 1,5,6,13 * paragraphs [0071] - [0073] * * figures 3-7 * [I] 2-4,7-12,14,15; | [XP] - WONJAE CHA ET AL, "Development of a device for real-time light-guided vocal fold injection: A preliminary report : Real-Time Light-Guided Vocal Fold Injection", THE LARYNGOSCOPE, United States, (20160425), vol. 126, no. 4, doi:10.1002/lary.25661, ISSN 0023-852X, pages 936 - 940, XP055374123 [XP] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/lary.25661 | International search | [XA]US2014135630 (BERNDT MALKA S [US]) [X] 1-7, 9-11, 13-20 * See paragraphs [0013]-[0046]; claims 26-45; figures 1-7(b). * [A] 8, 12; | [A]JP2012515603 (SILENSEED LTD.) [A] 1-20 * See the entire document. *; | [A]KR100531163B (MINRAD INC.) [A] 1-20 * See the entire document. *; | [A]JP2008539942 (SPECTRACURE AB.) [A] 1-20 * See the entire document. *; | [A] - CHHETRI, D. K. et al., "Percutaneous Injection Laryngoplasty", The Laryngoscope, (20140300), vol. 124, pages 742 - 745, XP055374120 [A] 1-20 * See the entire document. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/lary.24417 | [PX] - CHA, W. et al., "Development of a Device for Real-time Light-guided Vocal Fold Injection: a Preliminary Report", The Laryngoscope, (20160400), vol. 126, pages 936 - 940, XP055374123 [PX] 1-6, 9, 11, 13, 14, 20 * See pages 936-940. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/lary.25661 |