EP3345756 - LIGHTWEIGHT COMPOSITE METAL SHEET HAVING EXCELLENT VIBRATION DAMPING CHARACTERISTICS, AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.08.2020 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states POSCO (Goedong-dong) 6261, Donhaean-ro Nam-gu Pohang-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 37859 / KR | [2019/27] |
Former [2018/28] | For all designated states POSCO (Geodong-dong) 6261, Donghaean-ro Nam-gu Pohang-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 37859 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHO, Jaedong (Songdo Poongrim I-won 1-danji Apt. Songdo-dong) 117-1403 6 Sinsong-ro 118beon-gil Yeonsu-gu Incheon 21994 / KR | 02 /
JUNG, Chang Gyun (Songdo The Sharp Green Square Songdo-dong) 111-1501 81 Songdomunhwa-ro 28beon-gil Yeonsu-gu Incheon 21986 / KR | 03 /
JUNG, Yong-Gyun (Maehwa Apt. Geumho-dong) 16-206 39 Huimang-gil Gwangyang-si Jeollanam-do 57809 / KR | 04 /
KIM, Gyo-Sung (Songdowelkaunti 2 Danji Apt. Songdo-dong) 206-1001 70 Haesong-ro Yeonsu-gu Incheon 22000 / KR | 05 /
CHUNG, Bonghoon (Gwangan-dong) 62 Gwangseo-ro Suyeong-gu Busan 48245 / KR | 06 /
KIM, Yeong Gon (Yonghyeon-dong) 100 Inha-ro Nam-gu Incheon 22212 / KR | 07 /
SHIM, Sang Eun (Yonghyeon-dong) 100 Inha-ro Nam-gu Incheon 22212 / KR | [2018/28] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/43] | Potter Clarkson The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2018/28] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | Application number, filing date | 16842357.2 | 02.09.2016 | [2018/28] | WO2016KR09855 | Priority number, date | KR20150124596 | 03.09.2015 Original published format: KR 20150124596 | [2018/28] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017039391 | Date: | 09.03.2017 | Language: | KO | [2017/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3345756 | Date: | 11.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3345756 | Date: | 23.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 09.03.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B32B15/08, B32B15/085, B32B15/09, B32B15/18, B32B27/20, B32B27/26, B32B27/28, B32B27/32, B32B27/36 | [2018/28] | CPC: |
B32B15/085 (EP,US);
B32B15/08 (EP,US);
B32B15/09 (EP,US);
B32B15/18 (EP,US);
B32B27/20 (EP,US);
B32B27/26 (EP,US);
B32B27/285 (EP,US);
B32B27/32 (EP,US);
B32B27/36 (EP,US);
B32B37/06 (US);
B32B2037/0092 (US);
B32B2250/02 (EP,US);
B32B2250/03 (EP,US);
B32B2250/40 (EP,US);
B32B2270/00 (EP,US);
B32B2274/00 (EP,US);
B32B2307/102 (EP,US);
B32B2307/542 (EP,US);
B32B2307/56 (US);
B32B2307/718 (EP,US);
B32B2307/72 (EP,US);
B32B2309/02 (US);
B32B2309/12 (US);
B32B2605/00 (EP,US);
B32B2605/08 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LEICHTES VERBUNDMETALLBLECH MIT HERVORRAGENDEN SCHWINGUNGSDÄMPFUNGSEIGENSCHAFTEN UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2018/28] | English: | LIGHTWEIGHT COMPOSITE METAL SHEET HAVING EXCELLENT VIBRATION DAMPING CHARACTERISTICS, AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR | [2018/28] | French: | FEUILLE MÉTALLIQUE COMPOSITE LÉGÈRE AYANT D'EXCELLENTES CARACTÉRISTIQUES D'AMORTISSEMENT DES VIBRATIONS ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2018/28] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2018 | Translation filed | 01.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.2018 | Search fee paid | 01.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/28] | 01.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.09.2016 | AL | 23.10.2019 | CY | 23.10.2019 | CZ | 23.10.2019 | DK | 23.10.2019 | EE | 23.10.2019 | ES | 23.10.2019 | FI | 23.10.2019 | HR | 23.10.2019 | IT | 23.10.2019 | LT | 23.10.2019 | LV | 23.10.2019 | MC | 23.10.2019 | MK | 23.10.2019 | MT | 23.10.2019 | PL | 23.10.2019 | RO | 23.10.2019 | RS | 23.10.2019 | SE | 23.10.2019 | SI | 23.10.2019 | SK | 23.10.2019 | SM | 23.10.2019 | TR | 23.10.2019 | BG | 23.01.2020 | NO | 23.01.2020 | GR | 24.01.2020 | IS | 23.02.2020 | PT | 24.02.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 02.09.2016 | |
AL | 23.10.2019 | ||
CY | 23.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MC | 23.10.2019 | ||
MT | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
TR | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 02.09.2016 | |
AL | 23.10.2019 | ||
CY | 23.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
MT | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
TR | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SI | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
IT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
SK | 23.10.2019 | ||
SM | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
DK | 23.10.2019 | ||
EE | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 23.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
CZ | 23.10.2019 | ||
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RO | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
ES | 23.10.2019 | ||
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 23.10.2019 | |
FI | 23.10.2019 | ||
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 23.10.2019 | |
HR | 23.10.2019 | ||
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
RS | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | FI | 23.10.2019 | |
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 23.10.2019 | |
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
LV | 23.10.2019 | ||
PL | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
GR | 24.01.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 23.10.2019 | |
LT | 23.10.2019 | ||
SE | 23.10.2019 | ||
BG | 23.01.2020 | ||
NO | 23.01.2020 | ||
PT | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 23.01.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0752315 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [I]KR980009368 (POSCO) [I] 1-12 * paragraphs [0001] , [0021] , [0029] , [0030] , [0033] * * examples 1,3,4,6 * * claim 1 * * the whole document *; | [A]JP2001172376 (TOYO BOSEKI) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2001207044 (ASAHI KASEI CORP) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US2008023887 (VOLLENBERG PETER H [US], et al) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [A]KR20150055171 (HYUNDAI MOBIS CO LTD [KR], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]JPH0752315 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [Y] 8, 11-12 * See paragraph [0025] and claim 6. *; | [Y]KR980009368 (POHANG IRON AND STEEL CO., LTD. et al.) [Y] 1-12 * See page 2, claims 1-3 and figure 1. *; | [A]KR20080105668 (MATERIAL SCIENCES CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * See paragraphs [0028]-[0040] and figures 1-2. *; | [A]JP2010516511 (HAEWON MSC CO., LTD.) [A] 1-12* See paragraphs [0023]-[0043] and figures 1-2. *; | [Y]KR20150055171 (HYUNDAI MOBIS CO LTD [KR], et al) [Y] 1-12 * Seeparagraphs [0039], [0051], [0106] and figures 1-3. * |